Mays v. North Augusta, City of et al
Plaintiff: Loretta Mays
Defendant: North Augusta, City of, Todd Glover and Cammie Hayes
Case Number: 1:2019cv03499
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loretta Mays. North Augusta, City of served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. Filing corrected for event type. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (lbak)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Todd Glover, Cammie Hayes, North Augusta, City of.(Matthews, Eugene)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 1/27/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 2/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/16/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/15/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/15/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/15/2020, Discovery due by 7/14/2020, Motions due by 7/29/2020, ADR Statement due by 8/31/2020, Mediation Due by 9/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/6/2019. (lbak)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 6 Reason: Attorney refiled instead of submitting corrected document via email as directed. Corrected Filing Document Number #7 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: 12/29/2019. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A (lbak)
December 29, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Loretta Mays.(Walls, Tyrone) Modified on 12/30/2019 to correct filing date.(lbak)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/16/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 4/15/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 5/15/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 5/15/2020, Discovery due by 7/14/2020, Motions due by 7/29/2020, ADR Statement due by 8/31/2020, Mediation Due by 9/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/17/2019. (lbak)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Todd Glover, Cammie Hayes, North Augusta, City of.(Matthews, Eugene)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Todd Glover, Cammie Hayes, North Augusta, City of. (lbak)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Aiken Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-02-02879. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8832735), filed by Todd Glover, North Augusta, City of, Cammie Hayes. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mays v. North Augusta, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Augusta, City of
Represented By: Eugene H Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Glover
Represented By: Eugene H Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cammie Hayes
Represented By: Eugene H Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Mays
Represented By: Tyrone J Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?