Williams et al v. Centerra Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Barrett, Jamie Coomes, Malcum Kenner, Shawn Williams and David Green
Defendant: Deborah F. Ricci, Paul P. Donahue, Benefit Plan Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The, Investment Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The, John Does 1-10, Centerra Group, LLC, Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting, Inc. and Marcia Aldrich
Case Number: 1:2020cv04220
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Referring Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER granting #41 Motion for Heather Lea to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #42 Motion for Troy A. Doles to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Both on behalf of Shawn Williams, David Green, Jamie Coomes, Malcum Kenner, and Andrew Barrett. Directed by Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on 1/27/2021.(ahil)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Troy Andrew Doles ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9608922) by Andrew Barrett, Jamie Coomes, David Green, Malcum Kenner, Shawn Williams. Response to Motion due by 2/9/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice - Doles, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Certificate of Good Standing - MO, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Certificate of Good Standing - IL)No proposed order.(Richardson, Beth) (Main Document 42, Attachment 1, Attachment 2, and Attachment 3 replaced as provided by filing user on 1/27/2021) (ahil).
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Heather Lea ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9608859) by Andrew Barrett, Jamie Coomes, David Green, Malcum Kenner, Shawn Williams. Response to Motion due by 2/9/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice - Lea, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Certificate of Good Standing - MO, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Certificate of Good Standing - IL)No proposed order.(Richardson, Beth) (Main Document 41, Attachment 1, Attachment 2, and Attachment 3 replaced as provided by filing user on 1/27/2021) (ahil). Modified on 1/27/2021 (ahil, ).
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Deborah F. Riccis deadline to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to February 22, 2021.Issued at the direction of Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 1/25/2021.(ahil)
January 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Deborah F. Ricci. Response to Motion due by 2/8/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Lay, John)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER granting #36 Motion for Charles F. Seemann III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Centerra Group, LLC, The Benefit Plan Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, and The Investment Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC. Issued at the direction of the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on 1/21/2021. (ahil) Modified on 1/22/2021 to add text (ahil).
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER granting #35 Motion for Rene E. Thorne to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Centerra Group, LLC, The Benefit Plan Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, and The Investment Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC. Issued at the Direction of the Honorable Sherri A. Lydon on 01/21/2021.(ahil) Modified on 1/22/2021 to add text (ahil).
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Charles F. Seemann III ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9599382) by Benefit Plan Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The, Centerra Group, LLC, Investment Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The. Response to Motion due by 2/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Sulau, John)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rene E. Thorne ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9599256) by Benefit Plan Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The, Centerra Group, LLC, Investment Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The. Response to Motion due by 2/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate pf Good Standing)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Sulau, John)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER granting #31 and #33 Motions for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendants Paul P. Donahue and Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting, Inc. to answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to February 22, 2021. Additionally, Plaintiffs deadline to respond to any motion or other pleading filed by Defendants in response to the complaint is extended to March 29, 2021. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 1/19/2021. (lgib, )
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 1/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Tamasitis, John)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.; granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by the Honorable Sherri A Lydon on 1/15/2021. (lgib, )
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Paul P. Donahue. Response to Motion due by 1/28/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Sulau, John)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William D. Pollak ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0420-9589082) by Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 1/28/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission for W. Pollak, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for admission Pro Hac Vice of W. Pollak)No proposed order.(Tamasitis, John)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Sherri A Lydon. Judge Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, )
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Green, Malcum Kenner, Andrew Barrett, Shawn Williams, Jamie Coomes. Deborah F. Ricci served on 1/5/2021, answer due 1/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Proof of Service - Deborah F Ricci)(Richardson, Beth) Modified to add filers listed on document and to edit text on 1/12/2021 (cbru, ).
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Green, Malcum Kenner, Andrew Barrett, Shawn Williams, Jamie Coomes. Paul P. Donahue served on 1/9/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Proof of Service - Paul P Donahue)(Richardson, Beth) Modified to add filers listed on document and to edit text on 1/12/2021 (cbru, ).
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendants' motion for extension of time to respond to Plaintiffs' complaint #17 . Defendants request the Court, pursuant to Rule 6(b)(1)(B) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 6.01, extend their time to answer Plaintiffs' complaint through and including February 22, 2021. Plaintiffs oppose Defendants' motion and contend Defendants have failed to show good cause to warrant such an extension. After reviewing Defendants' motion #17 , Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition #18 , and Defendants' Reply #25 , the record, and the relevant law, the Court GRANTS AS MODIFIED Defendants' motion. Not later than February 22, 2021, Defendants Marcia Aldrich; The Benefit Plan Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC; Centerra Group, LLC; and The Investment Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. Given the length of this extension, however, no further extensions of this deadline will be granted as to those Defendants. As Defendant Paul P. Donahue has not been served and, therefore, does not yet have a deadline to answer or otherwise respond, the Court declines to grant an extension to that Defendant. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Marcia Aldrich answer due 2/22/2021; Benefit Plan Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The answer due 2/22/2021; Centerra Group, LLC answer due 2/22/2021; Investment Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The answer due 2/22/2021) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 1/6/2021. (cbru, )
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Response filed by Marcia Aldrich, Benefit Plan Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The, Centerra Group, LLC, Paul P. Donahue, Investment Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The. (Sulau, John)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Marcia Aldrich, Benefit Plan Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The, Centerra Group, LLC, Paul P. Donahue, Investment Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The.(Sulau, John)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting, Inc..(Hershon, Lawrence)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting, Inc..(Hershon, Lawrence)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting, Inc. answer due 1/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Letter Granting Extension to File Answer and/or Response)(Tamasitis, John) Modified to edit text on 1/4/2021 (cbru, ).
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Green, Malcum Kenner, Andrew Barrett, Shawn Williams, Jamie Coomes. Marcia Aldrich served on 12/28/2020, answer due 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service on Marcia Aldrich)(Richardson, Beth)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Response filed by Andrew Barrett, Jamie Coomes, David Green, Malcum Kenner, Shawn Williams.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/5/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - December 18, 2020 correspondence with Rene Thorne)(Richardson, Beth)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Marcia Aldrich, Benefit Plan Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The, Centerra Group, LLC, Paul P. Donahue, Investment Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The. Response to Motion due by 1/11/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Sulau, John)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nathan H. Emmons (Filing fee $350 receipt number 0420-9540140) by Shawn Williams, David Green, Malcum Kenner, Andrew Barrett, Jamie Coomes. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Application/Affidavit and Certificates of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Richardson, Beth) Modified to add filers listed on document and to edit text on 12/18/2020 (cbru, ).
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kurt Charles Struckhoff (Filing fee $350 receipt number 0420-9540111) by Shawn Williams, David Green, Malcum Kenner, Andrew Barrett, Jamie Coomes. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Application/Affidavit and Certificates of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Richardson, Beth) Modified to add filers listed on document and to edit text on 12/18/2020 (cbru, ).
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Williams, David Green, Malcum Kenner, Andrew Barrett, Jamie Coomes. Investment Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The served on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Affidavit of Service on The Investment Committee of the Centerra Group)(Richardson, Beth) Modified to add filers listed on document and to edit text on 12/17/2020 (cbru, ).
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Williams, David Green, Malcum Kenner, Andrew Barrett, Jamie Coomes. Centerra Group, LLC served on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Affidavit of Service on Centerra Group, LLC)(Richardson, Beth) Modified to add filers listed on document and to edit text on 12/17/2020 (cbru, ).
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Williams, David Green, Malcum Kenner, Andrew Barrett, Jamie Coomes. Benefit Plan Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The served on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Affidavit of Service on The Benefit Plan Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC)(Richardson, Beth) Modified to add filers listed on document and to edit text on 12/17/2020 (cbru, ).
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shawn Williams, David Green, Malcum Kenner, Andrew Barrett, Jamie Coomes. Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting, Inc. served on 12/9/2020, answer due 12/30/2020. (Attachments: #1Ex. A - Affidavit of Service on Aon Hewitt Investment)(Richardson, Beth) Modified to add filers listed on document and to edit text on 12/17/2020 (cbru, ).
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Marcia Aldrich. (cbru, )
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Deborah F. Ricci. (cbru, )
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Paul P. Donahue. (cbru, )
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting, Inc. (cbru, )
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Investment Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The. (cbru, )
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Benefit Plan Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The. (cbru, )
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Centerra Group, LLC. (cbru, )
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Andrew Barrett, Jamie Coomes, David Green, Malcum Kenner, Shawn Williams.(cbru, )
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marcia Aldrich, Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting, Inc., Benefit Plan Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The, Centerra Group, LLC, John Does 1-10, Paul P. Donahue, Investment Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The, Deborah F. Ricci (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-9512959) filed by David Green, Malcum Kenner, Andrew Barrett, Shawn Williams, Jamie Coomes. Service due by 3/4/2021(cbru, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/7/2020) (cbru, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. Centerra Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah F. Ricci
Represented By: John T Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul P. Donahue
Represented By: John Sulau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benefit Plan Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The
Represented By: Rene E Thorne
Represented By: Charles F Seemann, III
Represented By: John Sulau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Investment Committee of the Centerra Group, LLC, The
Represented By: Rene E Thorne
Represented By: Charles F Seemann, III
Represented By: John Sulau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerra Group, LLC
Represented By: Rene E Thorne
Represented By: Charles F Seemann, III
Represented By: John Sulau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aon Hewitt Investment Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence Michael Hershon
Represented By: William D Pollak
Represented By: John Gwilym Tamasitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Aldrich
Represented By: John Sulau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Barrett
Represented By: Beth B Richardson
Represented By: Nathan H Emmons
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Kurt Charles Struckhoff
Represented By: Troy A Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Coomes
Represented By: Beth B Richardson
Represented By: Nathan H Emmons
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Kurt Charles Struckhoff
Represented By: Troy A Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malcum Kenner
Represented By: Beth B Richardson
Represented By: Nathan H Emmons
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Kurt Charles Struckhoff
Represented By: Troy A Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Williams
Represented By: Beth B Richardson
Represented By: Nathan H Emmons
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Kurt Charles Struckhoff
Represented By: Troy A Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Green
Represented By: Beth B Richardson
Represented By: Nathan H Emmons
Represented By: Heather Lea
Represented By: Kurt Charles Struckhoff
Represented By: Troy A Doles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?