Jones v. BOP Director, The et al
Plaintiff: William Jones and William Lee Jones
Defendant: Beaumont USP, Pollock USP, McCreary USP, Victorville USP, Atwater USP, Terre Haute, Allenwood USP, And All 7 BOP Instititions, The BOP Director, BOP Director, The, Terre Haute USP, Wardens at all 7 Institutions, The, R. Maldanado and B. Eberle
Case Number: 1:2019cv02118
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #11 Order - 1983 - No Service, #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and IFP Application placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to William Jones, 25468-171, PO Box 26030, Beaumont, TX 77720. (lbak)
September 10, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this case be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. If Plaintiff notifies the court within the time set for filing objections to this Report and Recommendation that he wishes to continue with this case and either pays the filing fee or submits an application to proceed in forma pauperis, the Clerk is directed to vacate this Report and recommendation and return the file to the undersigned for further handling. If, however, no objections are filed, the Clerk shall forward this Report and Recommendation to the district judge for disposition. Objections to R&R due by 9/24/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/10/2019. (lbak)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/10/2019. (lbak)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William Jones. (Best image available) (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope 1, #3 Envelope 2) (lbak)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED 4 Proper Form Order, 5 Order, standard prisoner complaint form, IFP Application, one Summons and eight Forms USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to William Jones, 25468-171, PO Box 26030, Beaumont, TX 77720. **Prisoner number has been modified to match that of the bop.gov and the number listed next to the signature vs. the number on the first page of the complaint.**(lbak)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Addressee: William Jones. Document Returned: #4 Proper Form Order and #5 Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #4 Proper Form Order, #5 Order, standard prisoner complaint form, IFP Application, one Summons and eight Forms USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to William Jones, 2568-171, PO Box 26030, Beaumont, TX 77720. (lbak)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE Plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his #1 complaint by filing an amended complaint by august 23, 2019, along with any appropriate service documents. Plaintiff is reminded an amended complaint replaced the original complaint and should be complete in itself. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to cure the deficiencies identified above, the undersigned will recommend to the district court that the claims be dismissed without leave for further amendment.( Specific Document due by 8/23/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/2/2019. (lbak)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 8/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/2/2019. (lbak)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allenwood USP, All 7 BOP Instititions, Atwater USP, BOP Director, The, Beaumont USP, McCreary USP, Pollock USP, Terre Haute, Victorville USP, filed by William Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak) Modified on 7/30/2019 to edit text. (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. BOP Director, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lee Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beaumont USP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pollock USP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCreary USP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victorville USP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwater USP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terre Haute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allenwood USP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: And All 7 BOP Instititions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The BOP Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOP Director, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terre Haute USP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wardens at all 7 Institutions, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Maldanado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Eberle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?