McCall v. Bodiford et al
Plaintiff: Terry Edward McCall
Defendant: Scotty R Bodiford, James Dorriety, Practitioner Rae P and Traci Krien
Case Number: 2:2015cv01011
Filed: March 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Presiding Judge: Terry L Wooten
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER RULING ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court hereby ACCEPTS the Report, ECF No. 137 . For the reasons stated in the Report, the Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 113 , is GRANTED and Defendant McAlhaney is hereby DISMISSED. Additionally, as stated in the Report, Defendant Drawdy is DISMISSED based on the Plaintiff's failure to affect service.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 09/08/2017. (dsto, )
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER accepting 118 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker; granting 90 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant McConnell are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 3/9/2017.(ssam, )
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER adopting 78 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker; granting 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. This action is DISMISSED as to Defendants Bodiford, Dorriety, Rae, and Krein. Signed by Chief Judge Terry L Wooten on 8/26/2016.(ssam, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Bodiford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Edward McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotty R Bodiford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dorriety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Practitioner Rae P
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traci Krien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?