Hartley et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Kathy Smith, Melody Horton, Nelda Lampe, Paul Toth, Frank Goulee, Rosella Sharp, Michael Swain, Monique L. Sims, Sherine Thomas, Virgnina Johnson, Janet Whiteman, Charles Goodin, Jerry Lewis, Eric Moye, Pamela Dobler, Ernest Meno, Lori Ann Bodkin, Sandra Espinoza, Matthew Bell, Weston Greene, Xeandra Hypes, Yolanda Walker, Joseph Coffelt, Robert Williams, Jr, Edward Nowocin, Emrick Goergen, Anny Jackson, Michael Hunke, Damion Thomas, Delores Walker, Debra Toth, Priscila Espinosa, Jennifer Lehman, Destiny Lee-Anderson, Leatrice Thompson, Christine Franklin, John Bell, Clyde Hartley, Vicki Nowocin, Tara Thomas, Traveion Paillette, Beverly Rodriguez, Travis Myers, Zachary McClelland, Linda Bugtong, Derrick Malone, Michael Bazilewich, Keith Snipe, Rachel Lehman, Sabrina Hope, Symenthia Bryant, Ken Kleine, Linda Sanders, Richard Klopenstine, Denise Nightingale, Rebecca Doughty, Eric Demarco, Lisa Simmons, William Elliott, Shirley French, Wendy Wells, Lorna Figuera-Hypes, Andrew Padilla, Amy Myers, Robert Simmons, Hattie James, Maria Meno, Robert Washington, Stephanie Ruiz, Missy Washington, Jaylynn Deherrera-Ruiz, Samantha Rohweder, Jeremy Morse, Lisenka Wunder, Duane Moody, Roland Quidachay, Andrina McClelland, Alicia Swartz, James Goodin, Lieutenant Troy Johnson, Esiah Espinosa, Jason Nickle, Kristin Demarco, Sherrie McIntosh, Lisa Martinez, Paul Foster, Rebecca Foster, Kathryn Kleine, Stela Coffelt, Billy Lillie, Carolyn Goulee, Cristi Harris, Evangelo Hogan, Lou Schroll, Cassandra Malone, Jon Whiteman, Christopher McClelland, William Garrett, Lori Wolfe, Cheryl McKinney, Shannon Walker, Carroll Darrington, Steven Matli, Jonathan Nielsen, Basil Marinov, John Gilliam, Phillip Sanders, Joseph Cotner, Shamonya N. Laster, Deborah Shultz, Michael Reed, Angel K. Way, Brian Foley, Tawny E. Hobdy, Nevaeh Lee-Anderson, Tabian Horton, Robyn Palmer-Merritt, Jeannette Rogers, Crystal Meno, Michael Wood, Michael Wickham, Nancee McKethern, Elizabeth Park, Seth T. Campbell, Tina Walker, Pamela Lillie, Fernando Flores, Catherine Toner, Garland Foust, Denise Leyva, Patricia Hansen, Deborah Haskins, Tyeleen Mendoza, Nancy Matli, Lea Flores, Aurora Canepa, Michael John Klasing, Dale Rodriguez, Jimmy Sharp, Aaron Wells, Lawrence Shultz, Tanya Bryant, Joseph Jackson, Karola Kaufmann, Andrea Lettner, Jimmie Darrington, Shirley Hoover, Russell Thompson, Julie Mack, Larandi Tooks, Perry Ramquist, Leilani Garcia, Shawn Hope, Gayla Cotner, Dana Lieser, Gloria Hogan, Isaac Bryant, Jr., Gregory Smith and Tahisha Wyche-Gayle
Defendant: National Foam Inc, Tyco Fire Products LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., 3M Company, The, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc. and Chemguard
Case Number: 2:2018cv03398
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 17 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01191, Hartley et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03398-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01191. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01191 RJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Seth T. Campbell, Aurora Canepa, Joseph Coffelt, Stela Coffelt, Gayla Cotner, Joseph Cotner, Carroll Darrington, Jimmie Darrington, Jaylynn Deherrera-Ruiz, Eric Demarco, Kristin Demarco, Pamela Dobler, Rebecca Doughty, William Elliott, Esiah Espinosa, Priscila Espinosa, Sandra Espinoza, Lorna Figuera-Hypes, Fernando Flores, Lea Flores, Brian Foley, Paul Foster, Rebecca Foster, Garland Foust, Christine Franklin, Shirley French, Leilani Garcia, William Garrett, John Gilliam, Emrick Goergen, Charles Goodin, James Goodin, Carolyn Goulee, Frank Goulee, Weston Greene, Patricia Hansen, Cristi Harris, Clyde Hartley, Deborah Haskins, Tawny E. Hobdy, Evangelo Hogan, Gloria Hogan, Shirley Hoover, Sabrina Hope, Shawn Hope, Melody Horton, Tabian Horton, Michael Hunke, Xeandra Hypes, Anny Jackson, Joseph Jackson, Hattie James, Troy Johnson, Virgnina Johnson, Karola Kaufmann, Michael John Klasing, Kathryn Kleine, Ken Kleine, Richard Klopenstine, Nelda Lampe, Shamonya N. Laster, Destiny Lee-Anderson, Nevaeh Lee-Anderson, Jennifer Lehman, Rachel Lehman, Andrea Lettner, Jerry Lewis, Denise Leyva, Dana Lieser, Billy Lillie, Pamela Lillie, Julie Mack, Cassandra Malone, Derrick Malone, Basil Marinov, Lisa Martinez, Michael Bazilewich, John Bell, Matthew Bell, Lori Ann Bodkin, Isaac Bryant, Jr, Symenthia Bryant, Tanya Bryant, Linda Bugtong, Nancy Matli, Steven Matli, Andrina McClelland, Christopher McClelland, Zachary McClelland, Sherrie McIntosh, Nancee McKethern, Cheryl McKinney, Tyeleen Mendoza, Crystal Meno, Ernest Meno, Maria Meno, Duane Moody, Jeremy Morse, Eric Moye, Amy Myers, Travis Myers, Jason Nickle, Jonathan Nielsen, Denise Nightingale, Edward Nowocin, Vicki Nowocin, Andrew Padilla, Traveion Paillette, Robyn Palmer-Merritt, Elizabeth Park, Roland Quidachay, Perry Ramquist, Michael Reed, Beverly Rodriguez, Dale Rodriguez, Jeannette Rogers, Samantha Rohweder, Stephanie Ruiz, Linda Sanders, Phillip Sanders, Lou Schroll, Jimmy Sharp, Rosella Sharp, Deborah Shultz, Lawrence Shultz, Lisa Simmons, Robert Simmons, Monique L. Sims, Gregory Smith, Kathy Smith, Keith Snipe, Michael Swain, Alicia Swartz, Damion Thomas, Sherine Thomas, Tara Thomas, Leatrice Thompson, Russell Thompson, Catherine Toner, Larandi Tooks, Debra Toth, Paul Toth, Delores Walker, Shannon Walker, Tina Walker, Yolanda Walker, Missy Washington, Robert Washington, Angel K. Way, Wendy Wells, Aaron Wells, Janet Whiteman, Jon Whiteman, Michael Wickham, Robert Williams, Jr, Lori Wolfe, Michael Wood, Lisenka Wunder, Tahisha Wyche-Gayle. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Seth T. Campbell, Aurora Canepa, Joseph Coffelt, Stela Coffelt, Gayla Cotner, Joseph Cotner, Carroll Darrington, Jimmie Darrington, Jaylynn Deherrera-Ruiz, Eric Demarco, Kristin Demarco, Pamela Dobler, Rebecca Doughty, William Elliott, Esiah Espinosa, Priscila Espinosa, Sandra Espinoza, Lorna Figuera-Hypes, Fernando Flores, Lea Flores, Brian Foley, Paul Foster, Rebecca Foster, Garland Foust, Christine Franklin, Shirley French, Leilani Garcia, William Garrett, John Gilliam, Emrick Goergen, Charles Goodin, James Goodin, Carolyn Goulee, Frank Goulee, Weston Greene, Patricia Hansen, Cristi Harris, Clyde Hartley, Deborah Haskins, Tawny E. Hobdy, Evangelo Hogan, Gloria Hogan, Shirley Hoover, Sabrina Hope, Shawn Hope, Melody Horton, Tabian Horton, Michael Hunke, Xeandra Hypes, Anny Jackson, Joseph Jackson, Hattie James, Troy Johnson, Virgnina Johnson, Karola Kaufmann, Michael John Klasing, Kathryn Kleine, Ken Kleine, Richard Klopenstine, Nelda Lampe, Shamonya N. Laster, Destiny Lee-Anderson, Nevaeh Lee-Anderson, Jennifer Lehman, Rachel Lehman, Andrea Lettner, Jerry Lewis, Denise Leyva, Dana Lieser, Billy Lillie, Pamela Lillie, Julie Mack, Cassandra Malone, Derrick Malone, Basil Marinov, Lisa Martinez, Michael Bazilewich, John Bell, Matthew Bell, Lori Ann Bodkin, Isaac Bryant, Jr, Symenthia Bryant, Tanya Bryant, Linda Bugtong, Nancy Matli, Steven Matli, Andrina McClelland, Christopher McClelland, Zachary McClelland, Sherrie McIntosh, Nancee McKethern, Cheryl McKinney, Tyeleen Mendoza, Crystal Meno, Ernest Meno, Maria Meno, Duane Moody, Jeremy Morse, Eric Moye, Amy Myers, Travis Myers, Jason Nickle, Jonathan Nielsen, Denise Nightingale, Edward Nowocin, Vicki Nowocin, Andrew Padilla, Traveion Paillette, Robyn Palmer-Merritt, Elizabeth Park, Roland Quidachay, Perry Ramquist, Michael Reed, Beverly Rodriguez, Dale Rodriguez, Jeannette Rogers, Samantha Rohweder, Stephanie Ruiz, Linda Sanders, Phillip Sanders, Lou Schroll, Jimmy Sharp, Rosella Sharp, Deborah Shultz, Lawrence Shultz, Lisa Simmons, Robert Simmons, Monique L. Sims, Gregory Smith, Kathy Smith, Keith Snipe, Michael Swain, Alicia Swartz, Damion Thomas, Sherine Thomas, Tara Thomas, Leatrice Thompson, Russell Thompson, Catherine Toner, Larandi Tooks, Debra Toth, Paul Toth, Delores Walker, Shannon Walker, Tina Walker, Yolanda Walker, Missy Washington, Robert Washington, Angel K. Way, Wendy Wells, Aaron Wells, Janet Whiteman, Jon Whiteman, Michael Wickham, Robert Williams, Jr, Lori Wolfe, Michael Wood, Lisenka Wunder, Tahisha Wyche-Gayle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Seth T. Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Seth T. Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aurora Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aurora Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stela Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Stela Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gayla Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gayla Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carroll Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carroll Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jimmie Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jimmie Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jaylynn Deherrera-Ruiz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jaylynn Deherrera-Ruiz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eric Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Eric Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristin Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristin Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pamela Dobler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pamela Dobler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebecca Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebecca Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Esiah Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Esiah Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Priscila Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Priscila Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sandra Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sandra Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lorna Figuera-Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lorna Figuera-Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fernando Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Fernando Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lea Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lea Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Foley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Foley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Paul Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Paul Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebecca Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebecca Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Garland Foust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Garland Foust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shirley French(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shirley French(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Leilani Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Leilani Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Garrett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party William Garrett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Gilliam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Gilliam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Emrick Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Emrick Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carolyn Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carolyn Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Frank Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Frank Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Weston Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Weston Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cristi Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cristi Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Clyde Hartley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Clyde Hartley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Deborah Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Deborah Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tawny E. Hobdy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tawny E. Hobdy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Evangelo Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Evangelo Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gloria Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gloria Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shirley Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shirley Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sabrina Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sabrina Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shawn Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shawn Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tabian Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tabian Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Hunke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Hunke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Xeandra Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Xeandra Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anny Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Anny Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hattie James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hattie James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Troy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Troy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Virgnina Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Virgnina Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Karola Kaufmann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Karola Kaufmann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael John Klasing(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael John Klasing(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathryn Kleine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kathryn Kleine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ken Kleine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ken Kleine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Klopenstine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Klopenstine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nelda Lampe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nelda Lampe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shamonya N. Laster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Shamonya N. Laster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Destiny Lee-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Destiny Lee-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nevaeh Lee-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nevaeh Lee-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Lehman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Lehman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rachel Lehman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rachel Lehman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Andrea Lettner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt a
June 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Seth T. Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Seth T. Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aurora Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aurora Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stela Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Stela Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gayla Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gayla Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carroll Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carroll Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jimmie Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jimmie Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jaylynn Deherrera-Ruiz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jaylynn Deherrera-Ruiz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eric Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Eric Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristin Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristin Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Dobler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Dobler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebecca Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebecca Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Esiah Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Esiah Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Priscila Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Priscila Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sandra Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sandra Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lorna Figuera-Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lorna Figuera-Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fernando Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Fernando Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lea Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lea Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Foley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Foley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebecca Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebecca Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Garland Foust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Garland Foust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shirley French(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shirley French(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leilani Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leilani Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Garrett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party William Garrett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Gilliam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Gilliam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Emrick Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Emrick Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carolyn Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carolyn Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frank Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frank Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Weston Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Weston Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cristi Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cristi Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clyde Hartley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clyde Hartley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deborah Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Deborah Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tawny E. Hobdy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tawny E. Hobdy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Evangelo Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Evangelo Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gloria Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gloria Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shirley Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shirley Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sabrina Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sabrina Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shawn Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shawn Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tabian Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tabian Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Hunke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Hunke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Xeandra Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Xeandra Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anny Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Anny Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hattie James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hattie James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Troy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Troy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Virgnina Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Virgnina Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Karola Kaufmann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Karola Kaufmann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael John Klasing(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael John Klasing(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathryn Kleine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kathryn Kleine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ken Kleine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ken Kleine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Klopenstine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Klopenstine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nelda Lampe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nelda Lampe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shamonya N. Laster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Shamonya N. Laster(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Destiny Lee-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Destiny Lee-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nevaeh Lee-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nevaeh Lee-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Lehman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Lehman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rachel Lehman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rachel Lehman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andrea Lettner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andrea Lettner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jerry Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jerry Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Denise Leyva(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Denise Leyva(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dana Lieser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dana Lieser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Billy Lillie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Billy Lillie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Lillie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Lillie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julie Mack(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Julie Mack(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cassandra Malone(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cassandra Malone(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Derrick Malone(pty:pla), Attorney Michael
June 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC re #4 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Seth T. Campbell, Aurora Canepa, Joseph Coffelt, Stela Coffelt, Gayla Cotner, Joseph Cotner, Carroll Darrington, Jimmie Darrington, Jaylynn Deherrera-Ruiz, Eric Demarco, Kristin Demarco, Pamela Dobler, Rebecca Doughty, William Elliott, Esiah Espinosa, Priscila Espinosa, Sandra Espinoza, Lorna Figuera-Hypes, Fernando Flores, Lea Flores, Brian Foley, Paul Foster, Rebecca Foster, Garland Foust, Christine Franklin, Shirley French, Leilani Garcia, William Garrett, John Gilliam, Emrick Goergen, Charles Goodin, James Goodin, Carolyn Goulee, Frank Goulee, Weston Greene, Patricia Hansen, Cristi Harris, Clyde Hartley, Deborah Haskins, Tawny E. Hobdy, Evangelo Hogan, Gloria Hogan, Shirley Hoover, Sabrina Hope, Shawn Hope, Melody Horton, Tabian Horton, Michael Hunke, Xeandra Hypes, Anny Jackson, Joseph Jackson, Hattie James, Troy Johnson, Virgnina Johnson, Karola Kaufmann, Michael John Klasing, Kathryn Kleine, Ken Kleine, Richard Klopenstine, Nelda Lampe, Shamonya N. Laster, Destiny Lee-Anderson, Nevaeh Lee-Anderson, Jennifer Lehman, Rachel Lehman, Andrea Lettner, Jerry Lewis, Denise Leyva, Dana Lieser, Billy Lillie, Pamela Lillie, Julie Mack, Cassandra Malone, Derrick Malone, Basil Marinov, Lisa Martinez, Michael Bazilewich, John Bell, Matthew Bell, Lori Ann Bodkin, Isaac Bryant, Jr, Symenthia Bryant, Tanya Bryant, Linda Bugtong, Nancy Matli, Steven Matli, Andrina McClelland, Christopher McClelland, Zachary McClelland, Sherrie McIntosh, Nancee McKethern, Cheryl McKinney, Tyeleen Mendoza, Crystal Meno, Ernest Meno, Maria Meno, Duane Moody, Jeremy Morse, Eric Moye, Amy Myers, Travis Myers, Jason Nickle, Jonathan Nielsen, Denise Nightingale, Edward Nowocin, Vicki Nowocin, Andrew Padilla, Traveion Paillette, Robyn Palmer-Merritt, Elizabeth Park, Roland Quidachay, Perry Ramquist, Michael Reed, Beverly Rodriguez, Dale Rodriguez, Jeannette Rogers, Samantha Rohweder, Stephanie Ruiz, Linda Sanders, Phillip Sanders, Lou Schroll, Jimmy Sharp, Rosella Sharp, Deborah Shultz, Lawrence Shultz, Lisa Simmons, Robert Simmons, Monique L. Sims, Gregory Smith, Kathy Smith, Keith Snipe, Michael Swain, Alicia Swartz, Damion Thomas, Sherine Thomas, Tara Thomas, Leatrice Thompson, Russell Thompson, Catherine Toner, Larandi Tooks, Debra Toth, Paul Toth, Delores Walker, Shannon Walker, Tina Walker, Yolanda Walker, Missy Washington, Robert Washington, Angel K. Way, Wendy Wells, Aaron Wells, Janet Whiteman, Jon Whiteman, Michael Wickham, Robert Williams, Jr, Lori Wolfe, Michael Wood, Lisenka Wunder, Tahisha Wyche-Gayle. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Seth T. Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Seth T. Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aurora Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aurora Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stela Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Stela Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gayla Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gayla Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carroll Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carroll Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jimmie Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jimmie Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jaylynn Deherrera-Ruiz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jaylynn Deherrera-Ruiz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eric Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Eric Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristin Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristin Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela Dobler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela Dobler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebecca Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebecca Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Esiah Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Esiah Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Priscila Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Priscila Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sandra Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sandra Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lorna Figuera-Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lorna Figuera-Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Fernando Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Fernando Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lea Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lea Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Foley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Foley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebecca Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebecca Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Garland Foust(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Garland Foust(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shirley French(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shirley French(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Leilani Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Leilani Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Garrett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party William Garrett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Gilliam(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Gilliam(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Emrick Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Emrick Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carolyn Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carolyn Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Frank Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Frank Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Weston Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Weston Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cristi Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cristi Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Clyde Hartley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Clyde Hartley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Deborah Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Deborah Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tawny E. Hobdy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tawny E. Hobdy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Evangelo Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Evangelo Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gloria Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gloria Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shirley Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shirley Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sabrina Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sabrina Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shawn Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shawn Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tabian Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tabian Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Hunke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Hunke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Xeandra Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Xeandra Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anny Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Anny Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hattie James(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hattie James(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Troy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Troy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Virgnina Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Virgnina Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Karola Kaufmann(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Karola Kaufmann(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael John Klasing(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael John Klasing(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathryn Kleine(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kathryn Kleine(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ken Kleine(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ken Kleine(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Richard Klopenstine(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Richard Klopenstine(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nelda Lampe(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nelda Lampe(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shamonya N. Laster(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Shamonya N. Laster(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Destiny Lee-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Destiny Lee-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nevaeh Lee-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nevaeh Lee-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Lehman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Lehman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rachel Lehman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rachel Lehman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Andrea Lettner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Andrea Lettner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jerry Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jerry Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Denise Leyva(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Denise Leyva(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dana Lieser(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dana Lieser(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Billy Lillie(pty:pla),
June 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Seth T. Campbell, Aurora Canepa, Joseph Coffelt, Stela Coffelt, Gayla Cotner, Joseph Cotner, Carroll Darrington, Jimmie Darrington, Jaylynn Deherrera-Ruiz, Eric Demarco, Kristin Demarco, Pamela Dobler, Rebecca Doughty, William Elliott, Esiah Espinosa, Priscila Espinosa, Sandra Espinoza, Lorna Figuera-Hypes, Fernando Flores, Lea Flores, Brian Foley, Paul Foster, Rebecca Foster, Garland Foust, Christine Franklin, Shirley French, Leilani Garcia, William Garrett, John Gilliam, Emrick Goergen, Charles Goodin, James Goodin, Carolyn Goulee, Frank Goulee, Weston Greene, Patricia Hansen, Cristi Harris, Clyde Hartley, Deborah Haskins, Tawny E. Hobdy, Evangelo Hogan, Gloria Hogan, Shirley Hoover, Sabrina Hope, Shawn Hope, Melody Horton, Tabian Horton, Michael Hunke, Xeandra Hypes, Anny Jackson, Joseph Jackson, Hattie James, Troy Johnson, Virgnina Johnson, Karola Kaufmann, Michael John Klasing, Kathryn Kleine, Ken Kleine, Richard Klopenstine, Nelda Lampe, Shamonya N. Laster, Destiny Lee-Anderson, Nevaeh Lee-Anderson, Jennifer Lehman, Rachel Lehman, Andrea Lettner, Jerry Lewis, Denise Leyva, Dana Lieser, Billy Lillie, Pamela Lillie, Julie Mack, Cassandra Malone, Derrick Malone, Basil Marinov, Lisa Martinez, Michael Bazilewich, John Bell, Matthew Bell, Lori Ann Bodkin, Isaac Bryant, Jr, Symenthia Bryant, Tanya Bryant, Linda Bugtong, Nancy Matli, Steven Matli, Andrina McClelland, Christopher McClelland, Zachary McClelland, Sherrie McIntosh, Nancee McKethern, Cheryl McKinney, Tyeleen Mendoza, Crystal Meno, Ernest Meno, Maria Meno, Duane Moody, Jeremy Morse, Eric Moye, Amy Myers, Travis Myers, Jason Nickle, Jonathan Nielsen, Denise Nightingale, Edward Nowocin, Vicki Nowocin, Andrew Padilla, Traveion Paillette, Robyn Palmer-Merritt, Elizabeth Park, Roland Quidachay, Perry Ramquist, Michael Reed, Beverly Rodriguez, Dale Rodriguez, Jeannette Rogers, Samantha Rohweder, Stephanie Ruiz, Linda Sanders, Phillip Sanders, Lou Schroll, Jimmy Sharp, Rosella Sharp, Deborah Shultz, Lawrence Shultz, Lisa Simmons, Robert Simmons, Monique L. Sims, Gregory Smith, Kathy Smith, Keith Snipe, Michael Swain, Alicia Swartz, Damion Thomas, Sherine Thomas, Tara Thomas, Leatrice Thompson, Russell Thompson, Catherine Toner, Larandi Tooks, Debra Toth, Paul Toth, Delores Walker, Shannon Walker, Tina Walker, Yolanda Walker, Missy Washington, Robert Washington, Angel K. Way, Wendy Wells, Aaron Wells, Janet Whiteman, Jon Whiteman, Michael Wickham, Robert Williams, Jr, Lori Wolfe, Michael Wood, Lisenka Wunder, Tahisha Wyche-Gayle (Attachments: #1 redline amended complaint)(Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., 3M Company, The, Buckeye Fire Equipment CO., National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Seth T. Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Seth T. Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Aurora Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Aurora Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Stela Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Stela Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gayla Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gayla Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carroll Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carroll Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jimmie Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jimmie Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jaylynn Deherrera-Ruiz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jaylynn Deherrera-Ruiz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eric Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Eric Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kristin Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kristin Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Pamela Dobler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Pamela Dobler(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rebecca Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rebecca Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Esiah Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Esiah Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Priscila Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Priscila Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sandra Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sandra Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lorna Figuera-Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lorna Figuera-Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Fernando Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Fernando Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lea Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lea Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brian Foley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Brian Foley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Paul Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Paul Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rebecca Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rebecca Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Garland Foust(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Garland Foust(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shirley French(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shirley French(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Leilani Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Leilani Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Garrett(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party William Garrett(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Gilliam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Gilliam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Emrick Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Emrick Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Charles Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Charles Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party James Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carolyn Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carolyn Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Frank Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Frank Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Weston Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Weston Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patricia Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patricia Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cristi Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cristi Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Clyde Hartley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Clyde Hartley(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Deborah Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Deborah Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tawny E. Hobdy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tawny E. Hobdy(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Evangelo Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Evangelo Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gloria Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gloria Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shirley Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shirley Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sabrina Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sabrina Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shawn Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shawn Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tabian Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tabian Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Hunke(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Hunke(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Xeandra Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Xeandra Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Anny Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Anny Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Hattie James(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Hattie James(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Troy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Troy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Virgnina Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Virgnina Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Karola Kaufmann(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Karola Kaufmann(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael John Klasing(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael John Klasing(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kathryn Kleine(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kathryn Kleine(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ken Kleine(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ken Kleine(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Richard Klopenstine(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Richard Klopenstine(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nelda Lampe(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nelda Lampe(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shamonya N. Laster(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Shamonya N. Laster(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Destiny Lee-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Destiny Lee-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nevaeh Lee-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nevaeh Lee-Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Lehman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Lehman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rachel Lehman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rachel Lehman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Andrea Lettner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Andrea Lettner(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jerry Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jerry Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Denise Leyva(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Denise Leyva(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dana Lieser(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dana Lieser(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Billy Lillie(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Billy Lillie(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Pamela Lillie(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Pamela Lillie(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Julie Mack(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Julie Mack(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cassandra Malone(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cassandra Malone(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Derrick Malone(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Derrick Malone(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Basil Marinov(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Basil Marinov(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lisa Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lisa Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michael Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party John Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napol
May 15, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/18/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6105437)Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Bazilewich(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Matthew Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Matthew Bell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lori Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lori Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lori Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lori Ann Bodkin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Isaac Bryant, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Isaac Bryant, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Symenthia Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Symenthia Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tanya Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tanya Bryant(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Bugtong(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Linda Bugtong(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Seth T. Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Seth T. Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Seth T. Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Seth T. Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Seth T. Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Seth T. Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Seth T. Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Seth T. Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aurora Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aurora Canepa(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stela Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Stela Coffelt(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gayla Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gayla Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Cotner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carroll Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carroll Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jimmie Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jimmie Darrington(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jaylynn Deherrera-Ruiz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jaylynn Deherrera-Ruiz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eric Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Eric Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristin Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristin Demarco(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Dobler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Dobler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebecca Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebecca Doughty(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Esiah Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Esiah Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Priscila Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Priscila Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sandra Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sandra Espinoza(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lorna Figuera-Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lorna Figuera-Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fernando Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Fernando Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lea Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lea Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lea Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lea Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lea Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lea Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lea Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lea Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Foley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Foley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebecca Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebecca Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Garland Foust(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Garland Foust(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shirley French(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shirley French(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leilani Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leilani Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leilani Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leilani Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leilani Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leilani Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leilani Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leilani Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Garrett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party William Garrett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Gilliam(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Gilliam(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Emrick Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Emrick Goergen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Goodin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carolyn Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carolyn Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frank Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frank Goulee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Weston Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Weston Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Hansen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cristi Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cristi Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clyde Hartley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clyde Hartley(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deborah Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Deborah Haskins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tawny E. Hobdy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tawny E. Hobdy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tawny E. Hobdy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tawny E. Hobdy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Evangelo Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Evangelo Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gloria Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gloria Hogan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shirley Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shirley Hoover(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sabrina Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sabrina Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sabrina Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sabrina Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shawn Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Shawn Hope(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Melody Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tabian Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tabian Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Hunke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Hunke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Xeandra Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Xeandra Hypes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anny Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Anny Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hattie James(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hattie James(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Troy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Troy Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Virgnina Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Virgnina Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Karola Kaufmann(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Karola Kaufmann(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael John Klasing(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartley et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Horton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelda Lampe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Toth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Goulee
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosella Sharp
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Swain
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monique L. Sims
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherine Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgnina Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Whiteman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Goodin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Lewis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Moye
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Dobler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Meno
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Ann Bodkin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Espinoza
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weston Greene
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xeandra Hypes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Coffelt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Williams, Jr
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Nowocin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emrick Goergen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anny Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hunke
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damion Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Toth
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscila Espinosa
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Lehman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destiny Lee-Anderson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leatrice Thompson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Franklin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Hartley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Nowocin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traveion Paillette
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Rodriguez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Myers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary McClelland
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Bugtong
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Malone
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bazilewich
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Snipe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Lehman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Hope
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symenthia Bryant
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Kleine
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Sanders
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Klopenstine
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Nightingale
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Doughty
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Demarco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Simmons
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Elliott
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley French
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Wells
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorna Figuera-Hypes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Padilla
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Myers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Simmons
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hattie James
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Meno
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Washington
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Ruiz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missy Washington
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaylynn Deherrera-Ruiz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Rohweder
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Morse
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisenka Wunder
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Moody
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Quidachay
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrina McClelland
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Swartz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Goodin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lieutenant Troy Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esiah Espinosa
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Nickle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Demarco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherrie McIntosh
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Foster
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Foster
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Kleine
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stela Coffelt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Lillie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Goulee
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristi Harris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evangelo Hogan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Schroll
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Malone
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Whiteman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher McClelland
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Garrett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Wolfe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl McKinney
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carroll Darrington
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Matli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Nielsen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basil Marinov
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gilliam
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Sanders
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Cotner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shamonya N. Laster
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Shultz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Reed
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel K. Way
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Foley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawny E. Hobdy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevaeh Lee-Anderson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabian Horton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Palmer-Merritt
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannette Rogers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Meno
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wood
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wickham
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancee McKethern
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Park
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth T. Campbell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Lillie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Flores
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Toner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garland Foust
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Leyva
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hansen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Haskins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyeleen Mendoza
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Matli
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea Flores
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurora Canepa
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael John Klasing
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Rodriguez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Sharp
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Wells
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Shultz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Bryant
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karola Kaufmann
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Lettner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Darrington
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Hoover
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Thompson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Mack
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larandi Tooks
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Ramquist
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leilani Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Hope
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayla Cotner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Lieser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Hogan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Bryant, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tahisha Wyche-Gayle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?