Master Steel LLC v. Bhate Environmental Associates Inc et al
Plaintiff: Master Steel LLC
Defendant: Bhate Environmental Associates Inc and Lexon Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv02885
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay this Action by Lexon Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 12/18/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Staples, Christian)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Compel Defendant Bhate Environmental Associates, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay This Action Response filed by Master Steel LLC. (Bolger, Catherine)
November 15, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Defendant Bhate Environmental Associates, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay This Action by Bhate Environmental Associates Inc. Response to Motion due by 11/29/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay This Action, #2 Exhibit A Subcontract Agreement, #3 Exhibit B Demand for Arbitration)No proposed order.(Beaver, Ryan) Modified on 11/16/2018 to add descriptions to exhibits (jbry, ).
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Master Steel LLC. Lexon Insurance Company served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Officer's Return of Serivce)(Bolger, Catherine)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Master Steel LLC. Bhate Environmental Associates Inc served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Bolger, Catherine)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbry, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Master Steel LLC.(jbry, )
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bhate Environmental Associates Inc, Lexon Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8072655.), filed by Master Steel LLC. Service due by 1/22/2019(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Master Steel LLC v. Bhate Environmental Associates Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhate Environmental Associates Inc
Represented By: Ryan Lee Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexon Insurance Company
Represented By: Christian Hart Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Master Steel LLC
Represented By: Catherine Marie Bolger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?