Plummer v. Riley et al
Plaintiff: Andrew Plummer
Defendant: Tim Riley, Ms Powe and DHO Glidewell
Case Number: 2:2015cv00016
Filed: January 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
County: Spartanburg
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER accepting 110 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker; granting 76 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 77 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 105 Motion for Reconsideration. This case is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 6/1/2017.(ssam, )
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER accepting in part 92 Report and Recommendation; finding as moot 95 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court RECOMMITS the Report to the Magistrate Judge only as to this question for preparation of a supplemental report regarding loss of the 60 days good time credit. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 3/9/2017.(ssam, )
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER RULING ON 63 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION for 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Andrew Plummer. The Court accepts the Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge and denies Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 3/2/16. (hhil, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plummer v. Riley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Plummer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Powe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHO Glidewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?