Morales v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Maricela Morales
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administrative Record
Case Number: 1:2019cv01985
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maricela Morales. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 9/9/2019, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 1/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Pacella, Mario)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 08/22/2019. (bshr, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Maricela Morales.. (Pacella, Mario)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 7/19/19. (vhor)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew R McGarry ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8563114) by Maricela Morales. Response to Motion due by 8/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application to Admit Pro Hac Vice for Matthew R McGarry, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Matthew R McGarry)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(Pacella, Mario)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Commissioner of Social Security Administration, #2 Summons - US Attorney's Office)(bshr, )
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 7/17/19. (vhor)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Maricela Morales. Response to Motion due by 7/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(bshr, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Maricela Morales. Service due by 10/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Appeals Council Action)(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maricela Morales
Represented By: Mario A Pacella
Represented By: Matthew R McGarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administrative Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?