Braun et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Louella Niter, Earl Cooley, Lesa Criswell, Cheryl Tillery, Dale Braun, Deanne Martinez, Jeremy Meumann, Darryl Scott, Janeth Jones, Julie Hawley-Solache, Donna Lynn Smith, Daniel Cruz, Gary Rich, Fredric Shuman, Doris McCraw, Lisa Lasselle, Gary Thomas Sr., Lorlea Brown, Kimberly Mills, Kristy Raub, Dennis Gaster, Lou Anne Smith, David Kevin Criswell, Elizabeth Mixon, Keith Woodworth, Joseph Lucero, Joseph Jaramillo, Douglas Criswel, Jose Lugo, David Marchand, Josette Gordon, Barbara Thompson, Delbert Murray Rounds, Dwight Barstad, Lori Rich, Lisa Joy, Dennis Brown, James Lasselle, Louis Trebotich, Jerry Helkey, Gerald Trujillo, Lillie Stone, Erika Oehm, Cora Woodworth, Linda Trumpfheller, Janit Pollard, Loretta Trujillo, Conrado Sims Sr., Debbie Wheeler, Lisa Reyes, Helen Negrette, Gabriel Trujillo, Kelly Sherman, James Weaver IV, Gregorio Martinez-Pagan, John Stirgus, Andrew Thompson, Elaine Trebotich, Ethel Montgomery, Kenneth Loveless, Leilani Marchand, Kathleen Zajicek, Kimberly Sims and Elizabeth Vlascity
Defendant: Williams Holdings, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Chemguard National Foam Inc. and 3M Company, The
Case Number: 2:2018cv03370
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 24 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-00742, Braun et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03370-RMG (sshe, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries.(sshe, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-00742. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 12, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 18-cv-00742 RBJ-KMT to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/12/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Dwight Barstad, Dale Braun, Dennis Brown, Lorlea Brown, Earl Cooley, Douglas Criswel, David Kevin Criswell, Lesa Criswell, Daniel Cruz, Dennis Gaster, Josette Gordon, Julie Hawley-Solache, Jerry Helkey, Joseph Jaramillo, Janeth Jones, Lisa Joy, James Lasselle, Lisa Lasselle, Kenneth Loveless, Joseph Lucero, Jose Lugo, David Marchand, Leilani Marchand, Deanne Martinez, Gregorio Martinez-Pagan, Doris McCraw, Jeremy Meumann, Kimberly Mills, Elizabeth Mixon, Ethel Montgomery, Helen Negrette, Louella Niter, Erika Oehm, Janit Pollard, Kristy Raub, Lisa Reyes, Gary Rich, Lori Rich, Delbert Murray Rounds, Darryl Scott, Kelly Sherman, Fredric Shuman, Kimberly Sims, Conrado Sims Sr., Donna Lynn Smith, Lou Anne Smith, John Stirgus, Lillie Stone, Gary Thomas Sr., Andrew Thompson, Barbara Thompson, Cheryl Tillery, Elaine Trebotich, Louis Trebotich, Gabriel Trujillo, Gerald Trujillo, Loretta Trujillo, Linda Trumpfheller, Elizabeth Vlascity, James Weaver IV, Debbie Wheeler, Cora Woodworth, Keith Woodworth, Kathleen Zajicek. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 3.2(b) and 40.1(a) and (d)(4)(b), and with the consent of the judges involved and my authority as Chief Judge, this case is reassigned to Judge Jackson to serve as the presiding Article III judge. The Clerk of the Court shall modify the Court's records to reflect Judge Jackson as the assigned Article III judge in this case. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/17/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. The Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED. Attorney Hyman is no longer counsel of record in this matter. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 08/27/2018. Text Only Entry (msklc4, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Dwight Barstad, Dale Braun, Dennis Brown, Lorlea Brown, Earl Cooley, Douglas Criswel, David Kevin Criswell, Lesa Criswell, Daniel Cruz, Dennis Gaster, Josette Gordon, Julie Hawley-Solache, Jerry Helkey, Joseph Jaramillo, Janeth Jones, Lisa Joy, James Lasselle, Lisa Lasselle, Kenneth Loveless, Joseph Lucero, Jose Lugo, David Marchand, Leilani Marchand, Deanne Martinez, Gregorio Martinez-Pagan, Doris McCraw, Jeremy Meumann, Kimberly Mills, Elizabeth Mixon, Ethel Montgomery, Helen Negrette, Louella Niter, Erika Oehm, Janit Pollard, Kristy Raub, Lisa Reyes, Gary Rich, Lori Rich, Delbert Murray Rounds, Darryl Scott, Kelly Sherman, Fredric Shuman, Kimberly Sims, Conrado Sims Sr., Donna Lynn Smith, Lou Anne Smith, John Stirgus, Lillie Stone, Gary Thomas Sr., Andrew Thompson, Barbara Thompson, Cheryl Tillery, Elaine Trebotich, Louis Trebotich, Gabriel Trujillo, Gerald Trujillo, Loretta Trujillo, Linda Trumpfheller, Elizabeth Vlascity, James Weaver IV, Debbie Wheeler, Cora Woodworth, Keith Woodworth, Kathleen Zajicek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dwight Barstad(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dale Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dennis Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lorlea Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Earl Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Douglas Criswel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Kevin Criswell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lesa Criswell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dennis Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Josette Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Julie Hawley-Solache(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jerry Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Jaramillo (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Janeth Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Lasselle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Lasselle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Loveless(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Lucero(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jose Lugo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Marchand(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Leilani Marchand(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Deanne Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gregorio Martinez-Pagan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Doris McCraw(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeremy Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly Mills(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Mixon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ethel Montgomery(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Helen Negrette(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Louella Niter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Erika Oehm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Janit Pollard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristy Raub(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Reyes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gary Rich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lori Rich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Delbert Murray Rounds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Darryl Scott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelly Sherman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fredric Shuman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Conrado Sims Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donna Lynn Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lou Anne Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Stirgus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lillie Stone(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gary Thomas Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Andrew Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Barbara Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cheryl Tillery(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elaine Trebotich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Louis Trebotich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gabriel Trujillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gerald Trujillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Loretta Trujillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Linda Trumpfheller(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Vlascity(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Weaver IV(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debbie Wheeler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cora Woodworth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Keith Woodworth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathleen Zajicek(pty:pla) (McDivitt, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
June 13, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC by Plaintiffs Dwight Barstad, Dale Braun, Dennis Brown, Lorlea Brown, Earl Cooley, Douglas Criswel, David Kevin Criswell, Lesa Criswell, Daniel Cruz, Dennis Gaster, Josette Gordon, Julie Hawley-Solache, Jerry Helkey, Joseph Jaramillo, Janeth Jones, Lisa Joy, James Lasselle, Lisa Lasselle, Kenneth Loveless, Joseph Lucero, Jose Lugo, David Marchand, Leilani Marchand, Deanne Martinez, Gregorio Martinez-Pagan, Doris McCraw, Jeremy Meumann, Kimberly Mills, Elizabeth Mixon, Ethel Montgomery, Helen Negrette, Louella Niter, Erika Oehm, Janit Pollard, Kristy Raub, Lisa Reyes, Gary Rich, Lori Rich, Delbert Murray Rounds, Darryl Scott, Kelly Sherman, Fredric Shuman, Kimberly Sims, Conrado Sims Sr., Donna Lynn Smith, Lou Anne Smith, John Stirgus, Lillie Stone, Gary Thomas Sr., Andrew Thompson, Barbara Thompson, Cheryl Tillery, Elaine Trebotich, Louis Trebotich, Gabriel Trujillo, Gerald Trujillo, Loretta Trujillo, Linda Trumpfheller, Elizabeth Vlascity, James Weaver IV, Debbie Wheeler, Cora Woodworth, Keith Woodworth, Kathleen Zajicek. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Request - Buckeye Fire Protection Co., #2 Summons Summons Request - Chemguard, #3 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fire, #4 Summons Summons Request - Kidde PLC, #5 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fenwal, #6 Summons Summons Request - National Foam, Inc., #7 Summons Summons Request - Tyco Fire Products LP, #8 Summons Summons Request - UTC Fire)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for June 26, 2018, is vacated, to be reset at a later date. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/6/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
May 9, 2018 Filing 13 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #12 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorneyPatrick James Lanciotti. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dwight Barstad(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dale Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dennis Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lorlea Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Earl Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Douglas Criswel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Kevin Criswell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lesa Criswell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dennis Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Josette Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julie Hawley-Solache(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jerry Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Jaramillo (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janeth Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Lasselle(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa Lasselle(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Loveless(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Lucero(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jose Lugo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Marchand(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Leilani Marchand(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Deanne Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gregorio Martinez-Pagan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Doris McCraw(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeremy Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Mills(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Mixon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ethel Montgomery(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Helen Negrette(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Louella Niter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Erika Oehm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janit Pollard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristy Raub(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa Reyes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gary Rich(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lori Rich(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Delbert Murray Rounds(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Darryl Scott(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kelly Sherman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Fredric Shuman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Conrado Sims Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donna Lynn Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lou Anne Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Stirgus(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lillie Stone(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gary Thomas Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Andrew Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Barbara Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cheryl Tillery(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elaine Trebotich(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Louis Trebotich(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gabriel Trujillo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gerald Trujillo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Loretta Trujillo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Linda Trumpfheller(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Vlascity(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Weaver IV(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debbie Wheeler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cora Woodworth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Keith Woodworth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathleen Zajicek(pty:pla) (Lanciotti, Patrick) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/26/2018 at 10:00 AM in Suite 1000 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/30/2018. (ipark, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M Company, The, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard National Foam Inc., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., filed by Erika Oehm, Louella Niter, Gabriel Trujillo, Jose Lugo, David Kevin Criswell, Doris McCraw, Lisa Lasselle, Lisa Joy, Conrado Sims Sr., Kathleen Zajicek, Jeremy Meumann, Andrew Thompson, Elaine Trebotich, Joseph Lucero, Dennis Gaster, Helen Negrette, Kristy Raub, Josette Gordon, Gary Thomas Sr., Elizabeth Mixon, Elizabeth Vlascity, Delbert Murray Rounds, Gerald Trujillo, Barbara Thompson, Kelly Sherman, Julie Hawley-Solache, Janeth Jones, Debbie Wheeler, Louis Trebotich, John Stirgus, Donna Lynn Smith, Kenneth Loveless, Keith Woodworth, Dwight Barstad, James Lasselle, Dale Braun, Ethel Montgomery, Gregorio Martinez-Pagan, Kimberly Mills, Darryl Scott, Joseph Jaramillo, Cheryl Tillery, Deanne Martinez, Cora Woodworth, Leilani Marchand, Fredric Shuman, Lou Anne Smith, David Marchand, Jerry Helkey, Douglas Criswel, Dennis Brown, Lisa Reyes, Daniel Cruz, James Weaver IV, Lillie Stone, Lesa Criswell, Lori Rich, Lorlea Brown, Janit Pollard, Gary Rich, Kimberly Sims, Earl Cooley.(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/3/18. Text Only Entry (pglov) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: As currently pled, the Complaint #1 is jurisdictionally deficient. The Plaintiffs invoke the Court's subject-matter jurisdiction founded on diversity of citizenship. The Complaint fails to adequately allege the principal place of business, and therefore the citizenship, of Defendants National Foam, Inc. (para. 123) and Williams Holdings, Inc. (para. 128, 130). 28 U.S.C. 1332(c)(1). Within 14 days of this Order, the Plaintiffs shall file an Amended Complaint that cures these jurisdictional defects or otherwise show cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/2/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to:(1)Convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters;(2)ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. Early Neutral Evaluation is approved. On the informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in a settlement conference conducted by the magistrate judge if the parties have engaged in an Early Neutral Evaluation and are unable to afford or otherwise attain private settlement assistance;(3)Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/2/18. (msklc2, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dwight Barstad(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dale Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dennis Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lorlea Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Earl Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Douglas Criswel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Kevin Criswell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lesa Criswell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dennis Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Josette Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julie Hawley-Solache(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jerry Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Jaramillo (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Janeth Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Lasselle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Lasselle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Loveless(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Lucero(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jose Lugo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Marchand(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leilani Marchand(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deanne Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gregorio Martinez-Pagan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Doris McCraw(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeremy Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly Mills(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Mixon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ethel Montgomery(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Helen Negrette(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Louella Niter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Erika Oehm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Janit Pollard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristy Raub(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Reyes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gary Rich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lori Rich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Delbert Murray Rounds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Darryl Scott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelly Sherman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fredric Shuman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donna Lynn Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Conrado Sims Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lou Anne Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Stirgus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lillie Stone(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gary Thomas Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andrew Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Barbara Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cheryl Tillery(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elaine Trebotich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Louis Trebotich(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gabriel Trujillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gerald Trujillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Loretta Trujillo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Loretta Trujilo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Linda Trumpfheller(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Vlascity(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Weaver IV(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debbie Wheeler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cora Woodworth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Keith Woodworth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathleen Zajicek(pty:pla) (McDivitt, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dwight Barstad(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dale Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lorlea Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Earl Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Douglas Criswel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Kevin Criswell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lesa Criswell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Josette Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julie Hawley-Solache(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jerry Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Jaramillo (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janeth Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Lasselle(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Lasselle(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Loveless(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Lucero(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jose Lugo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Marchand(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leilani Marchand(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deanne Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gregorio Martinez-Pagan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Doris McCraw(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeremy Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Mills(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Mixon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ethel Montgomery(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Helen Negrette(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Louella Niter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Erika Oehm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janit Pollard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristy Raub(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Reyes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gary Rich(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lori Rich(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Delbert Murray Rounds(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darryl Scott(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelly Sherman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fredric Shuman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donna Lynn Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Conrado Sims Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lou Anne Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Stirgus(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lillie Stone(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gary Thomas Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andrew Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Barbara Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cheryl Tillery(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elaine Trebotich(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Louis Trebotich(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gabriel Trujillo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gerald Trujillo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Loretta Trujillo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Loretta Trujilo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Trumpfheller(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Vlascity(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Weaver IV(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debbie Wheeler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cora Woodworth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Keith Woodworth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kathleen Zajicek(pty:pla) (Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued, Incomplete party caption, Summons must list all parties in the caption. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tate James Kunkle on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dwight Barstad(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dale Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dennis Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Loralea Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Earl Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party David Kevin Criswell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Douglas Criswell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Lesa Criswell(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Daniel Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Dennis Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Josette Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Julie Hawley-Solache(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jerry Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joseph Jaramillo (pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Janeth Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Lisa Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Lasselle(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Lisa Lasselle(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kenneth Loveless(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Joseph Lucero(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jose Lugo(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party David Marchand(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Leilani Marchand(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Deanne Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Gregorio Martinez-Pagan(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Doris McCraw(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Jeremy Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kimberly Mills(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Elizabeth Mixon(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Ethel Montgomery(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Helen Negrette(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Louella Niter(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Erika Oehm(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Janit Pollard(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kristy Raub(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Lisa Reyes(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Gary Rich(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Lori Rich(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Delbert Murray Rounds(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Darryl Scott(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kelly Sherman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Fredric Shuman(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Donna Lynn Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kimberly Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Conrado Sims Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Lou Anne Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party John Stirgus(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Lillie Stone(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Gary Thomas Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Andrew Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Barbara Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Cheryl Tillery(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Elaine Trebotich(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Louis Trebotich(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Loretta Trujillo(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Gabriel Trujilo(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Gerald Trujilo(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Loretta Trujilo(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Linda Trumpfheller(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Elizabeth Vlascity(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party James Weaver IV(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Debbie Wheeler(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Cora Woodworth(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Keith Woodworth(pty:pla), Attorney Tate James Kunkle added to party Kathleen Zajicek(pty:pla) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Protection Co., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam, Inc., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6026210)Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Dwight Barstad(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Dale Braun(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Dennis Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Loralea Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Earl Cooley(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party David Kevin Criswell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Douglas Criswell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Lesa Criswell(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Daniel Cruz(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Dennis Gaster(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Josette Gordon(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Julie Hawley-Solache(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jerry Helkey(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joseph Jaramillo (pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Janeth Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Lisa Joy(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party James Lasselle(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Lisa Lasselle(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kenneth Loveless(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joseph Lucero(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jose Lugo(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party David Marchand(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Leilani Marchand(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Deanne Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Gregorio Martinez-Pagan(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Doris McCraw(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jeremy Meumann(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kimberly Mills(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Elizabeth Mixon(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ethel Montgomery(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Helen Negrette(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Louella Niter(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Erika Oehm(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Janit Pollard(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kristy Raub(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Lisa Reyes(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Gary Rich(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Lori Rich(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Delbert Murray Rounds(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Darryl Scott(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kelly Sherman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Fredric Shuman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Donna Lynn Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kimberly Sims(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Conrado Sims Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Lou Anne Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party John Stirgus(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Lillie Stone(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Gary Thomas Sr.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Andrew Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Barbara Thompson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cheryl Tillery(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Elaine Trebotich(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Louis Trebotich(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Loretta Trujillo(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Gabriel Trujilo(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Gerald Trujilo(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Loretta Trujilo(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Linda Trumpfheller(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Elizabeth Vlascity(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party James Weaver IV(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Debbie Wheeler(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Cora Woodworth(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Keith Woodworth(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kathleen Zajicek(pty:pla), filed by Erika Oehm, Louella Niter, Gabriel Trujilo, Jose Lugo, David Kevin Criswell, Doris McCraw, Lisa Lasselle, Lisa Joy, Conrado Sims Sr., Kathleen Zajicek, Jeremy Meumann, Andrew Thompson, Elaine Trebotich, Joseph Lucero, Dennis Gaster, Helen Negrette, Kristy Raub, Josette Gordon, Gary Thomas Sr., Linda Trumpfheller, Elizabeth Mixon, Elizabeth Vlascity, Delbert Murray Rounds, Gerald Trujilo, Barbara Thompson, Kelly Sherman, Julie Hawley-Solache, Janeth Jones, Debbie Wheeler, Louis Trebotich, John Stirgus, Donna Lynn Sims, Kenneth Loveless, Loretta Trujilo, Keith Woodworth, Dwight Barstad, James Lasselle, Dale Braun, Ethel Montgomery, Gregorio Martinez-Pagan, Kimberly Mills, Darryl Scott, Joseph Jaramillo, Cheryl Tillery, Loretta Trujillo, Deanne Martinez, Cora Woodworth, Leilani Marchand, Fredric Shuman, Lou Anne Smith, David Marchand, Jerry Helkey, Douglas Criswell, Dennis Brown, Lisa Reyes, Daniel Cruz, James Weaver IV, Lillie Stone, Lesa Criswell, Lori Rich, Loralea Brown, Janit Pollard, Gary Rich, Kimberly Sims, Earl Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/13/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braun et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louella Niter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Cooley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesa Criswell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Tillery
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Braun
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanne Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Meumann
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Scott
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janeth Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Hawley-Solache
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Lynn Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Cruz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Rich
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredric Shuman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris McCraw
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Lasselle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Thomas Sr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorlea Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Mills
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Raub
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Gaster
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Anne Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kevin Criswell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Mixon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Woodworth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lucero
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Jaramillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Criswel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Lugo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Marchand
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josette Gordon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Thompson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delbert Murray Rounds
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwight Barstad
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Rich
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Joy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lasselle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Trebotich
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Helkey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Trujillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Stone
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Oehm
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Woodworth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Trumpfheller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janit Pollard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Trujillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conrado Sims Sr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Wheeler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Reyes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Negrette
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Trujillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Sherman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Weaver IV
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregorio Martinez-Pagan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Stirgus
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Thompson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Trebotich
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Montgomery
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Loveless
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leilani Marchand
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Zajicek
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Sims
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Vlascity
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Tate J Kunkle
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard National Foam Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?