Walls v. Brighthouse Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Angela Walls
Defendant: Brighthouse Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01690
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company (Devlin, Chadwick)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company.(Devlin, Chadwick)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company.(Devlin, Chadwick)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Angela Walls by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (Devlin, Chadwick)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Counterclaim #2 , COUNTERCLAIM against Brighthouse Life Insurance Company by Angela Walls.(Mayes, W)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by W Daniel Mayes on behalf of Angela Walls (Mayes, W)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Aiken County. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(Devlin, Chadwick)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 12/4/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/13/2019. (asni, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/3/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/17/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/17/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/27/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/26/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/28/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/28/2019, Discovery due by 11/27/2019, Motion in Limine due by 3/6/2020, Motions due by 12/11/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/6/2020, Pretrial Briefs due by 3/31/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 4/7/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/13/2019. (asni, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company.(asni, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Angela Walls by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company.(asni, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Aiken County, case number 2019-CP-02-00336. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8501720), filed by Brighthouse Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walls v. Brighthouse Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Walls
Represented By: Bradley Allen Brodie
Represented By: W Daniel Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brighthouse Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Don Lawrence Kristinik, III
Represented By: Chadwick S Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?