Mosley v. Mueller
Plaintiff: Joshua David Mosley and Joshua Mosley
Defendant: Steve Mueller, Mr. Anderson and Mrs. Wells
Case Number: 1:2019cv02383
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Mosley. Anderson served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019; Steve Mueller served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019; Wells served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (lbak)
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Anderson, Steve Mueller, Wells. Service due by 12/16/2019 (lbak)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Order 1983 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Joshua Mosley, 20110965, Cherokee County Det. Center, 315 E. Dr. LM Rosemond Ln., Gaffney, SC 29340. (lbak)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER authorizing service of process. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Plaintiff is also directed to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/16/2019. (lbak) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/17/2019 with corrected scan of document.) (lbak)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Anderson, Steve Mueller, Wells, filed by Joshua Mosley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, #7 Order, standard prisoner complaint form and one Form USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Joshua David Mosley, 20110965, Cherokee Co Detention Center, 315 E. Dr. LM Rosemond Ln., Gaffney, SC 29340. (lbak)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE Plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his #1 complaint by filing an amended complaint by September 20, 2019, along with any appropriate service documents. Plaintiff is reminded that an amended complaint replaces the original complaint and should be complete in itself. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to cure the deficiencies identified above, the undersigned will recommend to the district court that the claims be dismissed without leave for further amendment. (Specific Document due by 9/20/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/30/2019. (lbak)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 9/20/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Motion granted: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 8/30/2019. (lbak)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Joshua David Mosley. Response to Motion due by 9/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steve Mueller, filed by Joshua David Mosley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosley v. Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua David Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?