City of Newburgh v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: City of Newburgh
Defendant: Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., National Foam Inc, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Chubb Fire, Ltd., Fire Service Plus, Inc., United Technologies Corporation, SWF Airport Acquisition, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, National Express Group, PLC, State of New York, United States Air National Guard Bureau, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., New York Air National Guard, Tyco Fire Products LP, Kidde PLC, Inc., Federal Express Corporation, United States Air Force, New York State Department of Transportation, The 3M Company, John Does 1-10, Chemguard Inc, Angus Fire Armour Corporation, United States Department of Defense, United States of America and National Express LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv03358
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 192 MOTION to Sever and Remand by United States Air Force, United States Air National Guard Bureau, United States Department of Defense, United States of America. Response to Motion due by 2/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:18-cv-03358-RMG(Berlinsky, Lee)
January 28, 2019 Filing 191 TEXT ORDER The motion of various federal government defendants for a stay due to a lapse in government funding is denied as moot. (Dkt. No. (11) in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (189) in case 2:18-cv-03358-RMG). AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/28/2019.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:18-cv-03358-RMG(sshe, )
January 28, 2019 Filing 190 Withdrawal of Motions: (189 in 2:18-cv-03358-RMG, 11 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) MOTION to Stay filed by United States Department of Defense, United States Air National Guard Bureau, United States of America, United States Air Force.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:18-cv-03358-RMG(Berlinsky, Lee)
January 23, 2019 Filing 189 MOTION to Stay by United States Air Force, United States Air National Guard Bureau, United States Department of Defense, United States of America. Response to Motion due by 2/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:18-cv-03358-RMG(Bowens, Barbara)
January 22, 2019 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Massamillo on behalf of Federal Express Corporation (Massamillo, Eugene)
January 16, 2019 Filing 187 Letter from City of Newburgh Regarding Initial Status Conference. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:18-cv-03358-RMG(Kendall, Amy)
January 16, 2019 Filing 186 Letter from Counsel for Federal Express Corp.. (Attachments: #1 USDJ Kenneth M. Karas' Individual Rules, #2 FedEx's Pre-Motion Letter, #3 City of Newburgh's Letter in Opposition)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:18-cv-03358-RMG(Huang, Jennifer)
January 9, 2019 Filing 185 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron T Cassat on behalf of Federal Express Corporation (Cassat, Aaron)
January 2, 2019 Filing 184 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 181 STIPULATION to substitute parties and amend caption by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan)
December 18, 2018 Filing 180 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by City of Newburgh (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Tolling Agreement)(Knauf, Alan)
December 14, 2018 Filing 179 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern, 7:18-cv-07057, City of Newburgh v. United States of America et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03358-RMG (sshe, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 178 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (cpeg, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 177 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:18-cv-07057. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 12, 2018 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
December 12, 2018 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/7/2018) (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #141 Letter Motion to Stay ; terminating #161 Letter Motion for Conference ; terminating #173 Letter Motion for Conference: The Court has stayed this action pending the JPMDL's resolution of the parties motion. This stay applies to all parties in this case. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/20/2018) (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 175 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Alan J. Knauf dated November 15, 2018 re: #173 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Filing of Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jennifer Huang dated November 9, 2018. . Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 174 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John William Cerreta, II on behalf of Chubb Fire, Ltd., Kidde PLC Inc., United Technologies Corporation. (Cerreta, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 9, 2018 Filing 173 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: Filing of Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jennifer Huang dated November 9, 2018. Document filed by Federal Express Corporation.(Huang, Jennifer) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 5, 2018 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #173 Notice. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (db) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER FOR ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE AND TO APPEAR FOR CONFERENCES VIA TELEPHONE granting #171 Motion for Aaron T. Cassat to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned matter is granted. The admitted attorney, Aaron T. Cassat, is permitted to argue or try this particular case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate for Defendant, Federal Express Corporation. This Order becomes effective upon the Court's receipt of the required $200.00 fee and confirms your appearance as counsel in this case. A notation of your admission pro hac vice in the above-listed case will be made on the roll of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/1/2018) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 1, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #171 MOTION for Aaron T. Cassat to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15843736. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 171 MOTION for Aaron T. Cassat to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15843736. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Federal Express Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Aaron Cassat, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Eckert, Anthony) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 31, 2018 Filing 170 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony William Eckert, III on behalf of Federal Express Corporation. (Eckert, Anthony) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 169 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Huang on behalf of Federal Express Corporation. (Huang, Jennifer) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #164 Letter filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P. ENDORSEMENT: All deadlines in this case are stayed pending the JPML decision. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/24/2018) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 24, 2018 Filing 167 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Angus International Safety Group, Ltd. served on 10/10/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. Service was accepted by Paul Williams. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Filing 166 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Alan J. Knauf dated October 22, 2018 re: #161 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #35 Complaint,,, regarding Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Colin Kelly dated October 17, 2018. . Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #163 Motion for Caroline M. Gieser to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/22/2018) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 164 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Douglas E. Fleming III dated October 19, 2018 re: Defendant Fire Service Plus, Inc's Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P..(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 19, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #163 MOTION for Caroline M. Gieser to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15774403. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 163 MOTION for Caroline M. Gieser to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-15774403. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fire Service Plus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Caroline Gieser, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wickersham, Matthew) Modified on 10/19/2018 (wb). Modified on 10/19/2018 (wb). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 18, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/22/2018 (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER with respect to #161 Letter Motion for Conference. Plaintiff is to respond to this letter by 10/22/18. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/17/2018) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 17, 2018 Filing 161 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #35 Complaint,,, regarding Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Colin Kelly dated October 17, 2018. Document filed by Fire Service Plus, Inc..(Wickersham, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States of America answer due 11/15/2018. (ne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #152 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Extension request is granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/12/2018) (ne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 159 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Alan J. Knauf dated October 11, 2018 re: #141 LETTER MOTION to Stay Pending Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Douglas E. Fleming III dated October 2, 2018. re: #153 LETTER MOTION to Dismiss from Jeffrey D. Dintzer dated October 8, 2018. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting #157 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. New York State Department of Transportation answer due 11/15/2018; State Of New York answer due 11/15/2018 (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/10/2018) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 157 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #35 Complaint,,, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Mihir A. Desai dated October 9, 2018. Document filed by New York Air National Guard, New York State Department of Transportation, State Of New York.(Desai, Mihir) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #155 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted, but there will be no more extensions. SO ORDERED. (SWF Airport Acquisition, Inc. answer due 11/22/2018) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/9/2018) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 155 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Kristin Carter Rowe dated October 9, 2018. Document filed by SWF Airport Acquisition, Inc..(Rowe, Kristin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 154 LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Kathleen Gill Miller, Esq. dated October 9, 2018 re: Late Filing of Position Letter due to ECF System Unavailability on October 5, 2018. Document filed by Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Attachments: #1 The Port Authority's Position Letter on 3M/Tyco's Pre-Motion Letter)(Miller, Kathleen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 8, 2018 Filing 153 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jeffrey Dintzer, Colin Kelly and Matthew Wickersham dated October 8, 2018 re: #141 LETTER MOTION to Stay Pending Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Douglas E. Fleming III dated October 2, 2018. . Document filed by Fire Service Plus, Inc.. (Wickersham, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 152 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for the government to respond to the complaint, and response to letter-motion to stay addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Samuel Dolinger dated 10/5/2018. Document filed by United States Air Force, United States Air National Guard Bureau, United States Department of Defense, United States of America.(Dolinger, Samuel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 151 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Hilliard Dolinger on behalf of United States Air Force, United States Air National Guard Bureau, United States Department of Defense, United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 150 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Alan J. Knauf dated October 5, 2018 re: #141 LETTER MOTION to Stay Pending Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Douglas E. Fleming III dated October 2, 2018. . Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #148 Proposed Consent Order filed by Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. ENDORSEMENT: Granted, one last time. SO ORDERED. Port Authority of New York and New Jersey answer due 11/2/2018. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/4/2018) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 148 PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Mino, Nicholas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #138 Motion for Matthew Chase Wickersham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/3/2018) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #136 Motion for Jeffrey David Dintzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Movant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/3/2018) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #142 Motion for Colin K. Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/3/2018) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting #134 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Buckeye Fire Equipment Company answer due 11/5/2018; Chemguard, Inc. answer due 11/5/2018; Chubb Fire, Ltd. answer due 11/5/2018; Kidde PLC Inc. answer due 11/5/2018; The 3M Company answer due 11/5/2018; Tyco Fire Products L.P. answer due 11/5/2018; United Technologies Corporation answer due 11/5/2018) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/2/2018) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #137 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. For good cause shown, the requested extension is hereby GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Fire Service Plus, Inc. answer due 11/8/2018) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/2/2018) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 3, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #142 MOTION for Colin K. Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15649740. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 142 MOTION for Colin K. Kelly to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15649740. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fire Service Plus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Colin K. Kelly, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Colin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 141 LETTER MOTION to Stay Pending Pre-Motion Conference addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Douglas E. Fleming III dated October 2, 2018. Document filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P..(Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 140 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fire Service Plus, Inc..(Wickersham, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 139 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Chemguard, Inc.. Document filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P..(Armstrong, Katherine) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 1, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #136 MOTION for Jeffrey David Dintzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15640650. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #138 MOTION for Matthew Chase Wickersham to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15641228. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The documents have been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 138 MOTION for Matthew Chase Wickersham to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15641228. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fire Service Plus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Matthew Wickersham, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wickersham, Matthew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 137 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #35 Complaint,,, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Jeffrey D. Dintzer, Colin K. Kelly and Matthew C. Wickersham dated October 1, 2018. Document filed by Fire Service Plus, Inc..(Dintzer, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 136 MOTION for Jeffrey David Dintzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15640650. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fire Service Plus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey Dintzer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dintzer, Jeffrey) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 135 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc. served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. Service was accepted by Mary Berkowitz. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 134 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Katherine Armstrong dated September 28, 2018. Document filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P..(Armstrong, Katherine) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Anne Armstrong on behalf of Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (Armstrong, Katherine) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 132 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. National Foam, Inc. served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. Service was accepted by Process Manager. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 131 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Angus Fire Armour Corporation served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. Service was accepted by Process Manager. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 130 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Federal Express Corporation waiver sent on 9/11/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 129 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Chemguard, Inc. waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 128 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York Air National Guard served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 127 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York State Department of Transportation served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 126 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. State Of New York served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 125 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Port Authority of New York and New Jersey served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. Service was accepted by Noel Stevenson, employee. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. SO ORDERED. SWF Airport Acquisition, Inc. answer due 10/23/2018. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/12/2018) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 123 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #35 Complaint,,, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Dean S Sommer and Kristin Carter Rowe dated September 11, 2018. Document filed by SWF Airport Acquisition, Inc..(Sommer, Dean) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 122 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristin Carter Rowe on behalf of SWF Airport Acquisition, Inc.. (Rowe, Kristin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 121 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dean Stuart Sommer on behalf of SWF Airport Acquisition, Inc.. (Sommer, Dean) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 120 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan David Sagalowsky on behalf of The 3M Company. (Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 9, 2018 Filing 119 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. United Technologies Corporation waiver sent on 8/8/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 9, 2018 Filing 118 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kidde PLC Inc. waiver sent on 8/8/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 9, 2018 Filing 117 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Chubb Fire, Ltd. waiver sent on 8/8/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 9, 2018 Filing 116 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Fire Service Plus, Inc. waiver sent on 8/8/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 9, 2018 Filing 115 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. The 3M Company waiver sent on 8/8/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 9, 2018 Filing 114 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Tyco Fire Products L.P. waiver sent on 8/8/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 113 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The 3M Company.(Calica, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Jonathan Calica on behalf of The 3M Company. (Calica, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 111 WAIVER re: Waiver of the Service of Summons. Document filed by SWF Airport Acquisition, Inc..(Rowe, Kristin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #109 Proposed Order for Withdrawal of Attorney filed by City of Newburgh. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED. (Attorney Meaghan A. Colligan terminated.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/6/2018) (anc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 109 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 3, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: New York Air National Guard answer due 10/16/2018. (js) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
September 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #107 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. So Ordered. New York State Department of Transportation answer due 10/16/2018; State Of New York answer due 10/16/2018 (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/1/2018) (js) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 107 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #35 Complaint,,, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Mihir A. Desai dated August 30, 2018. Document filed by New York State Department of Transportation, State Of New York.(Desai, Mihir) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mihir Ashok Desai on behalf of New York State Department of Transportation, State Of New York. (Desai, Mihir) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 105 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Buckeye Fire Equipment Company waiver sent on 8/8/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #102 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #35 Complaint. Granted. So Ordered. (Port Authority of New York and New Jersey answer due 10/11/2018.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/29/2018) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen Gill Miller on behalf of Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Miller, Kathleen) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 102 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #35 Complaint,,, addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Nicholas Mino, Esq. dated August 28, 2018. Document filed by Port Authority of New York and New Jersey.(Mino, Nicholas)[Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Mino on behalf of Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (Mino, Nicholas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy K, Kendall on behalf of City of Newburgh. (Kendall, Amy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 99 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States of America served on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 98 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States Air National Guard Bureau served on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 97 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States Air Force served on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 96 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. United States Department of Defense served on 8/17/2018, answer due 10/16/2018. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 95 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York Air National Guard served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. Service was accepted by Gary M. Levine, Esq., Deputy Assistant Attorney General for the State of New York. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 94 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York State Department of Transportation served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. Service was accepted by Gary M. Levine, Esq., Deputy Assistant Attorney General for the State of New York. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 93 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Port Authority of New York and New Jersey served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. Service was accepted by Gary M. Levine, Esq., Deputy Assistant Attorney General for the State of New York. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 92 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. State Of New York served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. Service was accepted by Gary M. Levine, Esq., Deputy Assistant Attorney General for the State of New York. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 10, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Meaghan A. Colligan to RE-FILE Document No. #90 Request for Issuance of Summons, #87 Request for Issuance of Summons, #88 Request for Issuance of Summons, #89 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; This party was previously issued a summons. If you require a new summons you must request an Amended Summons. Please include the word "Amended" on the summons. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 91 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Express Group, PLC. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 90 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/10/2018 (dnh). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 89 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York State Department of Transportation, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/10/2018 (dnh). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 88 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York Air National Guard, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/10/2018 (dnh). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 87 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to State of New York, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/10/2018 (dnh). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 86 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Express Group, PLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George A. Rodenhausen on behalf of City of Newburgh. (Rodenhausen, George) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John J. Walsh, II on behalf of City of Newburgh. (Walsh, John) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Meaghan A. Colligan to RE-FILE Document No. #64 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the defendant name listed in the 'To:' section must directly correspond to the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 83 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Air National Guard Bureau. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 82 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Air National Guard Bureau. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 81 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Angus International Safety Group, Ltd.. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 80 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Port Authority of New York and New Jersey. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 79 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York State Department of Transportation. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 78 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York Air National Guard. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 77 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to State Of New York. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 76 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Air Force. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 75 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Air Force. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 74 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Air Force. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 73 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Air National Guard Bureau. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 72 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Defense. (dnh) (Main Document 72 replaced on 8/9/2018) (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 71 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Defense. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 70 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Defense. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 69 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 68 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 8, 2018 Filing 67 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chubb Fire, Ltd.. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 66 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by City of Newburgh(Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 65 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 64 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Express Group, PLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/8/2018 (dnh). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 63 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 62 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York State Department of Transportation, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 61 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York Air National Guard, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 60 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to State of New York, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 59 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Air Force, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 58 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Air Force, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 57 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Air Force, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 56 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Air National Guard Bureau, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 55 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Air National Guard Bureau, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 54 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Air National Guard Bureau, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 53 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Defense, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 52 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Defense, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 51 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Defense, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 50 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 49 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 48 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chubb Fire, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,,, #35 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Meaghan A. Colligan to RE-FILE Document No. #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #29 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #14 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #13 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #18 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, #15 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #17 Request for Issuance of Summons, #16 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason: the second party name in the 'To' field must include 'care of' (c/o) or 'via'. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Meaghan A. Colligan to RE-FILE Document No. #32 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason: no defendant name or address entered in the 'To' field on the summons request form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 47 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United Technologies Corporation. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 46 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tyco Fire Products L.P.. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 45 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to SWF Airport Acquisition, Inc.. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 44 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Foam, Inc.. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 43 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kidde PLC Inc.. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 42 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 41 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fire Service Plus, Inc.. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 40 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Express Corporation. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 39 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chemguard, Inc.. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 38 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Buckeye Fire Equipment Company. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Angus Fire Armour Corporation. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 36 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The 3M Company. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 35 COMPLAINT against Angus Fire Armour Corporation, Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., Chubb Fire, Ltd., Federal Express Corporation, Fire Service Plus, Inc., John Does 1-10, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC Inc., National Express Group, PLC, National Foam, Inc., New York Air National Guard, New York State Department of Transportation, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, SWF Airport Acquisition, Inc., State Of New York, The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products L.P., United States Air Force, United States Air National Guard Bureau, United States Department of Defense, United States of America, United Technologies Corporation. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - City of Newburgh Watershed Maps)(Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents City of Newburgh, Angus Fire Armour Corporation, Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., Chubb Fire, Ltd., Federal Express Corporation, Fire Service Plus, Inc., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC Inc., National Express Group, PLC, National Foam, Inc., New York Air National Guard, New York State Department of Transportation, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, SWF Airport Acquisition, Inc., State Of New York, The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products L.P., United States Air Force, United States Air National Guard Bureau, United States Department of Defense, United States of America, United Technologies Corporation, John Does 1-10 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,,,.Document filed by City of Newburgh. Related document: #1 Complaint,,,,.(Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 34 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Meaghan A. Colligan to RE-FILE re: Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reasons: all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; John Does 1-10 must be added to CM ECF; all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not entered/selected. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. *DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSER FOR THIS EVENT* Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Meaghan A. Colligan. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Duplicate party was added to the case in error. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Meaghan A. Colligan. The party information for the following parties has been modified: The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products L.P. The information for the parties has been modified for the following reason: alias party name was omitted. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Jon Knauf on behalf of City of Newburgh. (Knauf, Alan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 7, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Meaghan A. Colligan to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reasons: 6 DIFFERENT NATURES OF SUIT SELECTED; 2 DIFFERENT BASIS OF JURISDICTION SELECTED; CIVIL COVER SHEET WAS NOT SIGNED; ONLY ONE NATURE OF SUIT MAY BE SELECTED; ONLY ONE BASIS OF JURISDICTION MAY BE SELECTED; JURY DEMANDED ON PLEADING BUT NOT INDICATED ON CIVIL COVER SHEET. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 32 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chubb Fire, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 31 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Foam, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Angus Fire Armour Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 29 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 28 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kidde PLC Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United Technologies Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 25 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fire Service Plus, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chemguard, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tyco Fire Products L.P., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co.), re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 20 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Express Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SWF Airport Acquisition, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 18 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Express Group, PLC, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 17 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York State Department of Transportation, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York Air National Guard, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to State of New York, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Air Force, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Air Force, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Air National Guard Bureau, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Air National Guard Bureau, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Air National Guard Bureau, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Defense, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Defense, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Defense, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Angus Fire Armour Corporation, Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., Chubb Fire, Ltd., Federal Express Corporation, Fire Service Plus, Inc., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC Inc., National Express Group, PLC, National Foam, Inc., New York Air National Guard, New York State Department of Transportation, Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, SWF Airport Acquisition, Inc., State Of New York, The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.), Tyco Fire Products L.P., United States Air Force, United States Air National Guard Bureau, United States Department of Defense, United Technologies Corporation, United States of America. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-15413690)Document filed by City of Newburgh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit City of Newburgh Watershed Maps)(Colligan, Meaghan) Modified on 8/7/2018 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/13/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Newburgh v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus International Safety Group, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Port Authority of New York and New Jersey
Represented By: Kathleen Gill Miller
Represented By: Nicholas Mino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Fire, Ltd.
Represented By: John William Cerreta, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Service Plus, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Chase Wickersham
Represented By: Colin Kamrath Kelly
Represented By: Jeffrey D Dintzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: John William Cerreta, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWF Airport Acquisition, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin Carter Rowe
Represented By: Dean Stuart Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Express Group, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New York
Represented By: Mihir Ashok Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Air National Guard Bureau
Represented By: Samuel Hilliard Dolinger
Represented By: Lee Ellis Berlinsky
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York Air National Guard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Katherine Anne Armstrong
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Represented By: John William Cerreta, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Huang
Represented By: Anthony William Eckert, III
Represented By: Aaron T Cassat
Represented By: Eugene Massamillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Air Force
Represented By: Samuel Hilliard Dolinger
Represented By: Lee Ellis Berlinsky
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Transportation
Represented By: Mihir Ashok Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Calica
Represented By: Jordan David Sagalowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Katherine Anne Armstrong
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus Fire Armour Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Defense
Represented By: Samuel Hilliard Dolinger
Represented By: Lee Ellis Berlinsky
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Samuel Hilliard Dolinger
Represented By: Lee Ellis Berlinsky
Represented By: Barbara Murcier Bowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Express LLC
Represented By: Kristin Carter Rowe
Represented By: Dean Stuart Sommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Newburgh
Represented By: John J. Walsh, II
Represented By: Amy K, Kendall
Represented By: Alan Jon Knauf
Represented By: George A. Rodenhausen
Represented By: Amy K Kendall
Represented By: John J Walsh, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?