Pepino v. Envoy Air Inc et al
Plaintiff: Paul J Pepino
Defendant: Envoy Air Inc and American Airlines Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv02724
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 11/21/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/7/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 12/7/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/4/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/4/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/4/2019, Discovery due by 7/3/2019, Motions due by 7/17/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 9/1/2019, ADR Statement due by 7/30/2019, Mediation Due by 8/30/2019, Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/2/2018. (eric, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Charleston County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Acknowledgment of Removal)(Stuckey, Erin)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by American Airlines Inc, Envoy Air Inc.(Stuckey, Erin)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Paul J Pepino.(Countryman, Andrew)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by American Airlines Inc.(jbry, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Envoy Air Inc.(jbry, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-10-04318. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8039887), filed by American Airlines Inc, Envoy Air Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint filed in the Charleston Court of Common Pleas)(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pepino v. Envoy Air Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul J Pepino
Represented By: Andrew Wesley Countryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Envoy Air Inc
Represented By: Erin Richardson Stuckey
Represented By: Timothy Michael McKissock
Represented By: Amber Modestine Hendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines Inc
Represented By: Erin Richardson Stuckey
Represented By: Timothy Michael McKissock
Represented By: Amber Modestine Hendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?