Walker et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Dennis Flanagan, Mary Martinez, Kelii Apo, Jaqueline Pena Holguin, Mark Perkins, Dana Otte, Steven Rollins, Larry Neal, Dale Marshall, Jeanette (I) Roberts, David Kirschbaum, Eldon Thomas, Lisa Wilson, Lydia Neal, Branden Christensen, Lenora (I) Rowley, Tabitha Iversen, Patti Weekley, James Ashe, Cheryl Almeida, Victoria Jamerson, Blake Hall, Jennifer Vien, Alexis Crockett, David Larson, Kelly Frederick, James Haberkom, Jason Henke, Steven Trujillo, Jr., Misty (I) Sabo, Thalia Gutierrez, Andrea Strang, Juanita Gamble, Jeannie Frederick, Debbie Haberkom, Lisa (I) Prindle, Janet San Luis, Lenora Rowley, Jillian Donahue, Johnny Lopez, Veronica Rivera, Benjamin Walker, Susan Payment, Brittany Bohn, Mark Arnette, Van Wilson, Jr., Lindsey Hoy, Bridgette Hernandez, Dennis Goettl, Trina Larson, Miriam Roth Ballard, Milton Portillo, Pier Keefer, Randall Prindle, Lorraine Smith, Cindy Hylands, Nicole Bachman, Troy Warne, Estelle (I) Ashe, Kevin Morris, Jillian (I) Donahue, Terry Cruikshank, Charlotte Vigil, Elizabeth Brown, Randy Faust, Lashele Warren, Charla (I) Pino, Richard Bucklew, Jessica Thomas, Christine Flores, Dallas Trujillo, Antonio Gutierrez, Orren Wescott, Clea Jamerson, Amy Christensen, Hailey Brouse, Joshua Warne, Lisa Prindle, Michelle (I) Gutierrez, Christy Robbins, Kenneth Hiser, Gerlinde Kirschbaum, BRADY MCPEAK, Steven Trujillo, James Ashe, Jr., Andre Vigil, Randolph Bailey, Amanda Bainbridge, Sheri Jordan, Cye Jamerson, Phyllis Cruikshank, Clara Mask, Randy Nickell, Michael Lenoard, Kathryn Nickell, Estelle Ashe, Victor Cruz, Jr., Misty Sabo, Teodoro San Luis, Melonie Wilson, Amanda (I) Bainbridge, Genevieve (I) Crockett, Lisa Daigneault, Gregory Levos, Tiffany Ward, Bryan Hylands, Andrew Walker, Patricia Brost, Patricia Hiser, Miriam (I) Roth Ballard, Inne (I) Petteway, John Iversen, Kristina Robertson, Genevieve Crockett, Pascuala Abalos, Gary Brown, Inne Petteway, Janet Trujillo, Van Wilson, Bryan (I) Hylands, Nancy (I) Portillo, MD Thomas Roberts, Stephen Otte, Terry Hahn, Bryan Ward, Nancy Portillo, Lisa (I) Wilson, Brian Gable, Jenisa Pletka, Jeffrey Roberts, Nicole (I) Bachman, Kim Shatteen, Donica Pletka, Zachary Wilson, Xavier Perkins, Jeanette Roberts, Charlene Perkins, Corwin Mask, Damon Thayer, Rayce Valentine, Jai Todd, Roy Mass, Kevin (I) Morris, Paige Wilson, Aleena Crockett, Michael Dunz, Marilyn Faust, Charla Pino, Renee Morris, Phyllis (I) Cruikshank, Lashele (I) Warren, Michelle Gutierrez, Lois McLeod, Julie Lopez, Anthony Rowley, Michelle Neal, Eldon (I) Thomas and Roy Miller
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., National Foam Inc, 3M Company, The and Chemguard
Case Number: 2:2018cv03409
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 20 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01302, Walker et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03409-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01302. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01302 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Nicole (I) Bachman, Randolph Bailey, Amanda Bainbridge, Amanda (I) Bainbridge, Miriam Roth Ballard, Miriam (I) Roth Ballard, Brittany Bohn, Patricia Brost, Hailey Brouse, Elizabeth Brown, Gary Brown, Richard Bucklew, Amy Christensen, Branden Christensen, Aleena Crockett, Alexis Crockett, Genevieve Crockett, Genevieve (I) Crockett, Phyllis Cruikshank, Phyllis (I) Cruikshank, Terry Cruikshank, Victor Cruz, Jr, Lisa Daigneault, Jillian Donahue, Jillian (I) Donahue, Michael Dunz, Marilyn Faust, Randy Faust, Dennis Flanagan, Christine Flores, Jeannie Frederick, Kelly Frederick, Brian Gable, Juanita Gamble, Dennis Goettl, Antonio Gutierrez, Michelle Gutierrez, Michelle (I) Gutierrez, Thalia Gutierrez, Debbie Haberkom, James Haberkom, Terry Hahn, Blake Hall, Jason Henke, Bridgette Hernandez, Kenneth Hiser, Patricia Hiser, Jaqueline Pena Holguin, Lindsey Hoy, Bryan Hylands, Bryan (I) Hylands, Cindy Hylands, John Iversen, Tabitha Iversen, Clea Jamerson, Cye Jamerson, Victoria Jamerson, Sheri Jordan, Pier Keefer, David Kirschbaum, Gerlinde Kirschbaum, David Larson, Trina Larson, Michael Lenoard, Gregory Levos, Johnny Lopez, Julie Lopez, Janet San Luis, Teodoro San Luis, Dale Marshall, Mary Martinez, Clara Mask, Corwin Mask, Roy Mass, Lois McLeod, Pascuala Abalos, Cheryl Almeida, Kelii Apo, Mark Arnette, Estelle Ashe, Estelle (I) Ashe, James Ashe, Jr, James Ashe, Nicole Bachman, Brady McPeak, Roy Miller, Kevin Morris, Kevin (I) Morris, Renee Morris, Larry Neal, Lydia Neal, Michelle Neal, Kathryn Nickell, Randy Nickell, Dana Otte, Stephen Otte, Susan Payment, Charlene Perkins, Mark Perkins, Xavier Perkins, Inne Petteway, Inne (I) Petteway, Charla Pino, Charla (I) Pino, Donica Pletka, Jenisa Pletka, Milton Portillo, Nancy Portillo, Nancy (I) Portillo, Lisa Prindle, Randall Prindle, Lisa (I) Prindle, Veronica Rivera, Christy Robbins, Jeanette Roberts, Jeanette (I) Roberts, Jeffrey Roberts, Thomas Roberts, Kristina Robertson, Steven Rollins, Anthony Rowley, Lenora Rowley, Lenora (I) Rowley, Misty Sabo, Misty (I) Sabo, Kim Shatteen, Lorraine Smith, Andrea Strang, Damon Thayer, Eldon Thomas, Eldon (I) Thomas, Jessica Thomas, Jai Todd, Dallas Trujillo, Janet Trujillo, Steven Trujillo, Steven Trujillo, Jr, Rayce Valentine, Jennifer Vien, Andre Vigil, Charlotte Vigil, Andrew Walker, Benjamin Walker, Bryan Ward, Tiffany Ward, Joshua Warne, Troy Warne, Lashele Warren, Lashele (I) Warren, Patti Weekley, Orren Wescott, Lisa Wilson, Lisa (I) Wilson, Melonie Wilson, Paige Wilson, Van Wilson, Van Wilson, Jr, Zachary Wilson. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 3.2(b) and 40.1(a) and (d)(4)(b), and with the consent of the judges involved, and with the approval of Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger, this case is reassigned to Judge Jackson to serve as the presiding Article III judge. The Clerk of the Court shall modify the Court's records to reflect Judge Jackson as the assigned Article III judge in this case. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/18/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly Hyman is permitted to withdraw as counsel for Plainitffs. The Court notes that Plaintiffs continue to be represented by Michael McDivitt, Michael W. McDivitt, Patrick Lanciotti, and Hunter Shkolnik. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to delete Kelly Hyman's email address from future ECF filings and electronic notifications in this case. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/27/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Nicole (I) Bachman, Randolph Bailey, Amanda Bainbridge, Amanda (I) Bainbridge, Miriam Roth Ballard, Miriam (I) Roth Ballard, Brittany Bohn, Patricia Brost, Hailey Brouse, Elizabeth Brown, Gary Brown, Richard Bucklew, Amy Christensen, Branden Christensen, Aleena Crockett, Alexis Crockett, Genevieve Crockett, Genevieve (I) Crockett, Phyllis Cruikshank, Phyllis (I) Cruikshank, Terry Cruikshank, Victor Cruz, Jr, Lisa Daigneault, Jillian Donahue, Jillian (I) Donahue, Michael Dunz, Marilyn Faust, Randy Faust, Dennis Flanagan, Christine Flores, Jeannie Frederick, Kelly Frederick, Brian Gable, Juanita Gamble, Dennis Goettl, Antonio Gutierrez, Michelle Gutierrez, Michelle (I) Gutierrez, Thalia Gutierrez, Debbie Haberkom, James Haberkom, Terry Hahn, Blake Hall, Jason Henke, Bridgette Hernandez, Kenneth Hiser, Patricia Hiser, Jaqueline Pena Holguin, Lindsey Hoy, Bryan Hylands, Bryan (I) Hylands, Cindy Hylands, John Iversen, Tabitha Iversen, Clea Jamerson, Cye Jamerson, Victoria Jamerson, Sheri Jordan, Pier Keefer, David Kirschbaum, Gerlinde Kirschbaum, David Larson, Trina Larson, Michael Lenoard, Gregory Levos, Johnny Lopez, Julie Lopez, Janet San Luis, Teodoro San Luis, Dale Marshall, Mary Martinez, Clara Mask, Corwin Mask, Roy Mass, Lois McLeod, Pascuala Abalos, Cheryl Almeida, Kelii Apo, Mark Arnette, Estelle Ashe, Estelle (I) Ashe, James Ashe, Jr, James Ashe, Nicole Bachman, Brady McPeak, Roy Miller, Kevin Morris, Kevin (I) Morris, Renee Morris, Larry Neal, Lydia Neal, Michelle Neal, Kathryn Nickell, Randy Nickell, Dana Otte, Stephen Otte, Susan Payment, Charlene Perkins, Mark Perkins, Xavier Perkins, Inne Petteway, Inne (I) Petteway, Charla Pino, Charla (I) Pino, Donica Pletka, Jenisa Pletka, Milton Portillo, Nancy Portillo, Nancy (I) Portillo, Lisa Prindle, Randall Prindle, Lisa (I) Prindle, Veronica Rivera, Christy Robbins, Jeanette Roberts, Jeanette (I) Roberts, Jeffrey Roberts, Thomas Roberts, Kristina Robertson, Steven Rollins, Anthony Rowley, Lenora Rowley, Lenora (I) Rowley, Misty Sabo, Misty (I) Sabo, Kim Shatteen, Lorraine Smith, Andrea Strang, Damon Thayer, Eldon Thomas, Eldon (I) Thomas, Jessica Thomas, Jai Todd, Dallas Trujillo, Janet Trujillo, Steven Trujillo, Steven Trujillo, Jr, Rayce Valentine, Jennifer Vien, Andre Vigil, Charlotte Vigil, Andrew Walker, Benjamin Walker, Bryan Ward, Tiffany Ward, Joshua Warne, Troy Warne, Lashele Warren, Lashele (I) Warren, Patti Weekley, Orren Wescott, Lisa Wilson, Lisa (I) Wilson, Melonie Wilson, Paige Wilson, Van Wilson, Van Wilson, Jr, Zachary Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nicole (I) Bachman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nicole (I) Bachman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Randolph Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Randolph Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Bainbridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda Bainbridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Bainbridge (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amanda (I) Bainbridge (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Miriam Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Miriam Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Miriam (I) Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Miriam (I) Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brittany Bohn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brittany Bohn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Brost(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Brost(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hailey Brouse(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Hailey Brouse(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gary Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gary Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Bucklew(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Bucklew(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Branden Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Branden Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aleena Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Aleena Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alexis Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alexis Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Genevieve Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Genevieve Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Genevieve (I) Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Genevieve (I) Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Phyllis Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Phyllis Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Phyllis (I) Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Phyllis (I) Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terry Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terry Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Victor Cruz, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Victor Cruz, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Daigneault(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Daigneault(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jillian Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jillian Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jillian (I) Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jillian (I) Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Dunz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Dunz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marilyn Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Marilyn Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Randy Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Randy Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dennis Flanagan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dennis Flanagan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeannie Frederick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jeannie Frederick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelly Frederick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kelly Frederick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Gable(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Gable(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Juanita Gamble(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Juanita Gamble(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dennis Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dennis Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Antonio Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Antonio Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thalia Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thalia Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debbie Haberkom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Debbie Haberkom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Haberkom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Haberkom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terry Hahn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terry Hahn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Blake Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Blake Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jason Henke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jason Henke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bridgette Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bridgette Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Hiser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Hiser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Hiser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patricia Hiser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jaqueline Pena Holguin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jaqueline Pena Holguin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lindsey Hoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lindsey Hoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bryan Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bryan Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bryan (I) Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bryan (I) Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cindy Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cindy Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Iversen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Iversen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tabitha Iversen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tabitha Iversen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Clea Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Clea Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cye Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cye Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Victoria Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Victoria Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sheri Jordan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sheri Jordan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pier Keefer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pier Keefer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Kirschbaum(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Kirschbaum(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gerlinde Kirschbaum(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gerlinde Kirschbaum(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Larson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Larson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Trina Larson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Trina Larson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Lenoard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michael Lenoard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gregory Levos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gregory
June 28, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 27, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company by Plaintiffs Nicole (I) Bachman, Randolph Bailey, Amanda Bainbridge, Amanda (I) Bainbridge, Miriam Roth Ballard, Miriam (I) Roth Ballard, Brittany Bohn, Patricia Brost, Hailey Brouse, Elizabeth Brown, Gary Brown, Richard Bucklew, Amy Christensen, Branden Christensen, Aleena Crockett, Alexis Crockett, Genevieve Crockett, Genevieve (I) Crockett, Phyllis Cruikshank, Phyllis (I) Cruikshank, Terry Cruikshank, Victor Cruz, Jr, Lisa Daigneault, Jillian Donahue, Jillian (I) Donahue, Michael Dunz, Marilyn Faust, Randy Faust, Dennis Flanagan, Christine Flores, Jeannie Frederick, Kelly Frederick, Brian Gable, Juanita Gamble, Dennis Goettl, Antonio Gutierrez, Michelle Gutierrez, Michelle (I) Gutierrez, Thalia Gutierrez, Debbie Haberkom, James Haberkom, Terry Hahn, Blake Hall, Jason Henke, Bridgette Hernandez, Kenneth Hiser, Patricia Hiser, Jaqueline Pena Holguin, Lindsey Hoy, Bryan Hylands, Bryan (I) Hylands, Cindy Hylands, John Iversen, Tabitha Iversen, Clea Jamerson, Cye Jamerson, Victoria Jamerson, Sheri Jordan, Pier Keefer, David Kirschbaum, Gerlinde Kirschbaum, David Larson, Trina Larson, Michael Lenoard, Gregory Levos, Johnny Lopez, Julie Lopez, Janet San Luis, Teodoro San Luis, Dale Marshall, Mary Martinez, Clara Mask, Corwin Mask, Roy Mass, Lois McLeod, Pascuala Abalos, Cheryl Almeida, Kelii Apo, Mark Arnette, Estelle Ashe, Estelle (I) Ashe, James Ashe, Jr, James Ashe, Nicole Bachman, Brady McPeak, Roy Miller, Kevin Morris, Kevin (I) Morris, Renee Morris, Larry Neal, Lydia Neal, Michelle Neal, Kathryn Nickell, Randy Nickell, Dana Otte, Stephen Otte, Susan Payment, Charlene Perkins, Mark Perkins, Xavier Perkins, Inne Petteway, Inne (I) Petteway, Charla Pino, Charla (I) Pino, Donica Pletka, Jenisa Pletka, Milton Portillo, Nancy Portillo, Nancy (I) Portillo, Lisa Prindle, Randall Prindle, Lisa (I) Prindle, Veronica Rivera, Christy Robbins, Jeanette Roberts, Jeanette (I) Roberts, Jeffrey Roberts, Thomas Roberts, Kristina Robertson, Steven Rollins, Anthony Rowley, Lenora Rowley, Lenora (I) Rowley, Misty Sabo, Misty (I) Sabo, Kim Shatteen, Lorraine Smith, Andrea Strang, Damon Thayer, Eldon Thomas, Eldon (I) Thomas, Jessica Thomas, Jai Todd, Dallas Trujillo, Janet Trujillo, Steven Trujillo, Steven Trujillo, Jr, Rayce Valentine, Jennifer Vien, Andre Vigil, Charlotte Vigil, Andrew Walker, Benjamin Walker, Bryan Ward, Tiffany Ward, Joshua Warne, Troy Warne, Lashele Warren, Lashele (I) Warren, Patti Weekley, Orren Wescott, Lisa Wilson, Lisa (I) Wilson, Melonie Wilson, Paige Wilson, Van Wilson, Van Wilson, Jr, Zachary Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Request - Buckeye Fire Protection Co., #2 Summons Summons Request - Chemguard, #3 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fire Fighting, #4 Summons Summons Request - Kidde PLC, #5 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fenwal, #6 Summons Summons Request - National Foam, Inc., #7 Summons Summons Request - Tyco Fire Products LP, #8 Summons Summons Request - UTC Fire)(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 9 Administrative Notice: The #7 Summonses submitted are incomplete and will not be issued - all plaintiffs and all defendants must be listed in the caption - et al can not be used. Please complete the forms for issuance using the event Summons Request. (Text Only Entry) (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Bell, et al., v. The 3M Company, et al.,16-cv-2351-RBJ by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company by Plaintiffs Nicole (I) Bachman, Randolph Bailey, Amanda Bainbridge, Amanda (I) Bainbridge, Miriam Roth Ballard, Miriam (I) Roth Ballard, Brittany Bohn, Patricia Brost, Hailey Brouse, Elizabeth Brown, Gary Brown, Richard Bucklew, Amy Christensen, Branden Christensen, Aleena Crockett, Alexis Crockett, Genevieve Crockett, Genevieve (I) Crockett, Phyllis Cruikshank, Phyllis (I) Cruikshank, Terry Cruikshank, Victor Cruz, Jr, Lisa Daigneault, Jillian Donahue, Jillian (I) Donahue, Michael Dunz, Marilyn Faust, Randy Faust, Dennis Flanagan, Christine Flores, Jeannie Frederick, Kelly Frederick, Brian Gable, Juanita Gamble, Dennis Goettl, Antonio Gutierrez, Michelle Gutierrez, Michelle (I) Gutierrez, Thalia Gutierrez, Debbie Haberkom, James Haberkom, Terry Hahn, Blake Hall, Jason Henke, Bridgette Hernandez, Kenneth Hiser, Patricia Hiser, Lindsey Hoy, Bryan Hylands, Bryan (I) Hylands, Cindy Hylands, John Iversen, Tabitha Iversen, Clea Jamerson, Cye Jamerson, Victoria Jamerson, Sheri Jordan, Pier Keefer, David Kirschbaum, Gerlinde Kirschbaum, David Larson, Trina Larson, Michael Lenoard, Gregory Levos, Johnny Lopez, Julie Lopez, Janet San Luis, Teodoro San Luis, Dale Marshall, Mary Martinez, Clara Mask, Corwin Mask, Roy Mass, Lois McLeod, Pascuala Abalos, Cheryl Almeida, Kelii Apo, Mark Arnette, Estelle Ashe, Estelle (I) Ashe, James Ashe, Jr, James Ashe, Nicole Bachman, Brady McPeak, Roy Miller, Kevin Morris, Kevin (I) Morris, Renee Morris, Larry Neal, Lydia Neal, Michelle Neal, Kathryn Nickell, Randy Nickell, Dana Otte, Stephen Otte, Susan Payment, Charlene Perkins, Mark Perkins, Xavier Perkins, Inne Petteway, Inne (I) Petteway, Charla Pino, Charla (I) Pino, Donica Pletka, Jenisa Pletka, Milton Portillo, Nancy Portillo, Nancy (I) Portillo, Lisa Prindle, Randall Prindle, Lisa (I) Prindle, Veronica Rivera, Christy Robbins, Jeanette Roberts, Jeanette (I) Roberts, Jeffrey Roberts, Thomas Roberts, Kristina Robertson, Steven Rollins, Anthony Rowley, Lenora Rowley, Lenora (I) Rowley, Misty Sabo, Misty (I) Sabo, Kim Shatteen, Lorraine Smith, Andrea Strang, Damon Thayer, Eldon Thomas, Eldon (I) Thomas, Jessica Thomas, Jai Todd, Dallas Trujillo, Janet Trujillo, Steven Trujillo, Steven Trujillo, Jr, Rayce Valentine, Jennifer Vien, Andre Vigil, Charlotte Vigil, Andrew Walker, Benjamin Walker, Bryan Ward, Tiffany Ward, Joshua Warne, Troy Warne, Lashele Warren, Lashele (I) Warren, Patti Weekley, Orren Wescott, Lisa Wilson, Lisa (I) Wilson, Melonie Wilson, Paige Wilson, Van Wilson, Van Wilson, Jr, Zachary Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons Request - Buckeye Fire Protection Co., #2 Summons Summons Request - Chemguard, #3 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fire Fighting, #4 Summons Summons Request - Kidde PLC, #5 Summons Summons Request - Kidde Fenwal, #6 Summons Summons Request - National Foam, Inc., #7 Summons Summons Request - Tyco Fire Products LP, #8 Summons Summons Request - UTC Fire)(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 22, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nicole (I) Bachman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nicole (I) Bachman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Randolph Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Randolph Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Bainbridge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda Bainbridge(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda (I) Bainbridge (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amanda (I) Bainbridge (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Miriam Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Miriam Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Miriam (I) Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Miriam (I) Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brittany Bohn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brittany Bohn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Brost(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Brost(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hailey Brouse(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Hailey Brouse(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gary Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gary Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Bucklew(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Bucklew(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Branden Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Branden Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aleena Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Aleena Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alexis Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alexis Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Genevieve Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Genevieve Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Genevieve (I) Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Genevieve (I) Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phyllis Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phyllis Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phyllis (I) Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Phyllis (I) Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terry Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terry Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Victor Cruz, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Victor Cruz, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Daigneault(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Daigneault(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jillian Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jillian Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jillian (I) Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jillian (I) Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Dunz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Dunz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marilyn Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Marilyn Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Randy Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Randy Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Flanagan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Flanagan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeannie Frederick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jeannie Frederick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelly Frederick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelly Frederick(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Gable(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Gable(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Juanita Gamble(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Juanita Gamble(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dennis Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Antonio Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Antonio Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle (I) Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle (I) Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thalia Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thalia Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debbie Haberkom(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Debbie Haberkom(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Haberkom(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Haberkom(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terry Hahn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terry Hahn(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Blake Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Blake Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Henke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Henke(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bridgette Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bridgette Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Hiser(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Hiser(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Hiser(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patricia Hiser(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jaqueline Pena Holguin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jaqueline Pena Holguin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lindsey Hoy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lindsey Hoy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bryan Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bryan Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bryan (I) Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bryan (I) Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cindy Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cindy Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Iversen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Iversen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tabitha Iversen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tabitha Iversen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clea Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clea Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cye Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cye Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Victoria Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Victoria Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sheri Jordan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sheri Jordan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pier Keefer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pier Keefer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Kirschbaum(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Kirschbaum(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gerlinde Kirschbaum(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gerlinde Kirschbaum(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Larson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Larson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Trina Larson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Trina Larson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Lenoard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michael Lenoard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gregory Levos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gregory Levos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Johnny Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Johnny Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julie Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Julie Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janet San Luis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janet San Luis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Teodoro San Luis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Teodoro San Luis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dale Marshall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dale Marshall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mary Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mary Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clara Mask(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Clara Mask(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Corwin Mask(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Corwin Mask(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Roy Mass(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Roy Mass(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lois McLeod(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lois McLeod(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pascuala Abalos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pascuala Abalos(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cheryl Almeida(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cheryl Almeida(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelii Apo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kelii Apo(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Arnette(pty:pla), Attorney K
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiffs counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 7/19/2018 in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/19/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nicole (I) Bachman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nicole (I) Bachman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Randolph Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Randolph Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Bainbridge(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda Bainbridge(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda (I) Bainbridge (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amanda (I) Bainbridge (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Miriam Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Miriam Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Miriam (I) Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Miriam (I) Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brittany Bohn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brittany Bohn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Brost(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Brost(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hailey Brouse(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Hailey Brouse(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gary Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gary Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Richard Bucklew(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Richard Bucklew(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Branden Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Branden Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aleena Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Aleena Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alexis Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alexis Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Genevieve Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Genevieve Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Genevieve (I) Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Genevieve (I) Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Phyllis Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Phyllis Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Phyllis (I) Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Phyllis (I) Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terry Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terry Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Victor Cruz, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Victor Cruz, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa Daigneault(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa Daigneault(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jillian Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jillian Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jillian (I) Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jillian (I) Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Dunz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Dunz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marilyn Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Marilyn Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Randy Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Randy Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dennis Flanagan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dennis Flanagan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeannie Frederick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jeannie Frederick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kelly Frederick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kelly Frederick(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Gable(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Gable(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Juanita Gamble(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Juanita Gamble(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dennis Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dennis Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Antonio Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Antonio Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle (I) Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle (I) Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thalia Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thalia Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debbie Haberkom(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Debbie Haberkom(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Haberkom(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Haberkom(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terry Hahn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terry Hahn(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Blake Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Blake Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jason Henke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jason Henke(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bridgette Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bridgette Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Hiser(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Hiser(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Hiser(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patricia Hiser(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jaqueline Pena Holguin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jaqueline Pena Holguin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lindsey Hoy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lindsey Hoy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bryan Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bryan Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bryan (I) Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bryan (I) Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cindy Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cindy Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Iversen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Iversen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tabitha Iversen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tabitha Iversen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Clea Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Clea Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cye Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cye Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Victoria Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Victoria Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sheri Jordan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sheri Jordan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pier Keefer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pier Keefer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Kirschbaum(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Kirschbaum(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gerlinde Kirschbaum(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gerlinde Kirschbaum(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Larson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Larson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Trina Larson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Trina Larson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Lenoard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michael Lenoard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gregory Levos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gregory Levos(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Johnny Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Johnny Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julie Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Julie Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janet San Luis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janet San Luis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Teodoro San Luis(pty:pla), Atto
May 25, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6124103)Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pascuala Abalos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pascuala Abalos(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cheryl Almeida(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cheryl Almeida(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelii Apo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelii Apo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Arnette(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Arnette(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Estelle Ashe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Estelle Ashe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Estelle Ashe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Estelle Ashe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Estelle Ashe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Estelle Ashe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Ashe, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Ashe, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Ashe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Ashe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nicole Bachman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nicole Bachman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nicole Bachman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nicole Bachman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Randolph Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Randolph Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Bainbridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Bainbridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Bainbridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amanda Bainbridge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Miriam Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Miriam Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Miriam Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Miriam Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Miriam Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Miriam Roth Ballard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brittany Bohn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brittany Bohn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Brost(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Brost(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hailey Brouse(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Hailey Brouse(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gary Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gary Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Bucklew(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Bucklew(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brandon Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brandon Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aleena Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Aleena Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alexis Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alexis Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Genevieve Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Genevieve Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Genevieve Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Genevieve Crockett(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phyllis Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phyllis Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phyllis Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Phyllis Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terry Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terry Cruikshank(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Victor Cruz, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Victor Cruz, Jr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Daigneault(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Daigneault(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jillian Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jillian Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jillian Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jillian Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jillian Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jillian Donahue(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Dunz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michael Dunz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Eldon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Eldon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Eldon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Eldon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marilyn Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Marilyn Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Randy Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Randy Faust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dennis Flanagan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dennis Flanagan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Flores(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeannie Frederick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jeannie Frederick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelly Frederick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kelly Frederick(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Gable(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Gable(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Juanita Gamble(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Juanita Gamble(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dennis Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dennis Goettl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Antonio Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Antonio Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thalia Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thalia Gutierrez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debbie Haberkom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Debbie Haberkom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Haberkom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Haberkom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terry Hahn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terry Hahn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Blake Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Blake Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Henke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Henke(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bridgette Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bridgette Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Hiser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Hiser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Hiser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patricia Hiser(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jaqueline Pena Holguin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jaqueline Pena Holguin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lindsey Hoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lindsey Hoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bryan Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bryan Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bryan Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bryan Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cindy Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cindy Hylands(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Iversen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Iversen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tabitha Iversen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tabitha Iversen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clea Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Clea Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cye Jamerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cye Jamerson(pty:pla), A

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC FIre & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Flanagan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelii Apo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaqueline Pena Holguin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Perkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Otte
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Rollins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Neal
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Marshall
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette (I) Roberts
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kirschbaum
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldon Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Neal
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branden Christensen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenora (I) Rowley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Iversen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti Weekley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ashe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Almeida
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Jamerson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Hall
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Vien
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexis Crockett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Larson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Frederick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Haberkom
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Henke
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Trujillo, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty (I) Sabo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thalia Gutierrez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Strang
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Gamble
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannie Frederick
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Haberkom
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa (I) Prindle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet San Luis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenora Rowley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian Donahue
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Lopez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Rivera
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Payment
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Bohn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Arnette
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Wilson, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Hoy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette Hernandez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Goettl
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trina Larson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Roth Ballard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton Portillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pier Keefer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Prindle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Hylands
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Bachman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Warne
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estelle (I) Ashe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Morris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jillian (I) Donahue
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Cruikshank
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Vigil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Faust
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashele Warren
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charla (I) Pino
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bucklew
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Flores
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Trujillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Gutierrez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orren Wescott
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clea Jamerson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Christensen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hailey Brouse
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Warne
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Prindle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle (I) Gutierrez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Robbins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hiser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerlinde Kirschbaum
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRADY MCPEAK
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Trujillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ashe, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Vigil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Bailey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Bainbridge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Jordan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cye Jamerson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Cruikshank
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Mask
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Nickell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lenoard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Nickell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estelle Ashe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Cruz, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Sabo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teodoro San Luis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melonie Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda (I) Bainbridge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genevieve (I) Crockett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Daigneault
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Levos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Ward
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Hylands
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Brost
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Hiser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam (I) Roth Ballard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inne (I) Petteway
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Iversen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristina Robertson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genevieve Crockett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pascuala Abalos
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inne Petteway
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Trujillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan (I) Hylands
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy (I) Portillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MD Thomas Roberts
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Otte
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Hahn
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Ward
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Portillo
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa (I) Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Gable
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenisa Pletka
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Roberts
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole (I) Bachman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Shatteen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donica Pletka
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Perkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanette Roberts
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Perkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corwin Mask
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Thayer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayce Valentine
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jai Todd
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Mass
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin (I) Morris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleena Crockett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dunz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Faust
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charla Pino
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Morris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis (I) Cruikshank
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashele (I) Warren
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Gutierrez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois McLeod
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Lopez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rowley
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Neal
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eldon (I) Thomas
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?