Colvin v. DRB Capital, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lillian Katrina Colvin
Defendant: DRB Capital, LLC, Catalina Structured Funding, Inc., Vintage Equity Group, LLC, Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC, 17-Cubs, LLC, Vanquished Gridlock, LLC and Stone Street Originations, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv03869
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2022 Filing 57 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Lillian Katrina Colvin.(Alphin, John)
December 28, 2022 Filing 56 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Stone Street Originations, LLC.(Duffy, Brian)
December 28, 2022 Filing 55 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC.(Duffy, Brian)
December 28, 2022 Filing 54 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by DRB Capital, LLC.(Hood, James)
December 28, 2022 Filing 53 Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by DRB Capital, LLC.(Hood, James)
December 28, 2022 Filing 52 Rule 26(f) Report by Lillian Katrina Colvin, Vanquished Gridlock, LLC, DRB Capital, LLC, Stone Street Originations, LLC, Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 proposed Amended Scheduling Order)(Hood, James) Modified on 12/29/2022 to include all filers as listed on document. (mdea, ).
December 28, 2022 Filing 51 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Vanquished Gridlock, LLC.(Brown, Stephen)
December 21, 2022 Filing 50 TEXT ORDER granting #49 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Rule 26.01 Inter Answers. (Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by DRB Capital, LLC due by 1/3/2023) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/21/2022. (cbru, )
December 20, 2022 Filing 49 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Rule 26.01 Inter Answers by DRB Capital, LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Hood, James)
December 20, 2022 Filing 48 TEXT ORDER: Defendant DRB Capital, LLC's (DRB Capital) #47 motion for extension of time is DENIED. DRB Capital states no reason for the extension in its motion. See Local Civil Rule 6.01 (explaining motions to alter time must be "accompanied by an affidavit or other statement giving the reasons therefor"). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/20/2022.(cbru, )
December 20, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to amend 26.01s per 12/06/22 Text Order #38 by DRB Capital, LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Hood, Robert)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DISMISSING CASE as to 17-Cubs, LLC and Catalina Structured Funding, Inc. without costs and without prejudice to the right of any party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/20/2022. (cbru, )
December 19, 2022 Filing 45 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Vanquished Gridlock, LLC.(Brown, Stephen)
December 19, 2022 Filing 44 Second Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC.(Duffy, Brian)
December 19, 2022 Filing 43 Second Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stone Street Originations, LLC.(Duffy, Brian)
December 8, 2022 Filing 42 TEXT ORDER: In their amended answers to the Local Civil Rule 26.01 interrogatories, Defendants Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC, and Stone Street Origination, LLC, included answers to Interrogatory H that appear unresponsive. See Central West Virginia Energy Co., Inc. v. Mountain State Carbon, LLC, 636 F.3d 101, 103 (4th Cir. 2011) ("For purposes of diversity jurisdiction, the citizenship of a limited liability company... is determined by the citizenship of all its members"). Accordingly, those Defendants shall file second amended answers to the Local Civil Rule 26.01 interrogatories no later than December 20, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Second Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories due by 12/20/2022) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/8/2022. (cbru, )
December 7, 2022 Filing 41 AMENDED Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stone Street Originations, LLC.(Duffy, Brian)
December 7, 2022 Filing 40 AMENDED Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC.(Duffy, Brian)
December 7, 2022 Filing 39 Amended Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lillian Katrina Colvin.(Alphin, John) Modified to edit text on 12/7/2022 (cbru, ).
December 6, 2022 Filing 38 TEXT ORDER: On December 1, 2022, Local Civil Rule 26.01 was amended to include Interrogatory H, which is to be answered in any an action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). Therefore, all parties shall file amended answers to the Local Civil Rule 26.01 interrogatories to include answers to Interrogatory H no later than December 20, 2022. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories due by 12/20/2022) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/6/2022. (cbru, )
December 6, 2022 Filing 37 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Vanquished Gridlock, LLC.(Brown, Stephen)
December 5, 2022 Filing 36 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 35. Reason: Filed in incorrect case by the Clerk. (cbru, )
December 5, 2022 Filing 34 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lillian Katrina Colvin.(Alphin, John)
December 1, 2022 Filing 33 TEXT ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint, MOTION to Compel Arbitration or in the Alternative Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration; #21 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Compel Arbitration or in the Alternative Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration; #24 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Compel Arbitration; #25 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Compel Arbitration. (Response to Motion due by 1/10/2023) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 12/1/2022.(cbru, )
December 1, 2022 Filing 32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint, MOTION to Compel Arbitration or in the Alternative Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration; #21 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Compel Arbitration or in the Alternative Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration; #24 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Compel Arbitration; #25 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Lillian Katrina Colvin. Response to Motion due by 12/15/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Solomons, Algernon) Modified to correct motion relief on 12/1/2022 (cbru, ).
November 30, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lerer Fickling on behalf of Lillian Katrina Colvin (Fickling, Jessica)
November 29, 2022 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant Vanquished Gridlock, LLC is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed at the time a party first appears. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than December 12, 2022. (cbru, )
November 29, 2022 Filing 28 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 26. Reason: Duplicate of entry #27 . (cbru, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 27 Additional Attachments to Main Document #24 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Compel Arbitration; #25 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Compel Arbitration . First attachment description: Memo in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stone Street Contract, #2 Exhibit 2 - Stone Street Contract, #3 Exhibit 3 Peachtree Contract, #4 Exhibit 4 Order Approving Transfer, #5 Exhibit 5 Order Approving Transfer, #6 Exhibit 6 Order Approving Transfer)(Duffy, Brian) Modified to edit linkage and text on 11/29/2022 (cbru, ). (Main Document 27 replaced on 11/29/2022) (cbru, ).
November 28, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Stone Street Originations, LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/12/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Duffy, Brian). Added additional motion relief on 11/29/2022 (cbru, ). Additional attachments filed as entry #27 on 11/28/2022 (cbru, ).
November 28, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/12/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Duffy, Brian). Added additional motion relief on 11/29/2022 (cbru, ). Additional attachments filed as entry #27 on 11/28/2022 (cbru, ).
November 28, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Kevin McCarrell on behalf of Vintage Equity Group, LLC (McCarrell, Michael)
November 28, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint by Vanquished Gridlock, LLC.(Brown, Stephen)
November 28, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint, MOTION to Compel Arbitration or in the Alternative Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration by Vanquished Gridlock, LLC. Response to Motion due by 12/12/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Structured Settlement Annuity Sale and Assignment Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights, #4 Exhibit C - Statement in Support and Settlement Statement, #5 Exhibit D - 11/15/21 Docusign, #6 Exhibit E - Stipulation)No proposed order.(Brown, Stephen). Modified to add additional motion relief and to edit text on 11/29/2022 (cbru, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/29/2022) (cbru, ). Modified to add descriptions to attachments on 11/29/2022 (cbru, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/29/2022) (cbru, ). (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/29/2022) (cbru, ). (Attachment 4 replaced on 11/29/2022) (cbru, ). (Attachment 6 replaced on 11/29/2022) (cbru, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/29/2022) (cbru, ).
November 28, 2022 Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (17-Cubs, LLC answer due 12/19/2022; Catalina Structured Funding, Inc. answer due 12/19/2022) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/28/2022.(cbru, )
November 28, 2022 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by 17-Cubs, LLC, Catalina Structured Funding, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 12/12/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Lay, John)
November 22, 2022 Filing 18 MEDIATION ORDER. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/22/2022. (cbru, )
November 22, 2022 Filing 17 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 12/28/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/20/2023, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/21/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/21/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/21/2023, Discovery due by 5/22/2023, Motion in Limine due by 8/31/2023, Motions due by 6/5/2023, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/18/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 9/21/2023, Mediation Due by 8/3/2023. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/22/2022. (cbru, )
November 21, 2022 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is reminded that Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are to be filed no later than 14 days after service of the notice of removal. Please file these answers to interrogatories no later than December 5, 2022. (cbru, )
November 21, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint, MOTION to Compel Arbitration or in the Alternative Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration ( Response to Motion due by 12/5/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by DRB Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Agreement dated July 4, 2018, #2 Exhibit 2 Agreement dated August 27, 2018, #3 Exhibit 3 Agreement dated August 21, 2019, #4 Exhibit 4 Agreement dated November 6, 2019, #5 Exhibit 5 Agreement dated January 30, 2020, #6 Exhibit 6 Agreement dated March 30, 2020, #7 Exhibit 7 Agreement dated June 18, 2020, #8 Exhibit 8 Agreement dated October 19, 2020, #9 Exhibit 9 Agreement dated January 13, 2021, #10 Exhibit 10 Agreement dated February 1, 2021, #11 Exhibit 11 Order filed August 8, 2018, approving the Agreement dated July 4, 2018, #12 Exhibit 12 Order filed September 21, 2018, approving the Agreement dated August 27, 2018, #13 Exhibit 13 Order filed September 18, 2019, approving the Agreement dated August 21, 2019, #14 Exhibit 14 Order filed December 4, 2019, approving the Agreement dated November 6, 2019, #15 Exhibit 15 Order filed February 28, 2020, approving the Agreement dated January 30, 2020, #16 Exhibit 16 Order filed July 21, 2020, approving the Agreement dated March 30, 2020, #17 Exhibit 17 Order filed August 12, 2020, approving the Agreement dated June 18, 2020, #18 Exhibit 18 Order filed November 24, approving the Agreement dated October 19, 2020, #19 Exhibit 19 Order filed February 25, 2021, approving the Agreement dated January 13, 2021, #20 Exhibit 20 Order filed April 1, 2021, approving the Agreement dated February 1, 2021)No proposed order.(Hood, James)
November 18, 2022 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by 17-Cubs, LLC, Catalina Structured Funding, Inc..(Lay, John)
November 14, 2022 Filing 11 REPLY by 17-Cubs, LLC, Catalina Structured Funding, Inc., DRB Capital, LLC, Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC, Stone Street Originations, LLC, Vanquished Gridlock, LLC to 5 Order,,, Set Deadlines,, . (Hood, Robert)
November 4, 2022 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stone Street Originations, LLC.(Duffy, Brian)
November 4, 2022 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC.(Duffy, Brian)
November 4, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Abernethy McKie on behalf of Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC, Stone Street Originations, LLC (McKie, Blake)
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C Duffy on behalf of Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC, Stone Street Originations, LLC (Duffy, Brian)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The parties' attention is directed to the Court's Standing Order Regarding All Removed Cases Assigned to Judge Mary Geiger Lewis, located on the District Court's website at http://www.scd.uscourts.gov/Forms/Special_Instructions/Lewis_Standing%20_Order_Regarding_Removed_Cases.pdf. Not later than seven days from the entry of this Text Order, Defendant(s) shall file the information mandated by the Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Reply due by 11/14/2022) Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 11/4/2022. (cbru, )
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DRB Capital, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories (cbru, )
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by DRB Capital, LLC.(cbru, )
November 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allendale County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP-03-00138 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-10786375) filed by DRB Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Consent for Removal)(cbru, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colvin v. DRB Capital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Katrina Colvin
Represented By: Algernon Gibson Solomons, III
Represented By: John Randall Alphin
Represented By: Susan Beth Berkowitz
Represented By: Whitney Boykin Harrison
Represented By: Jessica Lerer Fickling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRB Capital, LLC
Represented By: James B Hood
Represented By: Robert H Hood, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalina Structured Funding, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica W Laffitte
Represented By: John T Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vintage Equity Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael Kevin McCarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peachtree Settlement Funding, LLC
Represented By: Brian C Duffy
Represented By: Blake Abernethy McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 17-Cubs, LLC
Represented By: Jessica W Laffitte
Represented By: John T Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanquished Gridlock, LLC
Represented By: Michael A Molony
Represented By: Stephen L Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone Street Originations, LLC
Represented By: Brian C Duffy
Represented By: Blake Abernethy McKie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?