Wilder v. Krebs
Plaintiff: Samuel A Wilder
Defendant: William F Krebs
Case Number: 2:2017cv00763
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
County: McCormick
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Presiding Judge: Cameron McGowan Currie
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 OPINION AND ORDER Plaintiff's 99 Motion to Amend the Complaint and 100 Motion for Reconsideration are DENIED. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 06/20/2019.(hada, )
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 OPINION AND ORDER granting 93 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant has established res judicata and collateral estoppel apply to Plaintiff's instantclaim. Summary judgment is granted to Defendant, and this matter is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 04/25/2019. (hada, )
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 OPINION AND ORDER adopting 52 Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker; denying 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's § 1983 claim contains genuine issues of material fact that preclude summary judgment; therefore, Dr. Krebs' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 42) is denied and this matter will proceed to trial. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 8/23/2018.(ssam, )
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION AND ORDER declining to adopt 8 Report and Recommendation; granting 13 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff is directed to file an Amended Complaint no later than May 29, 2017, containing the language in his motion to amend pleadings. Thereafter, the matter shall be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for issuance of a service order and further proceedings as appropriate. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 5/4/2017.(ssam, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilder v. Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel A Wilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F Krebs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?