Rational Spirits LLC v. Rattleback LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rational Spirits LLC
Defendant: Rattleback LLC, Wynn Sanders and Theron Regnier Wannberg
Case Number: 2:2016cv03406
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
County: Charleston
Presiding Judge: Patrick Michael Duffy
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 74 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on August 15, 2018.(nkni, )
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 51 Motion to Strike Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on November 14, 2017.(nkni, )
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 20 Motion to Dismiss; denying 21 Motion for Default Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Patrick Michael Duffy on 03/23/2017.(adeh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rational Spirits LLC v. Rattleback LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rational Spirits LLC
Represented By: Christopher Clay Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rattleback LLC
Represented By: Jay Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynn Sanders
Represented By: Jay Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theron Regnier Wannberg
Represented By: Jay Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?