Wiggins v. Marion County Detention Center

Plaintiff: Derell Wiggins
Defendant: Marion County Detention Center
Case Number: 1:2018cv03596
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Addressee: Derell Wiggins. Document Returned: #10 Proper Form Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED 13 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #10 Proper Form Order, original complaint filed, blank complaint form, IFP Application, Financial Certificate, Summons and Form USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail to Derell Wiggins placed in U.S. Mail to Derell Wiggins. (lbak)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. The Clerk of Court is instructed to mail Plaintiff at his new address the court's January 29, 2019 order and accompanying materials. Plaintiff's deadline to bring this case into proper form in compliance with the order is extended to March 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 2/13/19. (vhor)
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time and Notice of Change of Address by Derell Wiggins. Response to Motion due by 2/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #10 Proper Form Order, original complaint filed, blank complaint form, IFP Application, Financial Certificate, Summons and Form USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail to Derell Wiggins. (lbak)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 2/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/29/2019. (lbak)
January 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT by Derell Wiggins to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (lbak)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Proper Form Order, original complaint filed, blank complaint form, IFP Application, Financial Certificate, Summons and Form USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail to Derell Wiggins. (lbak)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 1/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/2/2019. (lbak)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marion County Detention Center, filed by Derell Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (lbak) Supplement added on 1/2/2019 at #7 . (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wiggins v. Marion County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derell Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?