Synovus Bank v. Huffer
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Defendant: Douglas C Huffer
Case Number: 1:2019cv00120
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 9/4/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 3/14/2019. (asni, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 4/3/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 4/17/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 4/17/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/28/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/27/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/29/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/29/2019, Discovery due by 8/28/2019, Motion in Limine due by 11/1/2019, Motions due by 9/11/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 11/1/2019, Pretrial Briefs due by 11/26/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 12/3/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 3/14/2019. (asni, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Douglas C Huffer.(Lydon, Thomas)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Synovus Bank by Douglas C Huffer.(Lydon, Thomas)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Synovus Bank. Douglas C Huffer waiver executed on 1/15/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Scott, Michael)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Synovus Bank.(asni, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Douglas C Huffer. (asni, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Douglas C Huffer ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8210214.), filed by Synovus Bank. Service due by 4/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Huffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: Michael Patrick Scott
Represented By: Angus H Macaulay, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas C Huffer
Represented By: Thomas E Lydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?