Johnson v. Herrick et al
Plaintiff: Joel Johnson
Defendant: Sky Media, LLC, Greg Herrick and Greg Herrick Sky Media, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03269
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY by Greg Herrick Sky Media, LLC to #17 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lightsey, Wallace)
January 17, 2020 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #17 Order, #15 Roseboro Order, and #16 Scheduling Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Joel Johnson 3048 Hackamore Drive Warrenville, SC 29851 (mmcd)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER directing each legal representative entering an appearance in this matter on behalf of any defendant to complete a Defendant's Certification and file it with the court within seven (7) days from the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if any party disagrees with the court's construction of the Plaintiff's claims, he or she may file an appropriate motion with the court within seven (7) days from the date of this order. (Defendant's Certification due by 1/24/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 1/17/2020. (mmcd)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/14/2020, Discovery due by 5/14/2020, Motions due by 6/15/2020, and Mediation Due by 7/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 1/17/2020. (mmcd)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #12 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by 2/18/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 1/17/2020. (mmcd)
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Greg Herrick Sky Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Jefferson, Meliah) (Main Document 13 and Attachment 1 replaced on 1/16/2020 with corrected documents provided by the filing user.) (bgoo)
January 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss or, In the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by Greg Herrick Sky Media, LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Jefferson, Meliah) (Main Document 12, Attachment 1, and Attachment 2 replaced on 1/16/2020 with corrected documents provided by the filing user.) (bgoo)
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #1 Complaint, #10 Summons Issued, #9 Order Service - Non-Inmate, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Joel Johnson 3048 Hackamore Drive Warrenville, SC 29851 (mmcd)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Greg Herrick Sky Media, LLC. Service due by 3/16/2020 (mmcd)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER authorizing clerk of court to issue the summons to plaintiff for service of process and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/16/19. (mmcd)
November 21, 2019 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Report on the Filing or Determination of Copyright placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Register of Copyrights, US Copyright Office, 101 Independence Ave., S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000 (bgoo)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (bgoo)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joel Johnson. (mmcd)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Joel Johnson. (Filing fee $400 receipt number SCX300084647.) (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents) (mmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Herrick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Media, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Herrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Herrick Sky Media, LLC
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?