Grant v. South Carolina, State of
Petitioner: Kesha Grant
Respondent: South Carolina, State of
Case Number: 1:2020cv04311
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #11 Report and Recommendation by Kesha Grant. Reply to Objections due by 2/25/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)
January 26, 2021 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Kesha Grant, 352697, Leath C. I., 2809 Airport Rd., Greenwood, SC 29649. (lbak/ahil)
January 25, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the court dismiss this #1 petition without prejudice and without requiring Respondent to file a return. Objections to R&R due by 2/8/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/25/2021. (lbak)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number SCX300091724. (lbak)
January 19, 2021 Filing 7 REPLY by Kesha Grant to #5 Proper Form Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Proper Form Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Kesha Grant, 352697, Leath C. I., 2809 Airport Rd., Greenwood, SC 29649. (lbak)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 1/19/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/29/2020. (lbak)
December 14, 2020 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (lbak)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Kesha Grant. Response to Motion due by 12/29/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kesha Grant. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. South Carolina, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: South Carolina, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kesha Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?