Palmer v. Centerra Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tracy A. Palmer
Defendant: Centerra Group, LLC, Charles Shoup, Steve Healy and Joshua Herring
Case Number: 1:2020cv02120
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Referring Judge: Thomas E Rogers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Terry Savitz on behalf of Centerra Group, LLC, Steve Healy, Joshua Herring, Charles Shoup (Savitz, Stephen)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/29/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/12/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 8/12/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/7/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/4/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/2/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/2/2020, Discovery due by 1/27/2021, Motion in Limine due by 6/15/2021, Motions due by 2/10/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/21/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 7/6/2021, ADR Statement due by 3/9/2021, Mediation Due by 4/7/2021. Parties shall file pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas E Rogers, III on 07/08/2020. (dsto, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Centerra Group, LLC, Steve Healy, Joshua Herring, Charles Shoup.(Johnson, Christopher)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Centerra Group, LLC, Steve Healy, Joshua Herring, Charles Shoup.(Johnson, Christopher)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Centerra Group, LLC, Steve Healy, Joshua Herring, Charles Shoup. Service due by 9/2/2020. (dsto, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Tracy A. Palmer.(dsto, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Centerra Group, LLC, Steve Healy, Joshua Herring, Charles Shoup (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9136481), filed by Tracy A. Palmer. Service due by 9/2/2020.(dsto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Centerra Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerra Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Shoup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy A. Palmer
Represented By: Jack Emerson Cohoon
Represented By: Grant Burnette LeFever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?