Mazyck v. Robinson et al
Plaintiff: Jamin Mazyck
Defendant: National Legal Professional Associates, Ms. Susan Troutt, Ms. Margaret A. Robinson and Mr. Hugh W. Robinson
Case Number: 1:2020cv02126
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Anderson
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 16 Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Jamin Mazyck 238056 610 Highway 9 West Bennettsville, SC 29512. (mmcd)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to the court's June 11, 2020 orders is now August 19, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 7/29/20. (vhor)
July 22, 2020 Filing 15 Letter from Jamin Mazyck. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (lbak,)
July 22, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY by Jamin Mazyck to 12 Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 12 Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Jamin Mazyck, 238056, 610 Highway 9 West, Bennettsville, SC 29512. (lbak)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to the court's prior orders is now July 23, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 7/7/20. (vhor)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY by Jamin Mazyck to #8 Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)
June 11, 2020 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #7 Proper Form Order, #8 Order, blank standard complaint form and four Forms USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Jamin Mazyck, 238056, 610 Highway 9 West, Bennettsville, SC 29512. (lbak/kbos)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE Plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his #1 complaint by filing an amended complaint by July 2, 2020, along with any appropriate service documents. Plaintiff is reminded an amended complaint replaces the original and should be complete in itself. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint or fails to cure the deficiencies identified above, the undersigned will recommend to the district court that the claims be dismissed without leave for further amendment. (Specific Document due by 7/2/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 6/11/2020. (lbak)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPER FORM ORDER (Case to be brought into proper form by 7/2/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.) Motion granted: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 6/11/2020. (lbak)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (lbak)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Jamin Mazyck. Response to Motion due by 6/17/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope 1, #3 Envelope 2) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Legal Professional Associates, Hugh W. Robinson, Margaret A. Robinson, Susan Troutt, filed by Jamin Mazyck. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Supporting Documents, #3 Misc. Envelopes included with Complaint, #4 Envelope 1, #5 Envelope 2) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazyck v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Legal Professional Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Susan Troutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Margaret A. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Hugh W. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamin Mazyck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?