Mims v. Res-Care, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stacy V. Mims
Defendant: Res-Care, Inc. and Res-Care Home Care
Case Number: 1:2019cv02214
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Report due by 10/22/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/17/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/16/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/18/2020, Discovery due by 4/15/2020, Motions due by 4/30/2020, ADR Statement due by 6/1/2020, Mediation Due by 6/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/18/2019. (lbak)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Res-Care Home Care, Res-Care, Inc..(Evert, Jill)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/17/19. (vhor)
September 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by LaToi D. Mayo ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8673313) by Res-Care Home Care, Res-Care, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 10/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit for Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(Evert, Jill)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Res-Care Home Care, Res-Care, Inc..(Evert, Jill)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stacy V. Mims. Affidavit of Service All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to AOS)(Freeman, William)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise plead is September 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/26/19. (vhor)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Res-Care Home Care, Res-Care, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 9/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(Evert, Jill)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill April Evert on behalf of Res-Care Home Care, Res-Care, Inc. (Evert, Jill)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Res-Care Home Care, Res-Care, Inc. (bgoo)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stacy V. Mims. (bgoo)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Stacy V. Mims. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8601935.) Service due by 11/5/2019 (bgoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mims v. Res-Care, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Res-Care, Inc.
Represented By: LaToi D. Mayo
Represented By: Jill April Evert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Res-Care Home Care
Represented By: Jill April Evert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy V. Mims
Represented By: David Nelson Lyon
Represented By: William C Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?