Brown v. Georgetown Municipal Court

Petitioner: Kevin Nathaniel Brown
Respondent: Georgetown Municipal Court
Case Number: 1:2019cv01450
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Aiken Office
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:19-cv-00534. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS ORDERED THAT: 1. Petitioners motion to correct the respondent to this action (Doc. No. 7) is GRANTED, and the Clerk of Court is directed to substitute the Georgetown Municipal Court for the respondent in this action; 2. The Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina; and 3. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the above-captioned case. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/17/2019. (ve) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 5/17/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Kevin Nathaniel Brown. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/17/2019. (ve) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 5/17/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 TRAVERSE by Kevin Nathaniel Brown to #8 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus. (nr) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 5/17/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS by Warden of LSCI Allenwood by Warden of LSCI Allenwood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Blewitt, Justin) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 5/17/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Correct Respondent to this Action filed by Kevin Nathaniel Brown.(dmn) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 5/17/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition for H/C Served on United States Attorney's Office on 4/8/2019. (ve) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 5/17/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED THAT: The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of the petition and this Order on the Respondent and the United States Attorney. See order for further details. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 4/8/2019. (ve) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 5/17/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Receipt of payment from KEVIN NATHANIEL BROWN in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 4/2/2019. Receipt number 333065131 processed by epetrosk. (jjs, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 5/17/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 333065131, The Petition is DEEMED FILED (bg) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 5/17/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the petitioner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 03/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 5/17/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (dmn) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 5/17/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus DEEMED filed by Kevin Nathaniel Brown.(dmn) Modified on 4/2/2019 (bg). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 5/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Georgetown Municipal Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Nathaniel Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Georgetown Municipal Court
Represented By: Joseph Terz
Represented By: Justin Blewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?