United States of America v. Mashni et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: SC Investment Holdings LLC, Finish Line Foundation II Inc, KRF XSL LLC, SC Investment Holdins LLC, PEM Residential LLC, PEM Real Estate Group LLC, Kiawah River Farms LLC, Kiawah River Excavating & Earthworks LLC and Paul Edward Mashni
Case Number: 2:2018cv02288
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Charleston Office
County: Charleston
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE by United States of America. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Waivers of the Service of Summonses, #2 Certificate of Service)(Leventis, James)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion by Herbert Beigel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 8/24/2018.(jbry, )
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Herbert Beigel ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7961947) by Finish Line Foundation II Inc, KRF XSL LLC, Kiawah River Excavating & Earthworks LLC, Kiawah River Farms LLC, Paul Edward Mashni, PEM Real Estate Group LLC, PEM Residential LLC, SC Investment Holdings LLC, SC Investment Holdins LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/6/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application of Beigel, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Beigel, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Carroll, Matthew)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbry, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America.(jbry, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. Service due by 11/15/2018 (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Mashni et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC Investment Holdings LLC
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Herbert Beigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finish Line Foundation II Inc
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Herbert Beigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRF XSL LLC
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Herbert Beigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SC Investment Holdins LLC
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Herbert Beigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEM Residential LLC
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Herbert Beigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEM Real Estate Group LLC
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Herbert Beigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiawah River Farms LLC
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Herbert Beigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kiawah River Excavating & Earthworks LLC
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Herbert Beigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Edward Mashni
Represented By: Matthew Todd Carroll
Represented By: Herbert Beigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James C Leventis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?