Beaufort, City of et al v. National Marine Fisheries Service et al
Plaintiff: Briarcliffe Acres, Town of, Kiawah Island, Town of, Awendaw, Town of, Port Royal, Town of, Edisto Beach, Town of, Hilton Head Island, Town of, Pawleys Island, Town of, James Island, Town of, South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce, Isle of Palms, City of, Charleston, City of, Seabrook Island, Town of, Beaufort, City of, Mount Pleasant, Town of, Bluffton, Town of, Folly Beach, City of and North Myrtle Beach, City of
Defendant: Wilber Ross, Chris Oliver and National Marine Fisheries Service
Intervenor: American Petroleum Institute, GX Technology Corporation, TGS-NOPEc Geophysical Company, Spectrum Geo Inc., Western Geco LLC, CGG Services (U.S.) Inc. and International Association of Geophysical Contractors
Intervenor Plaintiff: State of South Carolina ex rel Alan Wilson, Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2018cv03327
Filed: December 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER in case 2:18-cv-03327-RMG; granting (34) Motion to Intervene; granting (59) Motion to Intervene; finding as moot (111) Motion for Clarification; finding as moot (114) Motion for Leave to File in case 2:18-cv-03326-RMG Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 2/8/2019.Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-03326-RMG, 2:18-cv-03327-RMG(vdru, )
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER in case 2:18-cv-03327-RMG; granting (40) Motion to Intervene in case 2:18-cv-03326-RMG. The Court finds that the intervention of International Association of Geophysical Contractors, CGG Services (U.S.) Inc., GX Technology Corporation, Spectrum GEO Inc., TGS-NOPEC Geophysical Company, WesternGeco LLC, and the American Petroleum Institute is appropriate in this case. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 2/8/2019.Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-03326-RMG, 2:18-cv-03327-RMG(vdru, )
January 18, 2019 Filing 30 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBERS 30, 31, 32 Reason: Documents should not have been (spread to)filed in this consolidated Closed case; only file documents in lead case 2:18-cv-03326-RMG(per Order filed 12/28/18 only list in caption of document "Consolidated with 2:18-cv-3327-RMG") Filing dates of original filings: 1/16/2018, 1/18/2018. (sshe, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 28 TEXT ORDER: For good cause shown, the motion of Attorney Amelia Thompson to withdraw as counsel is granted. (Dkt. No. 27). AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/14/2019.(ltap, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Awendaw, Town of, Beaufort, City of, Bluffton, Town of, Briarcliffe Acres, Town of, Charleston, City of, Edisto Beach, Town of, Folly Beach, City of, Hilton Head Island, Town of, Isle of Palms, City of, James Island, Town of, Kiawah Island, Town of, Mount Pleasant, Town of, North Myrtle Beach, City of, Pawleys Island, Town of, Port Royal, Town of, Seabrook Island, Town of, South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce. Response to Motion due by 1/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Thompson, Amelia)
January 8, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re (60 in 2:18-cv-03326-RMG) MOTION to Stay re (59) MOTION to Intervene in Light of Lapse in Appropriations Response filed by State of South Carolina ex rel Alan Wilson, Attorney General.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/15/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-03326-RMG, 2:18-cv-03327-RMG(Smith, James)
January 7, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Intervene by State of South Carolina ex rel Alan Wilson, Attorney General. Response to Motion due by 1/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Complaint in Intervention)No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-03326-RMG, 2:18-cv-03327-RMG(Smith, James)
January 4, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 Joint MOTION to Intervene Response filed by Awendaw, Town of, Beaufort, City of, Bluffton, Town of, Briarcliffe Acres, Town of, Charleston, City of, Edisto Beach, Town of, Folly Beach, City of, Hilton Head Island, Town of, Isle of Palms, City of, James Island, Town of, Kiawah Island, Town of, Mount Pleasant, Town of, North Myrtle Beach, City of, Pawleys Island, Town of, Port Royal, Town of, Seabrook Island, Town of, South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/11/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Thompson, Amelia)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting (8) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:18-cv-03327-RMG. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings in these cases contain the case number:"2:18-cv-3326-RMG" and on the next line "(Consolidated with 2:18-cv-3327-RMG)"; it is FURTHER ORDERED that, as a result of this consolidation, case number 2: 18-cv-3327-RMG is hereby ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/28/2018. Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-03327-RMG, 2:18-cv-03326-RMG(rshu, )
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/28/18.(hhil, )
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 12/28/18.(hhil, )
December 27, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason Morgan ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8179891) by American Petroleum Institute, CGG Services (U.S.) Inc., International Association of Geophysical Contractors, Spectrum Geo Inc., TGS-NOPEc Geophysical Company, Western Geco LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Supporting Documents - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Houseal, Sean)
December 27, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ryan Steen ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8179834) by American Petroleum Institute, CGG Services (U.S.) Inc., International Association of Geophysical Contractors, Spectrum Geo Inc., TGS-NOPEc Geophysical Company, Western Geco LLC. Response to Motion due by 1/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Supporting Documents - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Houseal, Sean)
December 21, 2018 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Western Geco LLC.(Houseal, Sean)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by TGS-NOPEc Geophysical Company.(Houseal, Sean)
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Spectrum Geo Inc..(Houseal, Sean)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by International Association of Geophysical Contractors.(Houseal, Sean)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by GX Technology Corporation.(Houseal, Sean)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by CGG Services (U.S.) Inc..(Houseal, Sean)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by American Petroleum Institute.(Houseal, Sean)
December 21, 2018 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Intervene by International Association of Geophysical Contractors, TGS-NOPEc Geophysical Company, CGG Services (U.S.) Inc., GX Technology Corporation, Spectrum Geo Inc., Western Geco LLC, American Petroleum Institute. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Nikki C. Martin, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Peter Seidel, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Whitehead, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph R. Gagliardi, #6 Affidavit Declaration of Richmond Miller, #7 Affidavit Declaration of Gary Poole, #8 Affidavit Declaration of Erik G. Milito)No proposed order.(Houseal, Sean)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Mount Pleasant, Town of, North Myrtle Beach, City of, Pawleys Island, Town of, Port Royal, Town of, Seabrook Island, Town of, South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce. Response to Motion due by 1/4/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Armstrong, Amy)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonelle M Dilley on behalf of National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilber Ross (Dilley, Jonelle)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Drake on behalf of National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilber Ross (Drake, Beth)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison C Finnegan on behalf of National Marine Fisheries Service, Chris Oliver, Wilber Ross (Finnegan, Alison)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jbry, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Awendaw, Town of, Beaufort, City of, Bluffton, Town of, Briarcliffe Acres, Town of, Charleston, City of, Edisto Beach, Town of, Folly Beach, City of, Hilton Head Island, Town of, Isle of Palms, City of, James Island, Town of, Kiawah Island, Town of, Mount Pleasant, Town of, North Myrtle Beach, City of, Pawleys Island, Town of, Port Royal, Town of, Seabrook Island, Town of, South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce.(jbry, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8151518.), filed by Folly Beach, City of, Briarcliffe Acres, Town of, Beaufort, City of, Seabrook Island, Town of, South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce, North Myrtle Beach, City of, Edisto Beach, Town of, Hilton Head Island, Town of, Pawleys Island, Town of, Charleston, City of, Kiawah Island, Town of, Awendaw, Town of, Mount Pleasant, Town of, Isle of Palms, City of, Bluffton, Town of, Port Royal, Town of, James Island, Town of. Service due by 3/11/2019(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaufort, City of et al v. National Marine Fisheries Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilber Ross
Represented By: Alison C Finnegan
Represented By: Jonelle M Dilley
Represented By: Beth Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Oliver
Represented By: Alison C Finnegan
Represented By: Jonelle M Dilley
Represented By: Beth Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Represented By: Alison C Finnegan
Represented By: Jonelle M Dilley
Represented By: Beth Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Briarcliffe Acres, Town of
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiawah Island, Town of
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Awendaw, Town of
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Port Royal, Town of
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edisto Beach, Town of
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilton Head Island, Town of
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pawleys Island, Town of
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Island, Town of
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Carolina Small Business Chamber of Commerce
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isle of Palms, City of
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charleston, City of
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seabrook Island, Town of
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beaufort, City of
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mount Pleasant, Town of
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bluffton, Town of
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Folly Beach, City of
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Myrtle Beach, City of
Represented By: Amelia Ann Thompson
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: American Petroleum Institute
Represented By: Ryan P Steen
Represented By: Sean Houseal
Represented By: Jason T Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: GX Technology Corporation
Represented By: Sean Houseal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: TGS-NOPEc Geophysical Company
Represented By: Ryan P Steen
Represented By: Sean Houseal
Represented By: Jason T Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Spectrum Geo Inc.
Represented By: Ryan P Steen
Represented By: Sean Houseal
Represented By: Jason T Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Western Geco LLC
Represented By: Ryan P Steen
Represented By: Sean Houseal
Represented By: Jason T Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: CGG Services (U.S.) Inc.
Represented By: Ryan P Steen
Represented By: Sean Houseal
Represented By: Jason T Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: International Association of Geophysical Contractors
Represented By: Ryan P Steen
Represented By: Sean Houseal
Represented By: Jason T Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: State of South Carolina ex rel Alan Wilson, Attorney General
Represented By: James Emory Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?