Hinson v. South Carolina Department of Corrections, The et al
Plaintiff: Gartharee Hinson
Defendant: Uniqueqa Akeema James, South Carolina Department of Corrections, The and Warden Aaron Joyner
Case Number: 1:2020cv02094
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Federal Claim by Gartharee Hinson. (Hayes, Scott)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Uniqueqa Akeema James. Response to Motion due by 6/25/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One - Declaration of Sherman Anderson)No proposed order.Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(Balthazor, Peter)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by South Carolina Department of Corrections, The. Response to Motion due by 6/23/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Shiva V Hodges.(Balthazor, Peter)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Uniqueqa Akeema James.(Balthazor, Peter)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (lbak)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by South Carolina Department of Corrections, The. (lbak)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Uniqueqa Akeema James, South Carolina Department of Corrections, The. (lbak)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County of Richland Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-40-00599. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9134680), filed by South Carolina Department of Corrections, The, Uniqueqa Akeema James. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinson v. South Carolina Department of Corrections, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniqueqa Akeema James
Represented By: Peter M Balthazor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Corrections, The
Represented By: Peter M Balthazor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Aaron Joyner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gartharee Hinson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?