Bryant v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineer et al
Plaintiff: Anthony G Bryant
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineer, Attorney General of the United States, Charleston County Administrator and S.C. Department of Health and Environmental Control
Case Number: 2:2018cv03037
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Mary Gordon Baker
Referring Judge: Margaret B Seymour
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 13 ASSEMBLED INITIAL ELECTRONIC RECORD TRANSMITTED TO FOURTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS re #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, Electronic record successfully transmitted. (ssam, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA, placed in U.S. Mail to Anthony G Bryant (ssam, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 11 Transmittal Sheet for Notice of Appeal to USCA re #10 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (ssam, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Anthony G Bryant. The Docketing Statement form, Transcript Order form, and CJA 24 form may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(ssam, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 OBJECTIONS by Anthony G Bryant to #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (hada, )
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, placed in U.S. Mail to Anthony G Bryant (jbry, )
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall have fifteen (15) from the date of entry of this Order to pay the full filing fee for this case. Failure to pay the filing fee will subject the complaint to summary dismissal. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 11/19/2018.(jbry, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Anthony G Bryant.Motions referred to Mary Gordon Baker. (hada, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Attorney General of the United States, Charleston County Administrator, S.C. Department of Health and Environmental Control, U.S. Army Corps of Engineer, filed by Anthony G Bryant. Service due by 2/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Certificate of Service re: 2:18-cv-2217) (hada, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston County Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.C. Department of Health and Environmental Control
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony G Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?