South Carolina, State of et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: South Carolina, State of, South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control and Savannah River Maritime Commission
Defendant: Major General Diana M Holland, Lt General Todd T Semonite, Ryan McCarthy, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Army Corps of Engineers Savannah District and Colonel Daniel H Hibner
Intervenor Plaintiff: Augusta, Georgia
Intervenor Defendant: Georgia Ports Authority
Case Number: 1:2019cv03132
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER The Defendants, with the consent of the Plaintiffs, have moved for the following (1) an extension of time for Defendants to file a response to Plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment until February 13, 2020; (2) an extension of time for Plaintiffs to reply and/or file a response to any cross motion by Defendants until March 6, 2020; (3) an extension of time for Defendants to file a reply to any opposition of Plaintiffs to any cross motion until March 27, 2020; and (4) an extension of time for Defendants to file an answer until 14 days after the Court rules on any dispositive motions, including motions to dismiss and summary judgment, should any issues remain undecided. (Dkt. No. 14). For good cause shown, the consent motion is granted. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/30/2019.(sshe, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER The City of Augusta, Georgia has moved to intervene in this action. (Dkt. No. 6). The State and Federal parties have indicated they do not take a position on this motion. (Dkt. Nos. 11, 13). For good cause shown, the motion to intervene (Dkt. No. #6 ) is granted. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/30/2019.(sshe, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Georgia Ports Authority.(Barker, Rita)
December 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene by Georgia Ports Authority. Response to Motion due by 1/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A- Proposed Answer)No proposed order.(Barker, Rita)
December 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial), #1 Complaint,,,, by Daniel H Hibner, Diana M Holland, Ryan McCarthy, Todd T Semonite, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Army Corps of Engineers Savannah District. Response to Motion due by 1/6/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Drake, Beth)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Intervene Response filed by Daniel H Hibner, Diana M Holland, Ryan McCarthy, Todd T Semonite, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Army Corps of Engineers Savannah District.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/27/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Sullivan, Sally)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) by Savannah River Maritime Commission, South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control, South Carolina, State of. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Corps Water Quality and Envtl. Mgmt. for Corps Civil Works Projects, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - September 30, 2019 Corps Press Release)No proposed order.(Johnston, Chad)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Intervene Response filed by Savannah River Maritime Commission, South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control, South Carolina, State of.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/27/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Johnston, Chad)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Marie Hill on behalf of Daniel H Hibner, Diana M Holland, Ryan McCarthy, Todd T Semonite, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Army Corps of Engineers Savannah District (Hill, Leslie)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sally J Sullivan on behalf of Daniel H Hibner, Diana M Holland, Ryan McCarthy, Todd T Semonite, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Army Corps of Engineers Savannah District (Sullivan, Sally)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Augusta, Georgia.(Fletcher, John)
December 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Intervene by Augusta, Georgia. Response to Motion due by 12/20/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Complaint in Intervention, #2 Exhibit A to Complaint in Intervention - IPAAR and SEA, #3 Exhibit B to Complaint in Intervention - Corps. App. Memo, #4 Exhibit C to Complaint in Intervention - FONSI, #5 Exhibit D1 to Complaint in Intervention - Cover Letter, #6 Exhibit D2 to Complaint in Intervention - Legal Comments, #7 Exhibit D3 to Complaint in Intervention - Technical Comments, #8 Exhibit E to Complaint in Intervention - 2011 Biological Opinion, #9 Exhibit F to Complaint in Intervention - Chief's Report, #10 Exhibit G to Complaint in Intervention - SHEP Settlement Agreement, #11 Exhibit H to Complaint in Intervention - SHEP Settlement Order, #12 Exhibit I - to Complaint in Intervention - USGS Surface Water Daily Statistic, #13 Exhibit J to Complaint in Intervention - USGS Water Summaries, #14 Exhibit K to Complaint in Intervention - 2017 Second Amended Biological Opinion, #15 Exhibit L to Complaint in Intervention - SEA Appendix A-4, Engineering, #16 Exhibit M to Complaint in Intervention - SCAG Opinion, #17 Exhibit N to Complaint in Intervention - SRMC Letter, #18 Exhibit O to Complaint in Intervention - Congressional Letter, #19 Exhibit P to Complaint in Intervention - Transcript, #20 Exhibit Q to Complaint in Intervention - Final IEPRR, #21 Exhibit R to Complaint in Intervention - Corps Letter to SCAG, #22 Exhibit S - Corps News Release, #23 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Fletcher, John)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Drake on behalf of Daniel H Hibner, Diana M Holland, Ryan McCarthy, Todd T Semonite, United States Army Corps of Engineers, United States Army Corps of Engineers Savannah District (Drake, Beth)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Savannah River Maritime Commission, South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control, South Carolina, State of.(sshe, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (sshe, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8758692.), filed by South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control, Savannah River Maritime Commission, South Carolina, State of. Service due by 2/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Supplemental Envtl Assessment, #3 Exhibit B - Corps Approval Memo, #4 Exhibit C - Finding of No Significant Impact, #5 Exhibit D - Easement, #6 Exhibit E - Biological Opinion, #7 Exhibit F - Chiefs Report, #8 Exhibit G - Settlement Agreement, #9 Exhibit H - Settlement Order, #10 Exhibit I - USGS Daily Statistic, #11 Exhibit J - USGS Water-Year Summaries, #12 Exhibit K - Second Amended Biological Opinion, #13 Exhibit L - SEA Appendix A-4, #14 Exhibit M - SC Attorney General Opinion, #15 Exhibit N - Commission Letter, #16 Exhibit O - Congressional Letter, #17 Exhibit P - Governor McMaster Letter, #18 Exhibit Q - Final Independent External Peer Review Report, #19 Exhibit R - SCAG letter to Corps, #20 Exhibit S - Corps letter to SCAG, #21 Exhibit T - Corps News Release)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Carolina, State of et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major General Diana M Holland
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hill
Represented By: Sally J Sullivan
Represented By: Beth Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt General Todd T Semonite
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hill
Represented By: Sally J Sullivan
Represented By: Beth Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan McCarthy
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hill
Represented By: Sally J Sullivan
Represented By: Beth Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hill
Represented By: Sally J Sullivan
Represented By: Beth Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers Savannah District
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hill
Represented By: Sally J Sullivan
Represented By: Beth Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonel Daniel H Hibner
Represented By: Leslie Marie Hill
Represented By: Sally J Sullivan
Represented By: Beth Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina, State of
Represented By: Chad Nicholas Johnston
Represented By: Randy Lowell
Represented By: Thomas Parkin C Hunter
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Represented By: Robert Dewayne Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina Department of Health and Environmental Control
Represented By: Chad Nicholas Johnston
Represented By: Randy Lowell
Represented By: Thomas Parkin C Hunter
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Represented By: Stephen Philip Hightower
Represented By: Robert Dewayne Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savannah River Maritime Commission
Represented By: Chad Nicholas Johnston
Represented By: Randy Lowell
Represented By: Thomas Parkin C Hunter
Represented By: Alan Wilson
Represented By: Robert Dewayne Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Augusta, Georgia
Represented By: Morris Dawes Cooke, Jr
Represented By: John William Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Georgia Ports Authority
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Represented By: Gregory J English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?