Brown v. Ravenell et al
Plaintiff: David Allen Brown, Jr.
Defendant: C. Ravenell, Timothy Clark, Ann Shepard, T. Ravenell, Jordan Williams, Brian Kendall, Marcus Green, Samir Brown and Desaun Draft
Case Number: 1:2021cv03134
Filed: September 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Timothy Clark, Brian Kendall, C. Ravenell, T. Ravenell, Ann Shepard, Jordan Williams.(Ganes, Elloree) (Main Document 17 replaced on 11/23/2021 with corrected document submitted by filing user.) (lbak)
November 12, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Allen Brown, Jr. Timothy Clark served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; Brian Kendall served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; C. Ravenell served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; T. Ravenell served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; Ann Shepard served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021; Jordan Williams served on 11/2/2021, answer due 11/23/2021. (lbak)
October 27, 2021 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Order 1983 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to David Allen Brown, Jr., 294883, 386 Redemption Way, McCormick, SC 29899. (lbak)
October 27, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Samir Brown, Timothy Clark, Desaun Draft, Marcus Green, Brian Kendall, C. Ravenell, T. Ravenell, Ann Shepard, Jordan Williams. Service due by 1/25/2022 (lbak) (Main Document 13 replaced on 10/27/2021 with corrected scan of document.) (lbak)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER authorizing service of process and collection of filing fee. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350.00. Plaintiff is also directed to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 10/27/2021. (lbak)
October 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by David Allen Brown, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (mmcd)
September 29, 2021 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, 7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, one Summons and nine Forms USM-285 placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to David Allen Brown, Jr., 294883, Lieber Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 205, 136 Wilborn Ave., Ridgeville, SC 29472. (lbak)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/29/2021. (lbak)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 10/20/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 9/29/2021. (lbak)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Charleston. (lbak)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by David Allen Brown, Jr. Response to Motion due by 10/12/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate, #2 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (lbak)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Samir Brown, Timothy Clark, Desaun Draft, Marcus Green, Brian Kendall, C. Ravenell, T. Ravenell, Ann Shepard, Jordan Williams, filed by David Allen Brown, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Ravenell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Ravenell
Represented By: Elloree A Ganes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Clark
Represented By: Elloree A Ganes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Shepard
Represented By: Elloree A Ganes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Ravenell
Represented By: Elloree A Ganes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Williams
Represented By: Elloree A Ganes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kendall
Represented By: Elloree A Ganes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samir Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desaun Draft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?