Smith v. Ryder Integrated Logistics Inc et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Joseph Smith
Defendant: Donnelle Henry Nock, Ryder System Inc and Ryder Integrated Logistics Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01753
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert McNair Peele, III on behalf of Wayne Joseph Smith (Peele, Robert)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Counterclaim #13 by Wayne Joseph Smith.(Lanford, Bradley)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 1/9/2020, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/22/2019. (asni, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Ryder Integrated Logistics Inc, Donnelle Henry Nock by Ryder Integrated Logistics Inc. (Highfield, Duke)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/6/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/20/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 8/20/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/30/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/30/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/2/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/2/2019, Discovery due by 1/2/2020, Motion in Limine due by 3/6/2020, Motions due by 1/16/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/6/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 4/7/2020. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/17/2019. (mbro, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Donnelle Henry Nock, Ryder Integrated Logistics Inc.(Highfield, Duke)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Donnelle Henry Nock, Ryder Integrated Logistics Inc.(Highfield, Duke)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Wayne Joseph Smith. All Defendants. (Lanford, Bradley)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Donnelle Henry Nock. (asni, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ryder Integrated Logistics Inc. (asni, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Wayne Joseph Smith. Service due by 9/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Lanford, Bradley)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wayne Joseph Smith.(asni, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Donnelle Henry Nock. (asni, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ryder System Inc. (asni, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donnelle Henry Nock, Ryder System Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8514136.), filed by Wayne Joseph Smith. Service due by 9/17/2019(asni, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Ryder Integrated Logistics Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Joseph Smith
Represented By: Bradley L Lanford
Represented By: Kenneth E Berger
Represented By: R Scott Wallinger, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnelle Henry Nock
Represented By: Jonathan F Krell
Represented By: Jeffrey Wayne Buncher, Jr
Represented By: Gregory D Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder System Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryder Integrated Logistics Inc
Represented By: William O Sweeny, IV
Represented By: Brandt Robert Horton
Represented By: Duke Raleigh Highfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?