Goguen v. Greystar Real Estate Partners LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Goguen
Defendant: CCC Mount Pleasant LLC and Greystar Real Estate Partners LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02906
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by CCC Mount Pleasant LLC, Greystar Real Estate Partners LLC.(Yount, Adam)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CCC Mount Pleasant LLC, Greystar Real Estate Partners LLC.(Yount, Adam)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra Goguen. Greystar Real Estate Partners LLC served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Smoot, Benjamin)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sandra Goguen. CCC Mount Pleasant LLC served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Smoot, Benjamin)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbry, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sandra Goguen.(jbry, )
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8075448.), filed by Sandra Goguen. Service due by 1/24/2019(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goguen v. Greystar Real Estate Partners LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCC Mount Pleasant LLC
Represented By: Adam Noah Yount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greystar Real Estate Partners LLC
Represented By: Adam Noah Yount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Goguen
Represented By: Allan Poe Sloan, III
Represented By: Benjamin Catlett Smoot, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?