January 8, 2020 |
Filing
967
ORDER granting(599) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN; granting(638) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN; granting(387) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 2:14-cv-04067-DCN Signed by Honorable David C Norton on January 8, 2020.Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(bgam, )
|
December 26, 2019 |
Filing
965
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 879 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 881 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 888 Motion for Summary Judgment Signed by Honorable David C Norton on December 26, 2019.(bgam, )
|
December 19, 2019 |
Filing
962
ORDER denying (692) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN; denying (726) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN; denying (472) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 2:14-cv-04067-DCN Signed by Honorable David C Norton on December 19, 2019.Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(bgam, )
|
June 12, 2019 |
Filing
908
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (939 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 679 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 896 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. The Special Master's R&R is incorporated into this order. For the reasons articulated by the Special Master, it is therefore ORDERED that the Wellin Children's motion for protective order is GRANTED as to Questions 2, 3,4, and 5 set forth in Exhibit C-1 (Dkt. No. 826-3), GRANTED IN PART as Ques tions 1, 9, and 10 set forth in Exhibit C-1, specifically, Dr. Austin is required to answer these questions to the extent any responsive communications took place prior to her formal retainer as an expert witness; and DENIED as to Questions 6, 7, and 8 set forth in Exhibit C-1. Dr. Austin is directed to answer the questions at issue to the extent any responsive communications took place prior to her formal retainer as an expert witness. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/12/2019. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
|
June 6, 2019 |
Filing
907
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (903 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 646 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 862 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. The Special Master's R&R is incorporated into this order. For the reasons articulated by the Special Master, it is therefore ORDERED that the Wellin Children's motion for protective order is GRANTED as to Questions 1 and 5. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/6/2019. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
|
April 16, 2019 |
Filing
880
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (643 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 859 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 900 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. ORDERED that the Estate's motion for protective or der is DENIED, and the legal memorandum at issue shall be produced along with the emails concerning the same subject matter. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 4/16/2019. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
|
April 2, 2019 |
Filing
870
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (745 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 778 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 525 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. The Special Master's report and recommendation is ADOPTED, and the motion for protective order is GRANTED. Both the Draft Letter and Peter Wellin's requirement to give deposition testimony in regards to the contents of the letter are protected from discovery by the attorney-client privilege. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 4/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
|
March 12, 2019 |
Filing
865
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (326 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 575 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 537 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN) Motion for Protective Order,,, filed by Friendship Management LLC, Peter J Wellin, Marjorie W K ing, Cynthia W Plum, (453 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 672 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 707 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. The Special Master's report and recommendation is ADOPTED. Details within order. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/12/2019. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
|
February 6, 2019 |
Filing
855
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (884 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 847 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 630 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master,,, (662 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 698 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 444 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN) Motion to Compel,,, filed by Wendy Wellin. The Special Master's supplemental report and recommendation is AFFIRMED, and Wendy C.H. Wellin's motion to compel the production of twenty-two factual summaries prepared by various Wellin Children is DENIED. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 2/6/2019. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
|
November 14, 2018 |
Filing
840
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (872 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 835 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 618 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. The Special Master's report and recommendation is AFFIRMED, and the Wellin Children's motion to compel the production of Exhibits 28 and 31 in their entirety is GRANTED. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/14/2018. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
|
September 25, 2018 |
Filing
817
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (517 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 737 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 771 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master, The court has conducted a de novo review of the record, and concludes that the Special Master's R&R accurately summarizes this case and the applicable law. Accordingly, the Special master's R&R is incorporated into this order. Additional specific details within order. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/25/2018. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
|
June 4, 2018 |
Filing
782
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (764 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 543 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 798 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. The Special Master's report and recommendation is ADOPTED, and the Estate's motion to amend the parties Rule 26(f) Report is DENIED. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/4/2018. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
|
March 22, 2018 |
Filing
754
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (733 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 513 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 767 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. The Special Master's report and recommendation is AFFIRMED, the Wellin Children's motion to quash the 30(b)(6) deposition subpoena of Wellin & Co. (ECF No. 601 in C/A No. 2:13cv1831 DCN) is GRANTED, and a protective order is granted prohibiting the Estate from taking the 30(b)(6) deposition of Wellin & Co. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/22/2018. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
|
December 6, 2017 |
Filing
709
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re (634) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN. Wendy C.H. Wellin shall produce to the Wellin Children those documents identified on the Etri um Reports as "discoverable" in such form as is noted in the Special Master's Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 12/6/2017.Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(eric, )
|
August 23, 2017 |
Filing
624
ORDER granting (513) Motion ; granting (518) Motion in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN; granting (549) Motion ; granting (555) Motion in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN; granting (301) Motion ; granting (307) Motion in case 2:14-cv-04067-DCN; and clarifying September 30, 2016 order. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on August 23, 2017. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN (rweh, )
|
March 31, 2017 |
Filing
564
ORDER denying (434) Motion to Quash; adopting in part Report and Recommendations re (465) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN; denying (458) Motion to Quash; adopting in part Report and Recommendations re ( 500) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN; denying (206) Motion to Quash; adopting in part Report and Recommendations re (251) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:14-cv-04067-DCN Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/31/2017.Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(eric, )
|
September 30, 2016 |
Filing
503
ORDER granting in part and denying in part (370) Motion for Protective Order; adopting in part Report and Recommendations re (410) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN; granting in part and denying in part (3 95) Motion for Protective Order; adopting in part Report and Recommendations re (433) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN; granting in part and denying in part (144) Motion for Protective Order; adopting in part Report and Recommendations re (181) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:14-cv-04067-DCN in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(rweh, )
|
September 26, 2016 |
Filing
498
CONSENT ORDER adopting as modified Report and Recommendations re (389) Report and Recommendation.; granting (333) Motion for Protective Order in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN; granting (347) Motion for Protective Order; adopting a s modified Report and Recommendations re (412) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN; granting (102) Motion for Protective Order; adopting as modified Report and Recommendations re (160) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:14-cv-04 067-DCN in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN Signed by Honorable David C Norton on September 26, 2016.Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(rweh, ) (Main Document 498 replaced on 9/26/2016) (jbry, ). Modified on 9/26/2016 to replace incorrect document with correct document per chambers (jbry, ).
|
January 15, 2016 |
Filing
392
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 382 Report and Recommendation.; granting in part and denying in part 234 Motion to Compel (rweh, )
|
January 11, 2016 |
Filing
390
ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (149 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 376 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 400 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master. The Special Master's November 24, 2015 R&R is ADOP TED, and the service of the Subpoena and its response shall be governed by the method laid out in the R&R. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 1/11/2016. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
|
December 7, 2015 |
Filing
383
ORDER ADOPTING CONSENT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for (149 in 2:14-cv-04067-DCN, 376 in 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 400 in 2:13-cv-03595-DCN) Report and Recommendation - Special Master, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 12/7/2015. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(jbry, )
|
November 5, 2015 |
Filing
366
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re (352) Report and Recommendation.; granting (299) Motion to Compel; granting (311) Motion to Compel; adopting Report and Recommendations re (330) Report and Recommendation.; adop ting Report and Recommendations re (336) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN; granting (292) Motion to Compel; granting (318) Motion to Compel; adopting Report and Recommendations re (344) Report and Recommendation.; adopting Rep ort and Recommendations re (350) Report and Recommendation.; adopting Report and Recommendations re (374) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN; granting (61) Motion to Compel; granting (80) Motion to Compel; adopting Report and Re commendations re (99) Report and Recommendation.; adopting Report and Recommendations re (107) Report and Recommendation.; adopting Report and Recommendations re (123) Report and Recommendation. in case 2:14-cv-04067-DCN in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN, 2:14-cv-04067-DCN(rweh, )
|
September 30, 2015 |
Filing
343
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 234 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 250 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part 276 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and den ying in part 277 Motion to Quash; finding as moot 310 Report and Recommendation.; modifying and adopting as modified Report and Recommendations re 320 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9-30-2015.(rweh, )
|
March 26, 2015 |
Filing
280
ORDER granting (163) Sealed Motion; granting (168) Motion to Compel in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN; granting (113) Sealed Motion; granting (120) Motion to Compel in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/26/2015.Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN(cahe, )
|
July 14, 2014 |
Filing
175
ORDER granting (140) Motion to Compel and granting (141) Motion to Compel in case 2:13-cv-01831-DCN; granting (77) Motion to Compel and granting (79) Motion to Compel in case 2:13-cv-03595-DCN. The court DIRECTS Campbell Lane Hart and Kimerly Henry to produce all responsive documents in their native format and without redaction within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 07/14/2014. Associated Cases: 2:13-cv-01831-DCN, 2:13-cv-03595-DCN. (gcle)
|
February 10, 2014 |
Filing
102
ORDER re 83 Response in Opposition to Motion for Voluntary Dismissal, filed by South Dakota Trust Company, LLC. South Dakota Trust Company, LLC's request for costs and attorneys' fees, made pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(d), is premature and therefore is denied. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 02/10/2014. (gcle, 2/10/14)
|
February 4, 2014 |
Filing
100
ORDER granting 94 Motion for leave to depose Keith Wellin. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 02/04/2014. (gcle, 2/4/14)
|
January 22, 2014 |
Filing
91
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; finding as moot 59 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; and granting 81 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant South Dakota Trust Company is hereby dismissed from this case without prejudice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 01/22/2014. (gcle, 1/22/14)
|
December 12, 2013 |
Filing
82
ORDER granting 28 Motion to Compel a Mental Examination. Signed by Honorable David C. Norton on 12-12-2013. (gcle, 12/12/13)
|
November 22, 2013 |
Filing
79
ORDER denying 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Keith Wellin and dissolving 6 Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Honorable David C. Norton on 11-22-2013. (gcle, 11/22/13)
|