Chisholm et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Espinosa, Renate Lawson, Jo Ann Smith, Lisa (I) Davis, Robert Jones, David Smith, Matthew Wilkie, Jessica Lee Taylor, Marion Reynolds, Christine Valverde, Joy Hampton, Media Duggan, Matthew Cullers, Peter Castille, Jr., Peter (I) Castille, Jr., Shane Thurston, Cheryl Chisholm, Matthew (I) Cullers, Jack Hiltman, Lesley Cullers, Kelly Mosey, Sandra Logan, Bennie Jackson, Julianne Rogers, Wayne Roberts, Anneliese Conklin, Gregory Davis, Geoffrey Browning, Stephen Taylor, Lakisha (I) Thomas, Jeffrey Vetter, Ryan Goettl, Leota Brixen, Lanette Jackson, Alex (I) Paul Sanchez, Donald Taylor, Mary Wagner, Greogory Walters, Jennifer Anne Sanchez, Larry Lawson, Ruth Thompson, Angela Glenn, Richard Clements, Denisha Mobley, Darrell Hanson, Sean Westerman, Ernest Conklin, Sandra Reynolds, Kevin Davis, Tracy Smith, Constance Roberts, Diane Bradford, Deabryon Thomas, Lasabrea (I) Hutchison, Lieutenant William Martin, Marilyn Davis, Troy Keag, Lisa Davis, Eleanor Wozniak, Steven Hooks, Kaylah Henre, Earl Mauldin, Jr., William Harold Cathey, Bobby Jamison, Nelson Boddie, Tamra Wagner, Antionette Gallegos, Lakisha Thomas, Robert Mcnair, Billy (I) Rogers, Paul Valverde, Anthony Davis, Samuel Twitty, Marion McAlhaney, Monica Mays-Davison, Rosemarie Pinkney, Tabatha Wolfe, Destiny Leech, James Davis, Blair Jackson, Casey Fitzpatrick, Arnold (I) Wilson, Robert Glenn, Miguel Santiago, Denise Singleton-Cox, Stephen Smith, James Wagner, Beverly Dahl, Robert Rodriguez, Mary Losoya, Mario Edmonds, Sandra Cathey, Warren Wagner, Glen Gallegos, Lottie Mauldin, Terry Hampton, Rosalyn (I) Hanson, Shy-Anne Gramsch, Mary Nick, Janet Walters, Michael Martinez, Jennifer Stacy-Bozarth, Estevan Pacheco, Raymond Morad, Charles Kruger, Police Officer John Murray, David Thompson, Precious Cooper, Ilene Talty, Stephen Clements, Tina Christine West, Adam Hampton, Timothy Reaves, Rhiannon Elugardo, Ernest Beverly, III, Ruth (I) Thompson, Bruce Beadles, Tammy Adams, Jennifer Jones, Johnny Butler, Billy Rogers, Amber Lynch, Shekiera Goettl, Gabrielle Bolds, Cathleen Twitty, Pauline Wilkie, Robert Gallegos, Waleraud Halverson, Jessica Smith, Bridget Mewborn, Daniel Bozarth, John Mosey, Theresa Espinosa, Terri Clements, Sean Hanson, Jurgen Bock, La Donna Rodgers, Alyse Rzemekthomas Griffin, Marion Still, Christian Cullers, Ladonna (I) Pacheco, William Burke, Dana Mcnair, Shawn (I) Belter, Rhiannon (I) Elugardo, Shawn Belter, Michael Meyer, Nickolaus Lawson, Mary Santy, Cecilia Kruger, Arnold Wilson, Ladonna Pacheco, Jennifer (I) Jones, Lou Smith, Linda Tabaka, Tyrell Rogers, Giana Wright, Charles Chisholm, Douglas Hackbarth, John Nick, Rosalyn Hanson, Shy-Anne (I) Gramsch, Audra Fitzpatrick, Timothy Davison, Raymond Jones, Jr, James Wilkie, Judy McAlhaney, Peter Valverde, Macrina Carrera, Michael Wright, Kandi Belter, Amber Burke, Elizabeth Burlingame, Lasabrea Hutchison, Marnello Boddie, James West, Timonty Patrick Abeyta, Phyllis Taylor, Alex Paul Sanchez, Robert Thurston, Debra Holmes-Cooper, James Moseley, Robert Mewborn, Aimee Reid, Bianca Holmes, Sally Hanson and Dwayne Cooper
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Kidde PLC, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., National Foam Inc, 3M Company, The, Chemguard and Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv03383
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 23 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01152, Chisholm et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03383-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01152. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 12, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01152 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Nelson Boddie, Gabrielle Bolds, Daniel Bozarth, Diane Bradford, Leota Brixen, Geoffrey Browning, Amber Burke, William Burke, Elizabeth Burlingame, Johnny Butler, Macrina Carrera, Peter Castille, Jr, Peter (I) Castille, Jr, Sandra Cathey, William Harold Cathey, Charles Chisholm, Cheryl Chisholm, Richard Clements, Stephen Clements, Terri Clements, Anneliese Conklin, Ernest Conklin, Dwayne Cooper, Precious Cooper, Christian Cullers, Lesley Cullers, Matthew Cullers, Matthew (I) Cullers, Beverly Dahl, Anthony Davis, Gregory Davis, James Davis, Kevin Davis, Lisa Davis, Lisa (I) Davis, Marilyn Davis, Timothy Davison, Media Duggan, Mario Edmonds, Rhiannon Elugardo, Rhiannon (I) Elugardo, Anthony Espinosa, Theresa Espinosa, Audra Fitzpatrick, Casey Fitzpatrick, Antionette Gallegos, Glen Gallegos, Robert Gallegos, Angela Glenn, Robert Glenn, Ryan Goettl, Shekiera Goettl, Shy-Anne Gramsch, Shy-Anne (I) Gramsch, Douglas Hackbarth, Waleraud Halverson, Adam Hampton, Joy Hampton, Terry Hampton, Darrell Hanson, Rosalyn Hanson, Rosalyn (I) Hanson, Sally Hanson, Sean Hanson, Kaylah Henre, Jack Hiltman, Bianca Holmes, Debra Holmes-Cooper, Steven Hooks, Lasabrea Hutchison, Lasabrea (I) Hutchison, Bennie Jackson, Blair Jackson, Lanette Jackson, Bobby Jamison, Bobby Jamison, Jennifer Jones, Jennifer (I) Jones, Raymond Jones, Jr, Robert Jones, Troy Keag, Cecilia Kruger, Charles Kruger, Larry Lawson, Nickolaus Lawson, Renate Lawson, Destiny Leech, Sandra Logan, Mary Losoya, Amber Lynch, William Martin, Michael Martinez, Earl Mauldin, Jr, Lottie Mauldin, Monica Mays-Davison, Timonty Patrick Abeyta, Tammy Adams, Bruce Beadles, Kandi Belter, Shawn Belter, Shawn (I) Belter, Ernest Beverly, III, Jurgen Bock, Marnello Boddie, Judy McAlhaney, Marion McAlhaney, Dana Mcnair, Robert Mcnair, Bridget Mewborn, Robert Mewborn, Michael Meyer, Denisha Mobley, Raymond Morad, James Moseley, John Mosey, Kelly Mosey, John Murray, John Nick, Mary Nick, Estevan Pacheco, Ladonna Pacheco, Ladonna (I) Pacheco, Rosemarie Pinkney, Timothy Reaves, Aimee Reid, Marion Reynolds, Sandra Reynolds, Constance Roberts, Wayne Roberts, La Donna Rodgers, Robert Rodriguez, Robert Rodriguez, Billy Rogers, Billy (I) Rogers, Julianne Rogers, Tyrell Rogers, Alyse Rzemekthomas Griffin, Alex Paul Sanchez, Alex (I) Paul Sanchez, Jennifer Anne Sanchez, Miguel Santiago, Mary Santy, Denise Singleton-Cox, David Smith, Jessica Smith, Jo Ann Smith, Lou Smith, Stephen Smith, Tracy Smith, Jennifer Stacy-Bozarth, Marion Still, Linda Tabaka, Ilene Talty, Donald Taylor, Jessica Lee Taylor, Phyllis Taylor, Stephen Taylor, Deabryon Thomas, Lakisha Thomas, Lakisha (I) Thomas, David Thompson, Ruth Thompson, Ruth (I) Thompson, Robert Thurston, Shane Thurston, Cathleen Twitty, Samuel Twitty, Christine Valverde, Paul Valverde, Peter Valverde, Jeffrey Vetter, James Wagner, Mary Wagner, Tamra Wagner, Warren Wagner, Greogory Walters, Janet Walters, James West, Tina Christine West, Sean Westerman, James Wilkie, Matthew Wilkie, Pauline Wilkie, Arnold Wilson, Arnold (I) Wilson, Tabatha Wolfe, Eleanor Wozniak, Giana Wright, Michael Wright. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Nelson Boddie, Gabrielle Bolds, Daniel Bozarth, Diane Bradford, Leota Brixen, Geoffrey Browning, Amber Burke, William Burke, Elizabeth Burlingame, Johnny Butler, Macrina Carrera, Peter Castille, Jr, Peter (I) Castille, Jr, Sandra Cathey, William Harold Cathey, Charles Chisholm, Cheryl Chisholm, Richard Clements, Stephen Clements, Terri Clements, Anneliese Conklin, Ernest Conklin, Dwayne Cooper, Precious Cooper, Christian Cullers, Lesley Cullers, Matthew Cullers, Matthew (I) Cullers, Beverly Dahl, Anthony Davis, Gregory Davis, James Davis, Kevin Davis, Lisa Davis, Lisa (I) Davis, Marilyn Davis, Timothy Davison, Media Duggan, Mario Edmonds, Rhiannon Elugardo, Rhiannon (I) Elugardo, Anthony Espinosa, Theresa Espinosa, Audra Fitzpatrick, Casey Fitzpatrick, Antionette Gallegos, Glen Gallegos, Robert Gallegos, Angela Glenn, Robert Glenn, Ryan Goettl, Shekiera Goettl, Shy-Anne Gramsch, Shy-Anne (I) Gramsch, Douglas Hackbarth, Waleraud Halverson, Adam Hampton, Joy Hampton, Terry Hampton, Darrell Hanson, Rosalyn Hanson, Rosalyn (I) Hanson, Sally Hanson, Sean Hanson, Kaylah Henre, Jack Hiltman, Bianca Holmes, Debra Holmes-Cooper, Steven Hooks, Lasabrea Hutchison, Lasabrea (I) Hutchison, Bennie Jackson, Blair Jackson, Lanette Jackson, Bobby Jamison, Bobby Jamison, Jennifer Jones, Jennifer (I) Jones, Raymond Jones, Jr, Robert Jones, Troy Keag, Cecilia Kruger, Charles Kruger, Larry Lawson, Nickolaus Lawson, Renate Lawson, Destiny Leech, Sandra Logan, Mary Losoya, Amber Lynch, William Martin, Michael Martinez, Earl Mauldin, Jr, Lottie Mauldin, Monica Mays-Davison, Timonty Patrick Abeyta, Tammy Adams, Bruce Beadles, Kandi Belter, Shawn Belter, Shawn (I) Belter, Ernest Beverly, III, Jurgen Bock, Marnello Boddie, Judy McAlhaney, Marion McAlhaney, Dana Mcnair, Robert Mcnair, Bridget Mewborn, Robert Mewborn, Michael Meyer, Denisha Mobley, Raymond Morad, James Moseley, John Mosey, Kelly Mosey, John Murray, John Nick, Mary Nick, Estevan Pacheco, Ladonna Pacheco, Ladonna (I) Pacheco, Rosemarie Pinkney, Timothy Reaves, Aimee Reid, Marion Reynolds, Sandra Reynolds, Constance Roberts, Wayne Roberts, La Donna Rodgers, Robert Rodriguez, Robert Rodriguez, Billy Rogers, Billy (I) Rogers, Julianne Rogers, Tyrell Rogers, Alyse Rzemekthomas Griffin, Alex Paul Sanchez, Alex (I) Paul Sanchez, Jennifer Anne Sanchez, Miguel Santiago, Mary Santy, Denise Singleton-Cox, David Smith, Jessica Smith, Jo Ann Smith, Lou Smith, Stephen Smith, Tracy Smith, Jennifer Stacy-Bozarth, Marion Still, Linda Tabaka, Ilene Talty, Donald Taylor, Jessica Lee Taylor, Phyllis Taylor, Stephen Taylor, Deabryon Thomas, Lakisha Thomas, Lakisha (I) Thomas, David Thompson, Ruth Thompson, Ruth (I) Thompson, Robert Thurston, Shane Thurston, Cathleen Twitty, Samuel Twitty, Christine Valverde, Paul Valverde, Peter Valverde, Jeffrey Vetter, James Wagner, Mary Wagner, Tamra Wagner, Warren Wagner, Greogory Walters, Janet Walters, James West, Tina Christine West, Sean Westerman, James Wilkie, Matthew Wilkie, Pauline Wilkie, Arnold Wilson, Arnold (I) Wilson, Tabatha Wolfe, Eleanor Wozniak, Giana Wright, Michael Wright. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nelson Boddie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nelson Boddie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gabrielle Bolds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gabrielle Bolds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Bozarth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Bozarth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Diane Bradford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Diane Bradford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Leota Brixen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Leota Brixen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Geoffrey Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Geoffrey Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amber Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Burlingame(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Burlingame(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Johnny Butler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Johnny Butler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Macrina Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Macrina Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Peter Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Peter Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Peter (I) Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Peter (I) Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sandra Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sandra Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Harold Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Harold Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cheryl Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cheryl Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stephen Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stephen Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terri Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terri Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anneliese Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anneliese Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ernest Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ernest Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dwayne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dwayne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Precious Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Precious Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christian Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christian Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lesley Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lesley Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Matthew Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Matthew Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Matthew (I) Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Matthew (I) Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Beverly Dahl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Beverly Dahl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kevin Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kevin Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa (I) Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa (I) Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marilyn Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marilyn Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Timothy Davison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Timothy Davison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Media Duggan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Media Duggan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mario Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mario Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rhiannon Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rhiannon Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rhiannon (I) Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rhiannon (I) Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anthony Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Theresa Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Theresa Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Audra Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Audra Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Casey Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Casey Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Antionette Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Antionette Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Glen Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Glen Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ryan Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ryan Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shekiera Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shekiera Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shy-Anne (I) Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shy-Anne (I) Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Douglas Hackbarth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Douglas Hackbarth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Waleraud Halverson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Waleraud Halverson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adam Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Adam Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joy Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joy Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terry Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terry Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Darrell Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Darrell Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rosalyn Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rosalyn Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rosalyn (I) Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rosalyn (I) Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sally Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sally Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sean Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sean Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kaylah Henre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kaylah Henre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to
June 22, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nelson Boddie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nelson Boddie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gabrielle Bolds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gabrielle Bolds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Bozarth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Bozarth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Diane Bradford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Diane Bradford(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leota Brixen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leota Brixen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Geoffrey Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Geoffrey Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amber Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Burlingame(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Burlingame(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Johnny Butler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Johnny Butler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Macrina Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Macrina Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Peter Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Peter Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Peter (I) Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Peter (I) Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sandra Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sandra Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Harold Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Harold Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cheryl Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cheryl Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stephen Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stephen Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terri Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terri Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anneliese Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anneliese Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ernest Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ernest Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dwayne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dwayne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Precious Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Precious Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christian Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christian Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lesley Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lesley Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Matthew Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Matthew Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Matthew (I) Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Matthew (I) Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Beverly Dahl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Beverly Dahl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kevin Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kevin Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa (I) Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa (I) Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marilyn Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marilyn Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Timothy Davison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Timothy Davison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Media Duggan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Media Duggan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mario Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mario Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhiannon Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhiannon Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhiannon (I) Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhiannon (I) Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anthony Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Theresa Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Theresa Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Audra Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Audra Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Casey Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Casey Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Antionette Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Antionette Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Glen Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Glen Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ryan Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ryan Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shekiera Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shekiera Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shy-Anne (I) Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shy-Anne (I) Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Douglas Hackbarth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Douglas Hackbarth(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Waleraud Halverson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Waleraud Halverson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adam Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Adam Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joy Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joy Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terry Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terry Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Darrell Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Darrell Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rosalyn Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rosalyn Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rosalyn (I) Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rosalyn (I) Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sally Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sally Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sean Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sean Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kaylah Henre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kaylah Henre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jack Hiltman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jack Hiltman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bianca Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bianca Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debra Holmes-Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debra Holmes-Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Hooks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Steven Hooks(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lasabrea Hutchison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lasabrea Hutchison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lasabrea (I) Hutchison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lasabrea (I) Hutchison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bennie Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bennie Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Blair Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added
June 22, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Bell, et al., v. The 3M Company, et al.,16-cv-2351-RBJ by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company by Plaintiffs Nelson Boddie, Gabrielle Bolds, Daniel Bozarth, Diane Bradford, Leota Brixen, Geoffrey Browning, Amber Burke, William Burke, Elizabeth Burlingame, Johnny Butler, Macrina Carrera, Peter Castille, Jr, Peter (I) Castille, Jr, Sandra Cathey, William Harold Cathey, Charles Chisholm, Cheryl Chisholm, Richard Clements, Stephen Clements, Terri Clements, Anneliese Conklin, Ernest Conklin, Dwayne Cooper, Precious Cooper, Christian Cullers, Lesley Cullers, Matthew Cullers, Matthew (I) Cullers, Beverly Dahl, Anthony Davis, Gregory Davis, James Davis, Kevin Davis, Lisa Davis, Lisa (I) Davis, Marilyn Davis, Timothy Davison, Media Duggan, Mario Edmonds, Rhiannon Elugardo, Rhiannon (I) Elugardo, Anthony Espinosa, Theresa Espinosa, Audra Fitzpatrick, Casey Fitzpatrick, Antionette Gallegos, Glen Gallegos, Robert Gallegos, Angela Glenn, Robert Glenn, Ryan Goettl, Shekiera Goettl, Shy-Anne Gramsch, Shy-Anne (I) Gramsch, Douglas Hackbarth, Waleraud Halverson, Adam Hampton, Joy Hampton, Terry Hampton, Darrell Hanson, Rosalyn Hanson, Rosalyn (I) Hanson, Sally Hanson, Sean Hanson, Kaylah Henre, Jack Hiltman, Bianca Holmes, Debra Holmes-Cooper, Steven Hooks, Lasabrea Hutchison, Lasabrea (I) Hutchison, Bennie Jackson, Blair Jackson, Lanette Jackson, Bobby Jamison, Bobby Jamison, Jennifer Jones, Jennifer (I) Jones, Raymond Jones, Jr, Robert Jones, Troy Keag, Cecilia Kruger, Charles Kruger, Larry Lawson, Nickolaus Lawson, Renate Lawson, Destiny Leech, Sandra Logan, Mary Losoya, Amber Lynch, William Martin, Michael Martinez, Earl Mauldin, Jr, Lottie Mauldin, Monica Mays-Davison, Timonty Patrick Abeyta, Tammy Adams, Bruce Beadles, Kandi Belter, Shawn Belter, Shawn (I) Belter, Ernest Beverly, III, Jurgen Bock, Marnello Boddie, Judy McAlhaney, Marion McAlhaney, Dana Mcnair, Robert Mcnair, Bridget Mewborn, Robert Mewborn, Michael Meyer, Denisha Mobley, Raymond Morad, James Moseley, John Mosey, Kelly Mosey, John Murray, John Nick, Mary Nick, Estevan Pacheco, Ladonna Pacheco, Ladonna (I) Pacheco, Rosemarie Pinkney, Timothy Reaves, Aimee Reid, Marion Reynolds, Sandra Reynolds, Constance Roberts, Wayne Roberts, La Donna Rodgers, Robert Rodriguez, Robert Rodriguez, Billy Rogers, Billy (I) Rogers, Julianne Rogers, Tyrell Rogers, Alyse Rzemekthomas Griffin, Alex Paul Sanchez, Alex (I) Paul Sanchez, Jennifer Anne Sanchez, Miguel Santiago, Mary Santy, Denise Singleton-Cox, David Smith, Jessica Smith, Jo Ann Smith, Lou Smith, Stephen Smith, Tracy Smith, Jennifer Stacy-Bozarth, Marion Still, Linda Tabaka, Ilene Talty, Donald Taylor, Jessica Lee Taylor, Phyllis Taylor, Stephen Taylor, Deabryon Thomas, Lakisha Thomas, Lakisha (I) Thomas, David Thompson, Ruth Thompson, Ruth (I) Thompson, Robert Thurston, Shane Thurston, Cathleen Twitty, Samuel Twitty, Christine Valverde, Paul Valverde, Peter Valverde, Jeffrey Vetter, James Wagner, Mary Wagner, Tamra Wagner, Warren Wagner, Greogory Walters, Janet Walters, James West, Tina Christine West, Sean Westerman, James Wilkie, Matthew Wilkie, Pauline Wilkie, Arnold Wilson, Arnold (I) Wilson, Tabatha Wolfe, Eleanor Wozniak, Giana Wright, Michael Wright. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Request - Buckeye Fire Protection Co., #2 Summons Summons Request - Chemguard, #3 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fire Fighting, #4 Summons Summons Request - Kidde PLC, #5 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fenwal, #6 Summons Summons Request - National Foam, Inc., #7 Summons Summons Request - Tyco Fire Products LP, #8 Summons Summons Request - UTC Fire)(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
June 21, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nelson Boddie, Gabrielle Bolds, Daniel Bozarth, Diane Bradford, Leota Brixen, Geoffrey Browning, Amber Burke, William Burke, Elizabeth Burlingame, Johnny Butler, Macrina Carrera, Peter Castille, Jr, Peter (I) Castille, Jr, Sandra Cathey, William Harold Cathey, Charles Chisholm, Cheryl Chisholm, Richard Clements, Stephen Clements, Terri Clements, Anneliese Conklin, Ernest Conklin, Dwayne Cooper, Precious Cooper, Christian Cullers, Lesley Cullers, Matthew Cullers, Matthew (I) Cullers, Beverly Dahl, Anthony Davis, Gregory Davis, James Davis, Kevin Davis, Lisa Davis, Lisa (I) Davis, Marilyn Davis, Timothy Davison, Media Duggan, Mario Edmonds, Rhiannon Elugardo, Rhiannon (I) Elugardo, Anthony Espinosa, Theresa Espinosa, Audra Fitzpatrick, Casey Fitzpatrick, Antionette Gallegos, Glen Gallegos, Robert Gallegos, Angela Glenn, Robert Glenn, Ryan Goettl, Shekiera Goettl, Shy-Anne Gramsch, Shy-Anne (I) Gramsch, Douglas Hackbarth, Waleraud Halverson, Adam Hampton, Joy Hampton, Terry Hampton, Darrell Hanson, Rosalyn Hanson, Rosalyn (I) Hanson, Sally Hanson, Sean Hanson, Kaylah Henre, Jack Hiltman, Bianca Holmes, Debra Holmes-Cooper, Steven Hooks, Lasabrea Hutchison, Lasabrea (I) Hutchison, Bennie Jackson, Blair Jackson, Lanette Jackson, Bobby Jamison, Bobby Jamison(individually), Jennifer Jones, Jennifer (I) Jones, Raymond Jones, Jr, Robert Jones, Troy Keag, Cecilia Kruger, Charles Kruger, Larry Lawson, Nickolaus Lawson, Renate Lawson, Destiny Leech, Sandra Logan, Mary Losoya, Amber Lynch, William Martin, Michael Martinez, Earl Mauldin, Jr, Lottie Mauldin, Monica Mays-Davison, Timonty Patrick Abeyta, Tammy Adams, Bruce Beadles, Kandi Belter, Shawn Belter, Shawn (I) Belter, Ernest Beverly, III, Jurgen Bock, Marnello Boddie, Judy McAlhaney, Marion McAlhaney, Dana Mcnair, Robert Mcnair, Bridget Mewborn, Robert Mewborn, Michael Meyer, Denisha Mobley, Raymond Morad, James Moseley, John Mosey, Kelly Mosey, John Murray, John Nick, Mary Nick, Estevan Pacheco, Ladonna Pacheco, Ladonna (I) Pacheco, Rosemarie Pinkney, Timothy Reaves, Aimee Reid, Marion Reynolds, Sandra Reynolds, Constance Roberts, Wayne Roberts, La Donna Rodgers, Robert Rodriguez(as), Robert Rodriguez(individually), Billy Rogers, Billy (I) Rogers, Julianne Rogers, Tyrell Rogers, Alyse Rzemekthomas Griffin, Alex Paul Sanchez, Alex (I) Paul Sanchez, Jennifer Anne Sanchez, Miguel Santiago, Mary Santy, Denise Singleton-Cox, David Smith, Jessica Smith, Jo Ann Smith, Lou Smith, Stephen Smith, Tracy Smith, Jennifer Stacy-Bozarth, Marion Still, Linda Tabaka, Ilene Talty, Donald Taylor, Jessica Lee Taylor, Phyllis Taylor, Stephen Taylor, Deabryon Thomas, Lakisha Thomas, Lakisha (I) Thomas, David Thompson, Ruth Thompson, Ruth (I) Thompson, Robert Thurston, Shane Thurston, Cathleen Twitty, Samuel Twitty, Christine Valverde, Paul Valverde, Peter Valverde, Jeffrey Vetter, James Wagner, Mary Wagner, Tamra Wagner, Warren Wagner, Greogory Walters, Janet Walters, James West, Tina Christine West, Sean Westerman, James Wilkie, Matthew Wilkie, Pauline Wilkie, Arnold Wilson, Arnold (I) Wilson, Tabatha Wolfe, Eleanor Wozniak, Giana Wright, Michael Wright. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Complaint (noted changes))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs may file their amended complaint no later than June 22, 2018. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/19/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Order to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Nelson Boddie, Gabrielle Bolds, Daniel Bozarth, Diane Bradford, Leota Brixen, Geoffrey Browning, Amber Burke, William Burke, Elizabeth Burlingame, Johnny Butler, Macrina Carrera, Peter Castille, Jr, Peter (I) Castille, Jr, Sandra Cathey, William Harold Cathey, Charles Chisholm, Cheryl Chisholm, Richard Clements, Stephen Clements, Terri Clements, Anneliese Conklin, Ernest Conklin, Dwayne Cooper, Precious Cooper, Christian Cullers, Lesley Cullers, Matthew Cullers, Matthew (I) Cullers, Beverly Dahl, Anthony Davis, Gregory Davis, James Davis, Kevin Davis, Lisa Davis, Lisa (I) Davis, Marilyn Davis, Timothy Davison, Media Duggan, Mario Edmonds, Rhiannon Elugardo, Rhiannon (I) Elugardo, Anthony Espinosa, Theresa Espinosa, Audra Fitzpatrick, Casey Fitzpatrick, Antionette Gallegos, Glen Gallegos, Robert Gallegos, Angela Glenn, Robert Glenn, Ryan Goettl, Shekiera Goettl, Shy-Anne Gramsch, Shy-Anne (I) Gramsch, Douglas Hackbarth, Waleraud Halverson, Adam Hampton, Joy Hampton, Terry Hampton, Darrell Hanson, Rosalyn Hanson, Rosalyn (I) Hanson, Sally Hanson, Sean Hanson, Kaylah Henre, Jack Hiltman, Bianca Holmes, Debra Holmes-Cooper, Steven Hooks, Lasabrea Hutchison, Lasabrea (I) Hutchison, Bennie Jackson, Blair Jackson, Lanette Jackson, Bobby Jamison, Bobby Jamison, Jennifer Jones, Jennifer (I) Jones, Raymond Jones, Jr, Robert Jones, Troy Keag, Cecilia Kruger, Charles Kruger, Larry Lawson, Nickolaus Lawson, Renate Lawson, Destiny Leech, Sandra Logan, Mary Losoya, Amber Lynch, William Martin, Michael Martinez, Earl Mauldin, Jr, Lottie Mauldin, Monica Mays-Davison, Timonty Patrick Abeyta, Tammy Adams, Bruce Beadles, Kandi Belter, Shawn Belter, Shawn (I) Belter, Ernest Beverly, III, Jurgen Bock, Marnello Boddie, Judy McAlhaney, Marion McAlhaney, Dana Mcnair, Robert Mcnair, Bridget Mewborn, Robert Mewborn, Michael Meyer, Denisha Mobley, Raymond Morad, James Moseley, John Mosey, Kelly Mosey, John Murray, John Nick, Mary Nick, Estevan Pacheco, Ladonna Pacheco, Ladonna (I) Pacheco, Rosemarie Pinkney, Timothy Reaves, Aimee Reid, Marion Reynolds, Sandra Reynolds, Constance Roberts, Wayne Roberts, La Donna Rodgers, Robert Rodriguez, Robert Rodriguez, Billy Rogers, Billy (I) Rogers, Julianne Rogers, Tyrell Rogers, Alyse Rzemekthomas Griffin, Alex Paul Sanchez, Alex (I) Paul Sanchez, Jennifer Anne Sanchez, Miguel Santiago, Mary Santy, Denise Singleton-Cox, David Smith, Jessica Smith, Jo Ann Smith, Lou Smith, Stephen Smith, Tracy Smith, Jennifer Stacy-Bozarth, Marion Still, Linda Tabaka, Ilene Talty, Donald Taylor, Jessica Lee Taylor, Phyllis Taylor, Stephen Taylor, Deabryon Thomas, Lakisha Thomas, Lakisha (I) Thomas, David Thompson, Ruth Thompson, Ruth (I) Thompson, Robert Thurston, Shane Thurston, Cathleen Twitty, Samuel Twitty, Christine Valverde, Paul Valverde, Peter Valverde, Jeffrey Vetter, James Wagner, Mary Wagner, Tamra Wagner, Warren Wagner, Greogory Walters, Janet Walters, James West, Tina Christine West, Sean Westerman, James Wilkie, Matthew Wilkie, Pauline Wilkie, Arnold Wilson, Arnold (I) Wilson, Tabatha Wolfe, Eleanor Wozniak, Giana Wright, Michael Wright. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Second Amended Complaint (mark-through), #3 Second Amended Complaint (Clean))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nelson Boddie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nelson Boddie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gabrielle Bolds(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gabrielle Bolds(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Bozarth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Bozarth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Diane Bradford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Diane Bradford(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leota Brixen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leota Brixen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Geoffrey Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Geoffrey Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amber Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Burlingame(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Burlingame(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Johnny Butler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Johnny Butler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Macrina Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Macrina Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Peter Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Peter Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Peter (I) Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Peter (I) Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sandra Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sandra Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Harold Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Harold Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cheryl Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cheryl Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stephen Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stephen Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terri Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terri Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anneliese Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anneliese Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ernest Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ernest Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dwayne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dwayne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Precious Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Precious Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christian Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christian Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lesley Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lesley Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Matthew Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Matthew Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Matthew (I) Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Matthew (I) Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Beverly Dahl(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Beverly Dahl(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kevin Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kevin Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa (I) Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa (I) Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marilyn Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marilyn Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Timothy Davison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Timothy Davison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Media Duggan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Media Duggan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mario Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mario Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhiannon Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhiannon Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhiannon (I) Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhiannon (I) Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anthony Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Theresa Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Theresa Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Audra Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Audra Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Casey Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Casey Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Antionette Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Antionette Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Glen Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Glen Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ryan Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ryan Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shekiera Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shekiera Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shy-Anne (I) Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shy-Anne (I) Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Douglas Hackbarth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Douglas Hackbarth(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Waleraud Halverson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Waleraud Halverson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adam Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Adam Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joy Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joy Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terry Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terry Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darrell Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Darrell Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rosalyn Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rosalyn Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rosalyn (I) Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rosalyn (I) Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sally Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sally Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sean Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sean Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kaylah Henre(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kaylah Henre(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jack Hiltman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jack Hiltman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bianca Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bianca Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debra Holmes-Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debra Holmes-Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Hooks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Steven Hooks(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lasabrea Hutchison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lasabrea Hutchison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lasabrea (I) Hutchison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lasabrea (I) Hutchison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bennie Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bennie Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Blair Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Blair Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lanette Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lanette Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bobby Jamison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bobby Jamison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bobby Jamison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bobby Jamison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer (I) Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer (I) Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Raymond Jones, Jr
June 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nelson Boddie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nelson Boddie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gabrielle Bolds(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gabrielle Bolds(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Bozarth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Bozarth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Diane Bradford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Diane Bradford(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Leota Brixen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Leota Brixen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Geoffrey Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Geoffrey Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amber Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amber Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Burlingame(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Burlingame(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Johnny Butler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Johnny Butler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Macrina Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Macrina Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Peter Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Peter Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Peter (I) Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Peter (I) Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sandra Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sandra Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Harold Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Harold Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cheryl Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cheryl Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Richard Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Richard Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stephen Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stephen Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terri Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terri Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anneliese Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anneliese Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ernest Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ernest Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dwayne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dwayne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Precious Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Precious Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christian Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christian Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lesley Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lesley Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Matthew Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Matthew Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Matthew (I) Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Matthew (I) Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Beverly Dahl(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Beverly Dahl(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kevin Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kevin Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa (I) Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa (I) Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marilyn Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marilyn Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Timothy Davison(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Timothy Davison(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Media Duggan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Media Duggan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mario Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mario Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rhiannon Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rhiannon Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rhiannon (I) Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rhiannon (I) Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anthony Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Theresa Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Theresa Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Audra Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Audra Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Casey Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Casey Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Antionette Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Antionette Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Glen Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Glen Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ryan Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ryan Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shekiera Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shekiera Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shy-Anne (I) Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shy-Anne (I) Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Douglas Hackbarth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Douglas Hackbarth(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Waleraud Halverson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Waleraud Halverson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adam Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Adam Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joy Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joy Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terry Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terry Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Darrell Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Darrell Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rosalyn Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rosalyn Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rosalyn (I) Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rosalyn (I) Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sally Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sally Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sean Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sean Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kaylah Henre(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kaylah Henre(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jack Hiltman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jack Hiltman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bianca Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bianca Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debra Holmes-Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debra Holmes-Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven Hooks(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Steven H
May 17, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Nelson Boddie, Gabrielle Bolds, Daniel Bozarth, Diane Bradford, Leota Brixen, Geoffrey Browning, Amber Burke, William Burke, Elizabeth Burlingame, Johnny Butler, Macrina Carrera, Peter Castille, Jr, Peter (I) Castille, Jr, Sandra Cathey, William Harold Cathey, Charles Chisholm, Cheryl Chisholm, Richard Clements, Stephen Clements, Terri Clements, Anneliese Conklin, Ernest Conklin, Dwayne Cooper, Precious Cooper, Christian Cullers, Lesley Cullers, Matthew Cullers, Matthew (I) Cullers, Beverly Dahl, Anthony Davis, Gregory Davis, James Davis, Kevin Davis, Lisa Davis, Lisa (I) Davis, Marilyn Davis, Timothy Davison, Media Duggan, Mario Edmonds, Rhiannon Elugardo, Rhiannon (I) Elugardo, Anthony Espinosa, Theresa Espinosa, Audra Fitzpatrick, Casey Fitzpatrick, Antionette Gallegos, Glen Gallegos, Robert Gallegos, Angela Glenn, Robert Glenn, Ryan Goettl, Shekiera Goettl, Shy-Anne Gramsch, Shy-Anne (I) Gramsch, Douglas Hackbarth, Waleraud Halverson, Adam Hampton, Joy Hampton, Terry Hampton, Darrell Hanson, Rosalyn Hanson, Rosalyn (I) Hanson, Sally Hanson, Sean Hanson, Kaylah Henre, Jack Hiltman, Bianca Holmes, Debra Holmes-Cooper, Steven Hooks, Lasabrea Hutchison, Lasabrea (I) Hutchison, Bennie Jackson, Blair Jackson, Lanette Jackson, Bobby Jamison, Bobby Jamison(individually), Jennifer Jones, Jennifer (I) Jones, Raymond Jones, Jr, Robert Jones, Troy Keag, Cecilia Kruger, Charles Kruger, Larry Lawson, Nickolaus Lawson, Renate Lawson, Destiny Leech, Sandra Logan, Mary Losoya, Amber Lynch, William Martin, Michael Martinez, Earl Mauldin, Jr, Lottie Mauldin, Monica Mays-Davison, Timonty Patrick Abeyta, Tammy Adams, Bruce Beadles, Kandi Belter, Shawn Belter, Shawn (I) Belter, Ernest Beverly, III, Jurgen Bock, Marnello Boddie, Judy McAlhaney, Marion McAlhaney, Dana Mcnair, Robert Mcnair, Bridget Mewborn, Robert Mewborn, Michael Meyer, Denisha Mobley, Raymond Morad, James Moseley, John Mosey, Kelly Mosey, John Murray, John Nick, Mary Nick, Estevan Pacheco, Ladonna Pacheco, Ladonna (I) Pacheco, Rosemarie Pinkney, Timothy Reaves, Aimee Reid, Marion Reynolds, Sandra Reynolds, Constance Roberts, Wayne Roberts, La Donna Rodgers, Robert Rodriguez(as), Robert Rodriguez(individually), Billy Rogers, Billy (I) Rogers, Julianne Rogers, Tyrell Rogers, Alyse Rzemekthomas Griffin, Alex Paul Sanchez, Alex (I) Paul Sanchez, Jennifer Anne Sanchez, Miguel Santiago, Mary Santy, Denise Singleton-Cox, David Smith, Jessica Smith, Jo Ann Smith, Lou Smith, Stephen Smith, Tracy Smith, Jennifer Stacy-Bozarth, Marion Still, Linda Tabaka, Ilene Talty, Donald Taylor, Jessica Lee Taylor, Phyllis Taylor, Stephen Taylor, Deabryon Thomas, Lakisha Thomas, Lakisha (I) Thomas, David Thompson, Ruth Thompson, Robert Thurston, Shane Thurston, Cathleen Twitty, Samuel Twitty, Christine Valverde, Paul Valverde, Peter Valverde, Jeffrey Vetter, James Wagner, Mary Wagner, Tamra Wagner, Warren Wagner, Greogory Walters, Janet Walters, James West, Tina Christine West, Sean Westerman, James Wilkie, Matthew Wilkie, Pauline Wilkie, Arnold Wilson, Arnold (I) Wilson, Tabatha Wolfe, Eleanor Wozniak, Giana Wright, Michael Wright.(Lomena, Edward) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #4 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cr-01152-KMT. (Text Only Entry) (rebsec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. (rebsec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons issued. (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/17/2018.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6100428)Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Timonty Patrick Abeyta(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Timonty Patrick Abeyta(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Tammy Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Tammy Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Bruce Beadles(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Bruce Beadles(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Kandi Belter(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Kandi Belter(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Shawn Belter(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Shawn Belter(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Shawn Belter(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Shawn Belter(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Shawn Belter(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Shawn Belter(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Shawn Belter(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Shawn Belter(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Shawn Belter(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Shawn Belter(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Ernest Beverly, III(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Ernest Beverly, III(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Jurgen Bock(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Jurgen Bock(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Marnello Boddie(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Marnello Boddie(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Nelson Boddie(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Nelson Boddie(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Gabrielle Bolds(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Gabrielle Bolds(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Daniel Bozarth(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Daniel Bozarth(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Diane Bradford(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Diane Bradford(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Leota Brixen(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Leota Brixen(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Geoffrey Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Geoffrey Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Amber Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Amber Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party William Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party William Burke(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Elizabeth Burlingame(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Elizabeth Burlingame(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Johnny Butler(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Johnny Butler(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Macrina Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Macrina Carrera(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Peter Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Peter Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Peter Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Peter Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Peter Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Peter Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Peter Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Peter Castille, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Sandra Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Sandra Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party William Harold Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party William Harold Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Charles Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Charles Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Cheryl Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Cheryl Chisholm(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Richard Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Richard Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Stephen Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Stephen Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Terri Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Terri Clements(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Anneliese Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Anneliese Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Ernest Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Ernest Conklin(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Dwayne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Dwayne Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Precious Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Precious Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Christian Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Christian Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Lesley Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Lesley Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Matthew Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Matthew Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Matthew Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Matthew Cullers(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Beverly Dahl(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Beverly Dahl(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Anthony Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Anthony Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Gregory Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party James Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party James Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Kevin Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Kevin Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Lisa Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Lisa Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Lisa Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Lisa Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Marilyn Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Marilyn Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Timothy Davison(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Timothy Davison(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Media Duggan(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Media Duggan(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Mario Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Mario Edmonds(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Rhiannon Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Rhiannon Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Rhiannon Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Rhiannon Elugardo(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Anthony Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Anthony Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Theresa Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Theresa Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Audra Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Audra Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Casey Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Casey Fitzpatrick(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Antionette Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Antionette Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Glen Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Glen Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Robert Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Robert Gallegos(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Angela Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Angela Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Robert Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Robert Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Ryan Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Ryan Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Shekiera Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Shekiera Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Shy-Anne Gramsch(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Douglas Hackbarth(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Douglas Hackbarth(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Waleraud Halverson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Waleraud Halverson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Adam Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Adam Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Joy Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Joy Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Terry Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Terry Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Darrell Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Darrell Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Rosalyn Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Rosalyn Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Rosalyn Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Rosalyn Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Sally Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Sally Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Sean Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Sean Hanson(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Kaylah Henre(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Kaylah Henre(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Jack Hiltman(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to party Jack Hiltman(pty:pla), Attorney Edward Lomena added to

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chisholm et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Espinosa
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renate Lawson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa (I) Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Wilkie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lee Taylor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Reynolds
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Valverde
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Hampton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Media Duggan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Cullers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Castille, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter (I) Castille, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Thurston
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Chisholm
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew (I) Cullers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Hiltman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesley Cullers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Mosey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Logan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennie Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julianne Rogers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Roberts
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anneliese Conklin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Browning
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Taylor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakisha (I) Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Vetter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Goettl
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leota Brixen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lanette Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex (I) Paul Sanchez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Taylor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Wagner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greogory Walters
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Anne Sanchez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Lawson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Thompson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Glenn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Clements
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denisha Mobley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Hanson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Westerman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Conklin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Reynolds
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Roberts
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Bradford
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deabryon Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lasabrea (I) Hutchison
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lieutenant William Martin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Keag
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Wozniak
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Hooks
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaylah Henre
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Mauldin, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Harold Cathey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Jamison
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Boddie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamra Wagner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antionette Gallegos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakisha Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Mcnair
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy (I) Rogers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Valverde
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Twitty
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion McAlhaney
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Mays-Davison
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemarie Pinkney
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabatha Wolfe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destiny Leech
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blair Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold (I) Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Glenn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Santiago
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Singleton-Cox
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wagner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Dahl
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Rodriguez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Losoya
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Edmonds
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Cathey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Wagner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Gallegos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lottie Mauldin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Hampton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalyn (I) Hanson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shy-Anne Gramsch
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Nick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Walters
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Stacy-Bozarth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estevan Pacheco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Morad
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Kruger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Police Officer John Murray
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Thompson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precious Cooper
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilene Talty
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Clements
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Christine West
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Hampton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Reaves
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhiannon Elugardo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Beverly, III
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth (I) Thompson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Beadles
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Adams
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Butler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Rogers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Lynch
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shekiera Goettl
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Bolds
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathleen Twitty
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pauline Wilkie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gallegos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waleraud Halverson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Mewborn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bozarth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mosey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Espinosa
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Clements
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Hanson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jurgen Bock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Donna Rodgers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyse Rzemekthomas Griffin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Still
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Cullers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladonna (I) Pacheco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Burke
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Mcnair
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn (I) Belter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhiannon (I) Elugardo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Belter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Meyer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nickolaus Lawson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Santy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Kruger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladonna Pacheco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer (I) Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Tabaka
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrell Rogers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giana Wright
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Chisholm
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Hackbarth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Nick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalyn Hanson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shy-Anne (I) Gramsch
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audra Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Davison
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Jones, Jr
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wilkie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy McAlhaney
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Valverde
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Macrina Carrera
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wright
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kandi Belter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Burke
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Burlingame
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lasabrea Hutchison
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marnello Boddie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James West
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timonty Patrick Abeyta
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Taylor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Paul Sanchez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Thurston
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Holmes-Cooper
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Moseley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Mewborn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aimee Reid
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bianca Holmes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Hanson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Cooper
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?