Silk v. Northstar Location Services LLC

Plaintiff: Colleen Silk
Defendant: Northstar Location Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02517
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: South Carolina District Court
Presiding Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 10/10/2018. (vdru, )
October 9, 2018 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Colleen Silk (Bland, Chauntel)
September 24, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colleen Silk. Northstar Location Services LLC served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Bland, Chauntel)
September 11, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Northstar Location Services LLC. (bshr, )
September 11, 2018 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Colleen Silk.(bshr, )
September 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Northstar Location Services LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7993810.) Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Colleen Silk. Service due by 12/10/2018(bshr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silk v. Northstar Location Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Silk
Represented By: Chauntel Demetrius Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Location Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?