O'Neal v. Jansen
Petitioner: Timothy O'Neal
Respondent: S. Jansen
Case Number: 1:2023cv06177
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Shiva V Hodges
Referring Judge: Sherri A Lydon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Return To Sender. Refused. Unable To Forward. Inmate Not At This Facility. Addressee: Timothy O'Neal. Document Returned: #5 Proper Form Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)
January 9, 2024 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Timothy O'Neal, 25902-083, Federal Correctional Institution, OAK-1, PO Box 5000, Oakdale, LA 71463. (lbak)
January 9, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Timothy O'Neal. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (lbak)
January 8, 2024 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Timothy O'Neal, 25902-083, FCI Edgefield, PO Box 723, Edgefield, SC 29824. (lbak)
January 8, 2024 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana. Objections to R&R due by 1/22/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 1/8/2024. (lbak)
December 27, 2023 Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 300108196. (apsn)
December 27, 2023 Filing 7 Letter from Timothy O'Neal. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(apsn)
December 12, 2023 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #5 Proper Form Order and one IFP Application placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Timothy O'Neal, 25902-083, FCI Edgefield, PO Box 723, Edgefield, SC 29824. (lbak)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 1/2/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 12/12/2023. (lbak)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Anderson/Greenwood. (lbak)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Timothy O'Neal. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope) (lbak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neal v. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: S. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?