Sepulveda v. Standard Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Cynthia Sepulveda
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv02766
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: South Carolina District Court
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2018 11 ERISA SPECIALIZED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/10/2018. (sshe, )
December 7, 2018 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Standard Insurance Company.(Hedgepath, James)
December 7, 2018 9 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Standard Insurance Company.(Hedgepath, James)
November 12, 2018 8 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Standard Insurance Company answer due 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 11/12/18 Extension Email String to Nathaniel Bax, Esq.)(Hedgepath, James)
November 6, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Sepulveda. Standard Insurance Company served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Green card and DOI Letter)(Bax, Nathaniel)
October 30, 2018 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company, filed by Cynthia Sepulveda. Service due by 1/28/2019 (Bax, Nathaniel)
October 23, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Sepulveda. Standard Insurance Company served on 10/17/2018, answer due 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Green card and DOI Letter)(Bax, Nathaniel)
October 12, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company. (sshe, )
October 12, 2018 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Cynthia Sepulveda.(sshe, )
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8049734.), filed by Cynthia Sepulveda. Service due by 1/10/2019(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sepulveda v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: James T Hedgepath
Represented By: Michael T Brittingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Sepulveda
Represented By: Nathaniel W Bax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?