United States of America v. Cumbie
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Dion Cumbie
Case Number: 2:2018cv02366
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT DECREE granting #6 Motion for Entry of Previously Lodged Consent Decree Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/22/2018.(jbry, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION Plaintiff United States' Agreed Motion for Entry of Previously Lodged Consent Decree by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 10/26/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Drake, Beth)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #4 Notice to Lodge, #2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #1 Complaint (Drake, Beth)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO LODGE of Consent Decree by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Consent Decree, #2 Appendix 1 - Site Map, #3 Appendix 2 - Aerial Photograph of the Site, #4 Appendix 3 - Site Diagram Showing Restoration Area and Borrow Pit, #5 Appendix 4 - Nationwide Permit 32, including Applicable Conditions)(Drake, Beth) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/28/2018) (jbry, ). Modified on 8/28/2018 to replace with corrected document provided by filing user(jbry, ).
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America.(jbry, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dion Cumbie, filed by United States of America. Service due by 11/26/2018(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cumbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dion Cumbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Beth Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?