Bryant v. US Secret Service et al
Plaintiff: Anthony G Bryant
Defendant: US Secret Service, US Postal Service, Attorney General of the United States and US Attorney for the District of South Carolina
Case Number: 2:2018cv02738
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Filing 27 ASSEMBLED INITIAL ELECTRONIC RECORD TRANSMITTED TO FOURTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re #24 Notice of Appeal, Electronic record successfully transmitted. (ssam, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 26 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #25 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA, placed in U.S. Mail to Anthony G Bryant (ssam, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 25 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re #24 Notice of Appeal, The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (ssam, )
October 25, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #21 Order on Report and Recommendation by Anthony G Bryant. - The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 City Council Minutes)(ssam, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 23 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #22 Judgment, #21 Order on Report and Recommendation,, placed in U.S. Mail to Anthony G Bryant. (cwhi, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 22 JUDGMENT: This case is dismissed without prejudice and without issuance and service of process. The Plaintiff shall take nothing on his Complaint filed pursuant to Title 05 U.S.C. 702. Plaintiff is now subject to a pre-filing injunction pursuant to Graham v. Riddle. (cwhi, )
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker. Plaintiffs complaint is summarily dismissed without prejudice, and without issuance and service of process. Plaintiff is now subject to a pre-filing injunction pursuant to Graham v. Riddle. PLAINTIFF IS CAUTIONED THAT FUTURE FRIVOLOUS ACTIONS ARE SUBJECT TO SUMMARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO THE COURTS RIDDLE ORDER, AND HIS CONTINUING TO FILE FRIVOLOUS COMPLAINTSCOULD SUBJECT HIM TO SANCTIONS, SUCH AS THE DENIAL OF IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 10/23/2018.(cwhi, )
October 22, 2018 Filing 20 OBJECTIONS to #16 Report and Recommendation by Anthony G Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(ssam, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 18 OBJECTIONS to #16 Report and Recommendation by Anthony G Bryant. (ssam, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #15 Order, #16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #12 Amended Complaint filed by Anthony G Bryant placed in U.S. Mail to Anthony G Bryant (ssam, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker. It is recommended that the Amended Complaint (DE#12 ) should be summarily dismissed with prejudice, and without issuance and service of process; alternatively, if the District Court determines that subject matter jurisdiction is lacking, the Amended Complaint may be dismissed without prejudice, and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 11/1/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 10/17/2018. (ssam, )
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 10/17/2018. (ssam, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Attorney General of the United States, US Attorney for the District of South Carolina, US Postal Service, US Secret Service, filed by Anthony G Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(ssam, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Proper Form Order with required documents AND blank amended complaint form placed in U.S. Mail to Anthony G Bryant (ssam, )
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REFERENCE #9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 10/9/2018.(ssam, )
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPER FORM ORDER. Case to be brought into proper form by 10/31/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. The Court will give Plaintiff an opportunity to file an Amended Complaint on or by October 30, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 10/9/2018. (ssam, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS by Anthony G Bryant. (ssam, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 OBJECTIONS by Anthony G Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(ssam, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 OBJECTIONS by Anthony G Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Document)(ssam, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Anthony G Bryant. Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker.(ssam, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Attorney General of the United States, US Attorney for the District of South Carolina, US Postal Service, US Secret Service, filed by Anthony G Bryant.(ssam, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. US Secret Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Secret Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney for the District of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony G Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?