South Carolina Politics Club v. Osborne et al
Plaintiff: South Carolina Politics Club
Defendant: Jill Caldwell, Brian R McGee, Christine Workman, Michael Duncan, Alicia D Caudill and Stephen C Osborne
Case Number: 2:2018cv02335
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Tyson C. Langhofer to Appear Pro Hac Vice for South Carolina Politics Club. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/4/2018.(sshe, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER Dkt. No. #6 must be supplemented as the current filing is deficient since it does not include a Certificate of Good Standing from either the bar of the highest court of a state or the District of Columbia, as required by Local Rule 83.I.05. Counsel seeking pro hac vice admission are directed to supplement the motion by emailing a valid Certificate of Good Standing from the State of Georgia to gergel_ecf@scd.uscourts.gov. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/4/2018. (sshe, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Wilkins Frampton, IV on behalf of Jill Caldwell, Alicia D Caudill, Michael Duncan, Brian R McGee, Stephen C Osborne, Christine Workman (Frampton, Henry)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE by Christine Workman, Alicia D Caudill, Brian R McGee, Jill Caldwell, Stephen C Osborne, Michael Duncan. All Defendants. (Frampton, Henry)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Blake W. Meadows ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7975491) by South Carolina Politics Club. Response to Motion due by 9/14/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Supporting Documents Motion in Support of Pro Hac Vice application, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Boyd, Reese)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tyson C. Langhofer ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7975431) by South Carolina Politics Club. Response to Motion due by 9/14/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Supporting Documents Motion in Support of Pro Hac Vice application, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Boyd, Reese)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Politics Club.(sshe, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7957091.), filed by South Carolina Politics Club. Service due by 11/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 The Policy on Unregistered Organizations, #2 Exhibit 2 complete copy of The Compass: A Guide for Student Organizations, #3 Exhibit 3 petition for SCPC to become an RSO, #4 Exhibit 4 proposed constitution of SCPC, #5 Exhibit 5 Ramsayer quoted from the RSO Registration Policy, #6 Exhibit 6 SCPC notified Secretary Ramsayer of its intent to appeal, #7 Exhibit 7 Ramsayer stated that the reason why your club was not passed through Senate was due to shared purposes between your Club and the Fusion Party", #8 Exhibit 8 SCPC would be required to file a new petition for registration)(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Carolina Politics Club v. Osborne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Caldwell
Represented By: Henry Wilkins Frampton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian R McGee
Represented By: Henry Wilkins Frampton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Workman
Represented By: Henry Wilkins Frampton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Duncan
Represented By: Henry Wilkins Frampton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia D Caudill
Represented By: Henry Wilkins Frampton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen C Osborne
Represented By: Henry Wilkins Frampton, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina Politics Club
Represented By: Reese R Boyd, III
Represented By: Tyson C Langhofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?