Johnson v. Orion 180 et al
Plaintiff: Carl Johnson
Defendant: Orion 180 and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2021cv02677
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 22. Reason: Multiple deficiencies. Corrected Filing Document Number #23 . Modified filing date to that of original filing: N/A - Correction made on same date as original filing. Response due date modified to that of original filing: N/A. (cbru, )
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Response filed by Carl Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Orion letter 11/15/18)(Corbett, James) Modified to edit text on 9/24/2021 (cbru, ).
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: The deadline for Plaintiff to reply to Defendant's response to his motion to remand (Dkt No. #9 ) was September 17, 2021. Plaintiff, however, has not yet filed a reply. Plaintiff is directed to file a reply to the response to said motion not later than September 27, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/27/2021) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/20/2021. (cbru, ) Modified to edit text to correct scrivener's error on 9/20/2021 (cbru, ).
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/17/2021. (cbru, )
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 10/21/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/16/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/16/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/18/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/18/2022, Discovery due by 3/16/2022, Motion in Limine due by 6/27/2022, Motions due by 3/31/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/14/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 7/18/2022, Mediation Due by 5/31/2022. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 9/17/2021. (cbru, )
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Orion 180. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Trisura Specialty Insurance Company Policy T3SC_01238926, #3 Exhibit B - Orion 180 letter to Plaintiff dated March 30, 2020, #4 Exhibit C - Notices of Recission dated March 30, 2020, #5 Exhibit D - Orion 180 letter to Plaintiff dated July 10, 2020)(Johnsen, Jennifer) Modified to edit text on 9/17/2021 (cbru, ).
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Carl Johnson.(Corbett, James)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Response filed by Orion 180.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/17/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kenneth Gregg)(Johnsen, Jennifer) Modified to edit text on 9/10/2021 (cbru, ). (Main Document 16 replaced on 9/10/2021) (cbru, ).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than September 21, 2021. (cbru, )
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER. Orion 180 answer due 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confirmation of Extension)(Ecker, Natalie) Modified to edit text on 8/31/2021 (cbru, ).
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: As previously noted in the order filed at entry 10, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 12.01, the maximum extension of time a party may grant "to any pleading asserting a claim" is 21 days. The letter filed at entry #8 referenced a 30 day extension of time to September 24, 2021. The letter filed at entry #11 referenced a 21 day extension of time to September 17, 2021. However, as that date is only seven days shy of the date in entry #8 , that would equate to a 23 day extension. Therefore, the Court does not acknowledge the extension referenced in the letter filed at entry #11 . Furthermore, any subsequent notice of a consent extension pursuant to Local Civil Rule 12.01, or motion for extension of time pursuant to Local Civil Rule 6.01, shall include the current deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise plead. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/31/2021. (cbru, )
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Orion 180 answer due 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confirmation of Extension)(Ecker, Natalie) Modified to edit text on 8/31/2021 (cbru, ).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 12.01, the maximum extension of time a party may grant "to any pleading asserting a claim" is 21 days. Therefore, the Court does not acknowledge the extension referenced in the letter filed at entry #8 . IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/30/2021. (cbru, )
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carl Johnson. Response to Motion due by 9/10/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Corbett, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2021 as provided by filer: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - to Memorandum in Support, March 30, 2020 letter) (ahil). Modified to edit text on 8/30/2021 (cbru, ).
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Orion 180 answer due 9/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Extension)(Ecker, Natalie)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPLY by Orion 180 to 4 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, . (Johnsen, Jennifer)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Aiken County. (Attachments: #1 Signed Acknowledgment of the State Court Clerk of Court of Notice of Removal)(Johnsen, Jennifer) Modified to edit text on 8/24/2021 (cbru, ).
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The parties' attention is directed to the Court's Standing Order Regarding All Removed Cases Assigned to Judge Mary Geiger Lewis, located on the District Court's website at https://www.scd.uscourts.gov/Forms/Special_Instructions/Lewis_Standing%20_Order_Regarding_Removed_Cases.pdf. Not later than seven days from the entry of this Text Order, Defendant(s) shall file the information mandated by the Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Reply due by 8/27/2021) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 8/20/2021. (cbru, )
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Orion 180.(cbru, )
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Aiken County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-02-01557 (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-10028814) filed by Orion 180. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Orion 180 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Johnson
Represented By: James J Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orion 180
Represented By: Jennifer E Johnsen
Represented By: Natalie Rae Ecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?