Protective Life Insurance Company v. Henderson et al
Plaintiff: Protective Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Rose Henderson and Diane Lee Auman
Case Number: 1:2021cv02789
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/19/2021.(cbru, )
October 19, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Service by Publication on Defendant Diane Lee Auman by Protective Life Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 11/2/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Non-Service by Bridget Williams, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Due Diligence by Clarence Portee, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Barker, Rita)
October 14, 2021 Filing 12 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/14/2021. (cbru, )
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 11/17/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/13/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/11/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/10/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/10/2022, Discovery due by 4/11/2022, Motion in Limine due by 7/25/2022, Motions due by 4/26/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/11/2022, Bench Trial Deadline 8/15/2022, Mediation Due by 6/27/2022. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 10/14/2021. (cbru, )
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Rose Henderson.(cbru, )
October 13, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John S Simmons on behalf of Rose Henderson (Simmons, John)
October 13, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Rose Henderson. (Peavy, Rachel) Modified to edit text and to remove attachment and file separately as entry #10 on 10/14/2021 (cbru, ).
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Protective Life Insurance Company. Rose Henderson served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Rose Henderson)(Barker, Rita)
August 30, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Diane Lee Auman. (cbru, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Rose Henderson. (cbru, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Protective Life Insurance Company.(cbru, )
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diane Lee Auman, Rose Henderson (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-10043268) filed by Protective Life Insurance Company. Service due by 11/29/2021(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Protective Life Insurance Company v. Henderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Protective Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rose Henderson
Represented By: John S Simmons
Represented By: Rachel G Peavy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Lee Auman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?