Sanders v. Family Dollar Stores of South Carolina, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eric Alan Sanders
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of South Carolina, Inc., Dollar Tree, Inc., Shantell Murray, Kerah Dickerson, Leeza Gonzales and Blackville Police Department
Case Number: 1:2023cv04460
Filed: September 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Paige J Gossett
Referring Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2023 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #24 Response in Opposition to Motion, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Envelope, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Rachel)
October 17, 2023 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Amend/Correct Response filed by Dollar Tree, Inc., Family Dollar Stores of South Carolina, Inc., Leeza Gonzales, Shantell Murray.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/24/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reeves, George)
October 17, 2023 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Dollar Tree, Inc., Family Dollar Stores of South Carolina, Inc., Leeza Gonzales, Shantell Murray.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/24/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reeves, George)
October 16, 2023 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Amend/Correct Response filed by Blackville Police Department.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/23/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Rachel)
October 16, 2023 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Blackville Police Department.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/23/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Rachel) Modified on 10/19/2023 to reference #28 Affidavit (apsn).
October 10, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Blackville Police Department.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/17/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Rachel)
October 10, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by Dollar Tree, Inc., Family Dollar Stores of South Carolina, Inc., Shantell Murray.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/17/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Anderson, Erin)
October 2, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Eric Alan Sanders. Response to Motion due by 10/16/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett.(apsn)
October 2, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Eric Alan Sanders. Response to Motion due by 10/16/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett.(apsn)
October 2, 2023 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Eric Alan Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(apsn)
September 25, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Remand to State Court by Eric Alan Sanders. (Response to Motion due by 10/10/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett.(apsn)
September 25, 2023 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #14 Roseboro Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Eric Alan Sanders 262 Eastgate Drive, PMB #501 Aiken, SC 29803. (apsn)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response to Motion due by 10/26/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 09/25/2023. (apsn)
September 22, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Blackville Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Plyler, Daniel)
September 22, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Blackville Police Department. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Plyler, Daniel)
September 15, 2023 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Order to Notify of Address Change, Local Civil Rule 26.01 form placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Eric Alan Sanders 262 Eastgate Drive, PMB #501 Aiken, SC 29803. (apsn)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Plaintiff is directed to submit fully completed and signed answers to the court's interrogatories pursuant to Local Civil Rule 26.01 (D.S.C.), which are attached to this order, within twenty-one (21) days from the date this order Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 09/15/2023. (apsn)
September 11, 2023 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Scheduling Order placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Eric Alan Sanders 262 Eastgate Drive, PMB #501 Aiken, SC 29803. (apsn)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/10/2023, Discovery due by 1/8/2024, Motions due by 2/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 09/11/2023. (apsn)
September 8, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Dollar Tree, Inc., Family Dollar Stores of South Carolina, Inc., Shantell Murray. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reeves, George)
September 5, 2023 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Dollar Tree, Inc., Family Dollar Stores of South Carolina, Inc., Shantell Murray.(apsn)
September 5, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Barnwell County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2023-CP-06-00215. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-11301370), filed by Shantell Murray, Dollar Tree, Inc., Family Dollar Stores of South Carolina, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Service document, #3 Certificate of Service)(apsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Family Dollar Stores of South Carolina, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Alan Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Dollar Stores of South Carolina, Inc.
Represented By: George Alfred Reeves, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree, Inc.
Represented By: George Alfred Reeves, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shantell Murray
Represented By: George Alfred Reeves, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerah Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leeza Gonzales
Represented By: George Alfred Reeves, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackville Police Department
Represented By: Daniel C Plyler
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?