In Re: Sean C. Ferrero
Appellee: United States Trustee
In Re: Amanda T. Boatwright
Appellant: Sean C. Ferrero
Trustee: William K Stephenson, Jr
Case Number: 1:2019cv02292
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY by Sean C. Ferrero to #4 Proper Form Order. (lbak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2019: #1 Envelope) (lbak, ).
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #4 Proper Form Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Sean C. Ferrero, PO Box 144, Jamul, CA 91935. (lbak)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 10/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/20/2019. (lbak)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATED RECORD(BANKRUPTCY) by Bankruptcy Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet and transmit documents 42, 43, 46, 48, 51, 52)(dlee-USBK, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-00684-HB., filed by Sean C. Ferrero. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal) (lbak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2019: #2 Amended Transmittal of Notice of Appeal) (lbak, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Sean C. Ferrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: United States Trustee
Represented By: John Timothy Stack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Amanda T. Boatwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sean C. Ferrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: William K Stephenson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?