Micfo LLC v. Larkin et al
Plaintiff: Micfo LLC
Defendant: Victoria Latham and Erinn Larkin
3Rd Party Defendant: Micfo, LLC Owner Amir Golestan
Case Number: 2:2018cv01653
Filed: June 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
County: Charleston
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1836 (b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DISMISSING CASE This case is dismissed without prejudice subject to the conditions as outlined in the Order. Please see Order for all details. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 6/1/2020. (sshe, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 69 REPLY by Victoria Latham to 66 Order,,, Response to Text Order. (Brewer, Barrett)
May 29, 2020 Filing 68 REPLY by Erinn Larkin Response to Text Order to 66 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Email correspondence)(Mlynarczyk, Adam) Modified on 5/29/2020 to link correct event to associated event, to add description to exhibit(sshe, ).
May 29, 2020 Filing 67 REPLY by Micfo LLC to 66 Order,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Email corresp between undersigned and counsel for Trustee, Christine Brimm, the Trustee also consents to Proposal)(Abney, Merritt)
May 26, 2020 Filing 66 TEXT ORDER The parties discussed with the Court at a telephone status conference on 5/26/20 the possible resolution of this matter as follows: (1) dismissal without prejudice of all pending claims in this matter; (2) leave of any party to move to restore the case to the docket within one year; and (3) tolling of any applicable statute of limitations during the one year period following dismissal of the action without prejudice. The parties agreed to confer with their clients and to advise the Court on or before noon on 5/29/20 whether there is consent to this resolution. Counsel for Micfo, LLC also agreed to consult with the Trustee in the Amir Golestan bankruptcy regarding whether she will consent. In the event there is not consent, the Court will establish a scheduling order that provides for trial in September 2020. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/26/20. (ltap, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 65 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Richard M Gergel: Status Conference held by telephone on 5/26/2020. All parties are represented on the call. Court to issue text order. Court Reporter Tana Hess. (cper, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/26/2020 at 10:00 AM before Honorable Richard M Gergel. The Court will provide call-in instructions. Court staff is needed. (ltap, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 63 Case Reassigned to Judge Richard M Gergel. Judge David C Norton no longer assigned to the case. (suro, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 62 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record by Amir Golestan. (Abney, Merritt)
July 2, 2019 Filing 61 TEXT ORDER granting protection from court appearances to Adam Mlynarczyk for 7/23-27/2019. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 7/2/2019. (eric, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Adam Mlynarczyk for September 23-27, 2019. Refiled to correct event type. (jbry, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 59 CONSENT ORDER granting #58 Motion to Amend/Correct Consent Scheduling Order. Mediation shall take place within sixty (60) days of the date of this order; Micfo, LLC shall place Sentinel Insurance Company, Limited/The Hartford, on notice of the counterclaims of both Defendants Latham and Larkin; if a settlement cannot be reached at mediation, then the Parties will jointly request a hearing to take place as soon as possible regarding whether a stay of discovery should remain in place until the criminal cases against Micfo, LLC and Amir Golestan are resolved; that discovery in this case shall be stayed until the Court rules on whether the stay should remain in place during the criminal proceedings. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/20/2019.(jbry, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 58 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Consent Scheduling Order by Erinn Larkin. Response to Motion due by 7/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Attorney Consent - Abney, #2 Supporting Documents Attorney Consent - Brewer)No proposed order.(Mlynarczyk, Adam)
April 17, 2019 Filing 57 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable David C Norton: Status Conference held on 4/17/2019. Parties to submit a proposed consent order for mediation by 6/1/19 for the Court's consideraton. Court Reporter Tana Hess. (cmur, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Status Conference set for Tuesday, 4/16/2019 at 10:30 AM cancelled and rescheduled to: Status Conference set for Wednesday, 4/17/2019 at 10:30 AM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (jbry, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 55 TEXT ORDER granting protection from court appearances to Adam Mlynarczyk for 7/22-30/2019. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/27/2019. (eric, )
March 27, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Adam Mlynarczyk for July 22, 2019 to July 30, 2019 (Mlynarczyk, Adam)
March 20, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Status Conference set for Thursday, 4/4/2019 at 1:30 PM cancelled and rescheduled to: Status Conference set for Tuesday, 4/16/2019 at 10:30 AM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (jbry, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 52 TEXT ORDER granting #50 Motion for Status Conference. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/13/2019.(jbry, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for Thursday, 4/4/2019 at 1:30 PM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (jbry, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 50 First MOTION for Status Conference by Victoria Latham. Response to Motion due by 3/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - emails re 10.10.18 to 12.15.18, #2 Exhibit B - Emails re 12.06.18 to 12.07.18, #3 Exhibit C - emails re 12.12.19, #4 Exhibit D.1 - Verified Complaint re Oppobox, LLC, et vs. ARIN, #5 Exhibit D.2 - Verified Complaint Ex. A - G, #6 Exhibit D.3 - Verified Complaint Ex. H - N, #7 Exhibit E - Transcript of Injunctive Hearing, #8 Exhibit F - Oppobox, LLC Voluntary Dismissal, #9 Exhibit G - Complaint re Golestan v. Golestan)No proposed order.(Brewer, Barrett)
February 8, 2019 Filing 49 TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #32 Motion to Strike ; denying without prejudice #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying wihtout prejudice #18 Motion to Strike ; denying without prejudice #24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Parties have leave of the court to refile these motions at a later date, if necessary. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 2/8/2019.(eric, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 48 TEXT ORDER granting protection from court appearances to M. Kathleen McTighe Mellen for 2/1-12/2019. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 1/9/2019. (eric, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Mary Kathleen McTighe Mellen for 2/1/19 through 2/12/19 (McTighe Mellen, Mary)
October 29, 2018 Filing 46 TEXT ORDER granting #43 Motion Status Conference or in the alternative Extension of Time; granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response to Motion due by 11/13/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/29/2018.(eric, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: on Motions #18 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, and Motion to Dismiss Conversion Claim, #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for Monday, 10/22/2018 at 11:00 AM (jbry, )
October 3, 2018 Filing 44 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #37 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, by Erinn Larkin. Response to Motion due by 10/17/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Protocol for Discovery of Electronic Devices and Accounts)No proposed order.(Mlynarczyk, Adam) Modified on 10/4/2018 to add descriptions to exhibits(sshe, ).
October 1, 2018 Filing 43 First MOTION for Status Conference or in the Alternative Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiff Micfo, LLC's, Motion to Dismiss and Third-Party Defendant Golestan's Motion to Strike and Motion to Dismiss by Victoria Latham. Response to Motion due by 10/15/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation of Protocol for Discovery of Defendants' Devices, Drives, and Accounts)No proposed order.(Brewer, Barrett) Modified on 10/2/2018 to add description to exhibit (jbry, ).
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #32 MOTION to Strike #10 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, and Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Claims Response to Motion due by 10/1/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/24/2018.(jbry, )
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response to Motion due by 10/1/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/24/2018.(jbry, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 40 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 MOTION to Strike #10 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, and Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Claims by Victoria Latham. Response to Motion due by 10/5/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Brewer, Barrett)
September 21, 2018 Filing 39 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Victoria Latham. Response to Motion due by 10/5/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Brewer, Barrett)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response to Motion due by 10/4/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/18/2018.(jbry, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 36 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #28 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, by Erinn Larkin. Response to Motion due by 10/1/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Mlynarczyk, Adam)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response to Motion due by 9/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/10/2018.(jbry, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 34 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Victoria Latham. Response to Motion due by 9/24/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Brewer, Barrett)
September 7, 2018 Filing 33 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Amir Golestan.(McTighe Mellen, Mary)
September 7, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to Strike #10 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, and Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Claims by Amir Golestan. Response to Motion due by 9/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McTighe Mellen, Mary)
September 6, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #18 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, and Motion to Dismiss Conversion Claim, #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for Monday, 10/22/2018 at 11:00 AM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (jbry, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 30 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Victoria Latham. Response to Motion due by 9/19/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Brewer, Barrett)
September 4, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, and Motion to Dismiss Conversion Claim Response filed by Amir Golestan. (McTighe Mellen, Mary)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response to Motion due by 9/19/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/4/2018.(eric, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 27 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, Memorandum in Opposition to Mot. to Strike by Erinn Larkin. Response to Motion due by 9/14/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Mlynarczyk, Adam)
August 27, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, and Motion to Dismiss Conversion Claim Memorandum in Opposition to Mot. to Strike Response filed by Erinn Larkin.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/4/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Mlynarczyk, Adam)
August 22, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to Counterclaim #10 of Latham by Micfo LLC.(McTighe Mellen, Mary)
August 22, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Micfo LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/5/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Latham's At-Will Offer of Employment)No proposed order.(McTighe Mellen, Mary)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response to Motion due by 9/4/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 8/21/2018.(jbry, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 22 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Erinn Larkin. Response to Motion due by 9/4/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Mlynarczyk, Adam)
August 17, 2018 Filing 21 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Victoria Latham. Third-Party Defendant Amir Golestan served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018. (Brewer, Barrett)
August 14, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Amir Golestan.(McTighe Mellen, Mary)
August 14, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike #7 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, and Motion to Dismiss Conversion Claim by Amir Golestan. Response to Motion due by 8/28/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(McTighe Mellen, Mary)
August 7, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to Counterclaim #7 of Erinn Larkin by Micfo LLC.(McTighe Mellen, Mary)
August 7, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Micfo LLC. Response to Motion due by 8/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - At-Will Offer of Employment)No proposed order.(McTighe Mellen, Mary)
August 7, 2018 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting protection from court appearances to Adam Mlynarczyk for 10/8-12/2018. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 8/7/2018. (eric, )
August 6, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Adam Mlynarczyk for October 8, 2018 to October 12, 2018 (Mlynarczyk, Adam)
July 25, 2018 Filing 13 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Erinn Larkin. 3rd Party Summons & Complaint Amir Golestan served on 7/25/2018, answer due 8/15/2018. (Mlynarczyk, Adam) (Main Document 13 replaced on 7/25/2018) (jbry, ). Modified on 7/25/2018 to replace document with corrected signature as provided by filing user (jbry, ).
July 24, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Amir Golestan. (jbry, )
July 24, 2018 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Victoria Latham.(Brewer, Barrett)
July 24, 2018 Filing 10 Victoria Latham's ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Micfo, LLC, First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Victoria Latham against Amir Golestan, First COUNTERCLAIM Victoria Latham against Micfo LLC by Victoria Latham. (Attachments: #1 Summons Third-Party Summons)(Brewer, Barrett)
July 19, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Amir Golestan. (jbry, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Erinn Larkin. Attachment from entry #7 removed and filed separately.(jbry, )
July 18, 2018 Filing 7 Erinn Larkin's ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Micfo, LLC, First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Erinn Larkin against Amir Golestan, First COUNTERCLAIM Erinn Larkin against Micfo LLC by Erinn Larkin. (Attachments: #1 Summons 3rd Party Summons, # 2 LR 26.01 Answers, #3 Certificate of Service)(Mlynarczyk, Adam) Modified on 7/19/2018 to remove attachment #2 and file separately as entry #8 (jbry, ).
July 3, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Micfo LLC. Victoria Latham served on 6/26/2018, answer due 7/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) Refiled to correct event type.(jbry, )
July 3, 2018 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Micfo LLC. Counsel on behalf of Defendant Erinn Larkin served on 6/28/2018, answer due 7/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Acceptance of Service)(Abney, Merritt)
June 15, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbry, )
June 15, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Micfo LLC.(jbry, )
June 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7836733.), filed by Micfo LLC. Service due by 9/13/2018(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Micfo LLC v. Larkin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Latham
Represented By: Barrett R Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erinn Larkin
Represented By: Adam Mlynarczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micfo LLC
Represented By: Mary Kathleen McTighe Mellen
Represented By: Merritt G Abney
Represented By: John C McElwaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Micfo, LLC Owner Amir Golestan
Represented By: Mary Kathleen McTighe Mellen
Represented By: Merritt G Abney
Represented By: John C McElwaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?