Collins v. Dufresne et al

Plaintiff: Eloisa Collins
Defendant: Jackson National Life Insurance Company, Timothy Dufresne and Sagepoint Financial Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv02879
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 26 TEXT ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response to Motion due by 1/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 12/20/2018.(mdea )
December 20, 2018 Filing 25 Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Eloisa Collins.(Akins, Dale) (Main Document 25 replaced on 12/20/2018) (mdea, ).
December 20, 2018 Filing 24 Rule 26(f) Report by Eloisa Collins.(Akins, Dale) (Main Document 24 replaced on 12/20/2018) (mdea, ).
December 17, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Eloisa Collins. Response to Motion due by 12/31/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Akins, Dale)
December 7, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jackson National Life Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 12/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Josey, Jon)
December 7, 2018 Filing 21 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jackson National Life Insurance Company.(Josey, Jon)
November 29, 2018 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Derek Kauhane to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #10 Motion for James Blackburn, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 11/28/2018.(mdea )
November 28, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eloisa Collins. Timothy Dufresne served on 11/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Akins, Dale)
November 19, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Rene Josey on behalf of Jackson National Life Insurance Company (Josey, Jon)
November 19, 2018 Filing 16 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Report due by 12/27/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/18/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/19/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/19/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/19/2019, Discovery due by 5/20/2019, Motion in Limine due by 8/26/2019, Motions due by 6/3/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/16/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 9/16/2019, ADR Statement due by 7/1/2019, Mediation Due by 8/1/2019. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 11/19/2018. (mdea )
November 19, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Claude Townsend Prevost on behalf of Sagepoint Financial Inc (Prevost, Claude)
November 19, 2018 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sagepoint Financial Inc.(Kinney, Charles)
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sagepoint Financial Inc.(Kinney, Charles)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Jackson National Life Insurance Company answer due 12/10/2018. The court having been informed that the parties consent, Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (ECF No.11) is granted. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 11/16/2018.(mdea )
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Jackson National Life Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 11/28/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-mailed Extension Request)No proposed order.(Josey, Jon) Modified on 11/15/2018 to remove linkage to incorrect entry (mdea, ).
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James B. Blackburn, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8093373) by Eloisa Collins. Response to Motion due by 11/20/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)No proposed order.(Akins, Dale) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2018: #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (mdea, ).
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Derek A.T. Kauhane ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8093307) by Eloisa Collins. Response to Motion due by 11/20/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)No proposed order.(Akins, Dale) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2018: #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (mdea, ).
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eloisa Collins. Sagepoint Financial Inc served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Akins, Dale)
November 6, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eloisa Collins. Jackson National Life Insurance Company served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Akins, Dale)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jackson National Life Insurance Company. (mdea ) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/25/2018) (mdea, ).
October 24, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Sagepoint Financial Inc. (mdea ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/25/2018) (mdea, ).
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Timothy Dufresne. (mdea ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/25/2018) (mdea, ).
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Eloisa Collins.(mdea )
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Dufresne, Jackson National Life Insurance Company, Sagepoint Financial Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8071554.), filed by Eloisa Collins. Service due by 1/22/2019(mdea )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Dufresne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian James Kern
Represented By: R Wayne Byrd
Represented By: Jon Rene Josey
Represented By: John Smith Wilkerson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Dufresne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sagepoint Financial Inc
Represented By: Claude Townsend Prevost
Represented By: Charles Albert Kinney, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eloisa Collins
Represented By: Dale Ernest Akins
Represented By: James B Blackburn, Jr
Represented By: Derek A T Kauhane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?