Castro et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Don Medaris, Mittie Flournoy, Tina Sheeks, Christopher Kalb, Terry Clutter, Brad Blair, Mark Crow, Dax Wilson, Jessie Luedeke, Rosemary Jago, Danielle (I) Currie, Delia Jimenez, Brad Taylor, Toni Houston, Deyanda Richardson, Franklin Brown, Deyanda (I) Richardson, Scot Shelinbarger, Brenda Trimble, Robert Kidwell, Kristopher Hutchinson, Anna Oskvarek, Sherryll Gallion, Carlos Garcia, Douglas Peck, Justine Kalb, Nicholas Diggs, Janet Shelinbarger, Birgit Spellman, Andrew Hotchkiss, Gianna Perry, William Bartlett, Patrick Koegler, Ricardo Ruiz Rosado, Charles Cubello, Brooke Moore, Angelelynette Rankins, Donald Jamison, Sheri Hotchkiss, Bradford Hardman, Matthew Pieffer, Thomas Fowler, Jason Blanscet, Marion Webb, Caroline Jamison, Nelysette (I) Sanchez, Phylicia Mengel, Joann Elliot, Stephanie Waring, Ana Castro, Latriece Thompson, Kaleb Owens, Christopher Vigil, Michael Lozano, Frank Meacham, Sheila Moore, Nelysette Sanchez, Sarah Garcia, Ernestine Martinez, Dominic Sanchez, Sarah Lane, Jonathan Tipton, Jarod Andrew Forbes, Janet Gasper, Debra Ramquist, Zebediah Morris, Nicole Bachman, Robert Mcnair, Christine Franklin, James Bohlmann, Tony Garcia, Andrew (I) Jago, Michael Smotherman, Clifford Lane, Ruby Johnson, Wayne Jackson, Colton Anglin, Florinda Ridge, Alice Kramer, Terrence Herl, Ina King, Victoria Smotherman, Jamie Huff, Veronica Garcia, Jamie (I) Huff, Dominick Espinosa, Scott Hardwig, Aidon Moore, Bruce Davis, LISA GIBSON, Gianna (I) Perry, Sandra Teater, Amy Christensen, Wendy Rendon, Brenda Carter, Ashley Graves, Jasmine Santiago, Carlos Jiminez, ANDREW JAGO, Deonna Babcock, Judy Mccollam, Edna Brown, Bobby (I) Mitchell, Jr., Marty (I) Mertz, Elizabeth Delmonico, Jennifer Colon, Jennie Germaine, Danielle Currie, ANDREA ROBINSON, Ana Garcia, Andre Brown, Jr., Michelle Cathey, Daniel Creger, Bobby Mitchell, Jr., Davina Price, Brandy Garner, Yolanda Mills, Danil Backom, Jeffrey Thornton, Loretta Randall, Manfred Gunther, Eryck Smith, John Elliott, Timothy Spellman, Robert (I) Smith, Justin Arias, Gabriel Blackstein, Sophia Padilla, James Warner, Denise Wright, Nicholas Compean, Arthur Gibson, Carol Johnson, Tanya Lance, Amber Moore, Pamela Griebel, Patrick Bullock, Justine (I) Kalb, Kaleigh Corey, Eunice Robinson, Michelle (I) Cathey, Derrick Thompson, Jack Rocha, Carlos (I) Jimenez, David Monat, Chelsea Uebel, Robert Bergman, Donna Doyle, Carlos Brown, Sheyenne McDaniel, Trevor Jaskar, Devon Beal, Paul Browning, Kristopher (I) Hutchinson, Randy Moore, Yang Rice, Brittany Luedeke, Akiko Walker, Brian Diggs, MARTY MERTZ, John Taylor, James Bosch, Tiffany Varoz, Delia (I) Jimenez, Brandon Christensen, Timothy Ridge, Frank Poebla, Dale Vadivello, Kristie Garcia, Robert Smith, Alison Bachman, Phylicia (I) Mengel, Kalayah Meketi, Frank (I) Meacham, Dana Miller, Ricky Montgomery, Crystal Clutter, RN Diane Brown, Samuel Welch, Daniel Wasik, Sally Herrera, Patrick (I) Bullock, Davina (I) Price, Alfreda Jones, Valentina Provenzano, Brad Mengel, Susan Spadaro, Jessica Lavonne Anglin-Johnston, Ruby (I) Johnson, Mark Smith, Derek Boucher and Ashley Lawson
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Kidde PLC, Inc., National Foam Inc, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., 3M Company, The and Chemguard
Case Number: 2:2018cv03413
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01278, Castro et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03413-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01278. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01278 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Robert Bergman, Gabriel Blackstein, Brad Blair, Jason Blanscet, James Bohlmann, James Bosch, Derek Boucher, Carlos Brown, Diane Brown, Edna Brown, Franklin Brown, Andre Brown, Jr., Paul Browning, Patrick Bullock, Patrick (I) Bullock, Brenda Carter, Ana Castro, Michelle Cathey, Michelle (I) Cathey, Amy Christensen, Brandon Christensen, Crystal Clutter, Terry Clutter, Jennifer Colon, Nicholas Compean, Kaleigh Corey, Daniel Creger, Mark Crow, Charles Cubello, Danielle Currie, Danielle (I) Currie, Bruce Davis, Elizabeth Delmonico, Brian Diggs, Nicholas Diggs, Donna Doyle, Joann Elliot, John Elliott, Dominick Espinosa, Mittie Flournoy, Jarod Andrew Forbes, Thomas Fowler, Christine Franklin, Sherryll Gallion, Ana Garcia, Carlos Garcia, Kristie Garcia, Sarah Garcia, Tony Garcia, Veronica Garcia, Brandy Garner, Janet Gasper, Jennie Germaine, Arthur Gibson, Lisa Gibson, Ashley Graves, Pamela Griebel, Manfred Gunther, Bradford Hardman, Scott Hardwig, Terrence Herl, Sally Herrera, Andrew Hotchkiss, Sheri Hotchkiss, Toni Houston, Jamie Huff, Jamie (I) Huff, Kristopher Hutchinson, Kristopher (I) Hutchinson, Wayne Jackson, Andrew Jago, Andrew (I) Jago, Rosemary Jago, Caroline Jamison, Donald Jamison, Trevor Jaskar, Carlos (I) Jimenez, Delia Jimenez, Delia (I) Jimenez, Carlos Jiminez, Carol Johnson, Ruby Johnson, Ruby (I) Johnson, Alfreda Jones, Christopher Kalb, Justine Kalb, Justine (I) Kalb, Robert Kidwell, Ina King, Patrick Koegler, Alice Kramer, Tanya Lance, Clifford Lane, Sarah Lane, Ashley Lawson, Michael Lozano, Brittany Luedeke, Jessie Luedeke, Ernestine Martinez, Sheyenne McDaniel, Robert McNair, Judy Mccollam, Frank Meacham, Frank (I) Meacham, Don Medaris, Colton Anglin, Jessica Lavonne Anglin-Johnston, Justin Arias, Deonna Babcock, Alison Bachman, Nicole Bachman, Danil Backom, William Bartlett, Devon Beal, Kalayah Meketi, Brad Mengel, Phylicia Mengel, Phylicia (I) Mengel, Marty Mertz, Marty (I) Mertz, Dana Miller, Yolanda Mills, Bobby (I) Mitchell, Jr, Bobby Mitchell, Jr., David Monat, Ricky Montgomery, Aidon Moore, Amber Moore, Brooke Moore, Randy Moore, Sheila Moore, Zebediah Morris, Anna Oskvarek, Kaleb Owens, Sophia Padilla, Douglas Peck, Gianna Perry, Gianna (I) Perry, Matthew Pieffer, Frank Poebla, Davina Price, Davina (I) Price, Valentina Provenzano, Debra Ramquist, Loretta Randall, Angelelynette Rankins, Wendy Rendon, Yang Rice, Deyanda Richardson, Deyanda (I) Richardson, Florinda Ridge, Timothy Ridge, Andrea Robinson, Eunice Robinson, Jack Rocha, Ricardo Ruiz Rosado, Dominic Sanchez, Nelysette Sanchez, Nelysette (I) Sanchez, Jasmine Santiago, Tina Sheeks, Janet Shelinbarger, Scot Shelinbarger, Eryck Smith, Mark Smith, Robert Smith, Robert Smith, Robert (I) Smith, Michael Smotherman, Victoria Smotherman, Susan Spadaro, Birgit Spellman, Timothy Spellman, Brad Taylor, John Taylor, Sandra Teater, Derrick Thompson, Latriece Thompson, Jeffrey Thornton, Jonathan Tipton, Brenda Trimble, Chelsea Uebel, Dale Vadivello, Tiffany Varoz, Christopher Vigil, Akiko Walker, Stephanie Waring, James Warner, Daniel Wasik, Marion Webb, Samuel Welch, Dax Wilson, Denise Wright. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/2018. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Robert Bergman, Gabriel Blackstein, Brad Blair, Jason Blanscet, James Bohlmann, James Bosch, Derek Boucher, Carlos Brown, Diane Brown, Edna Brown, Franklin Brown, Andre Brown, Jr., Paul Browning, Patrick Bullock, Patrick (I) Bullock, Brenda Carter, Ana Castro, Michelle Cathey, Michelle (I) Cathey, Amy Christensen, Brandon Christensen, Crystal Clutter, Terry Clutter, Jennifer Colon, Nicholas Compean, Kaleigh Corey, Daniel Creger, Mark Crow, Charles Cubello, Danielle Currie, Danielle (I) Currie, Bruce Davis, Elizabeth Delmonico, Brian Diggs, Nicholas Diggs, Donna Doyle, Joann Elliot, John Elliott, Dominick Espinosa, Mittie Flournoy, Jarod Andrew Forbes, Thomas Fowler, Christine Franklin, Sherryll Gallion, Ana Garcia, Carlos Garcia, Kristie Garcia, Sarah Garcia, Tony Garcia, Veronica Garcia, Brandy Garner, Janet Gasper, Jennie Germaine, Arthur Gibson, Lisa Gibson, Ashley Graves, Pamela Griebel, Manfred Gunther, Bradford Hardman, Scott Hardwig, Terrence Herl, Sally Herrera, Andrew Hotchkiss, Sheri Hotchkiss, Toni Houston, Jamie Huff, Jamie (I) Huff, Kristopher Hutchinson, Kristopher (I) Hutchinson, Wayne Jackson, Andrew Jago, Andrew (I) Jago, Rosemary Jago, Caroline Jamison, Donald Jamison, Trevor Jaskar, Carlos (I) Jimenez, Delia Jimenez, Delia (I) Jimenez, Carlos Jiminez, Carol Johnson, Ruby Johnson, Ruby (I) Johnson, Alfreda Jones, Christopher Kalb, Justine Kalb, Justine (I) Kalb, Robert Kidwell, Ina King, Patrick Koegler, Alice Kramer, Tanya Lance, Clifford Lane, Sarah Lane, Ashley Lawson, Michael Lozano, Brittany Luedeke, Jessie Luedeke, Ernestine Martinez, Sheyenne McDaniel, Robert McNair, Judy Mccollam, Frank Meacham, Frank (I) Meacham, Don Medaris, Colton Anglin, Jessica Lavonne Anglin-Johnston, Justin Arias, Deonna Babcock, Alison Bachman, Nicole Bachman, Danil Backom, William Bartlett, Devon Beal, Kalayah Meketi, Brad Mengel, Phylicia Mengel, Phylicia (I) Mengel, Marty Mertz, Marty (I) Mertz, Dana Miller, Yolanda Mills, Bobby (I) Mitchell, Jr, Bobby Mitchell, Jr., David Monat, Ricky Montgomery, Aidon Moore, Amber Moore, Brooke Moore, Randy Moore, Sheila Moore, Zebediah Morris, Anna Oskvarek, Kaleb Owens, Sophia Padilla, Douglas Peck, Gianna Perry, Gianna (I) Perry, Matthew Pieffer, Frank Poebla, Davina Price, Davina (I) Price, Valentina Provenzano, Debra Ramquist, Loretta Randall, Angelelynette Rankins, Wendy Rendon, Yang Rice, Deyanda Richardson, Deyanda (I) Richardson, Florinda Ridge, Timothy Ridge, Andrea Robinson, Eunice Robinson, Jack Rocha, Ricardo Ruiz Rosado, Dominic Sanchez, Nelysette Sanchez, Nelysette (I) Sanchez, Jasmine Santiago, Tina Sheeks, Janet Shelinbarger, Scot Shelinbarger, Eryck Smith, Mark Smith, Robert Smith, Robert Smith, Robert (I) Smith, Michael Smotherman, Victoria Smotherman, Susan Spadaro, Birgit Spellman, Timothy Spellman, Brad Taylor, John Taylor, Sandra Teater, Derrick Thompson, Latriece Thompson, Jeffrey Thornton, Jonathan Tipton, Brenda Trimble, Chelsea Uebel, Dale Vadivello, Tiffany Varoz, Christopher Vigil, Akiko Walker, Stephanie Waring, James Warner, Daniel Wasik, Marion Webb, Samuel Welch, Dax Wilson, Denise Wright. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Robert Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gabriel Blackstein(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gabriel Blackstein(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brad Blair(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brad Blair(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jason Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jason Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Bohlmann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Bohlmann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Bosch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party James Bosch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Derek Boucher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Derek Boucher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carlos Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carlos Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Diane Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Diane Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Edna Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Edna Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Franklin Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Franklin Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Andre Brown, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Andre Brown, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Paul Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Paul Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patrick Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patrick Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patrick (I) Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patrick (I) Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brenda Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brenda Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ana Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ana Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brandon Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brandon Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Crystal Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Crystal Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terry Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terry Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nicholas Compean(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nicholas Compean(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kaleigh Corey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kaleigh Corey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Creger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Creger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mark Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Cubello(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Charles Cubello(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Danielle (I) Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Danielle (I) Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bruce Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bruce Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brian Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nicholas Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nicholas Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donna Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donna Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joann Elliot(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joann Elliot(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party John Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dominick Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dominick Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mittie Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mittie Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jarod Andrew Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jarod Andrew Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Thomas Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sherryll Gallion(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sherryll Gallion(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ana Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ana Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carlos Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carlos Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristie Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kristie Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sarah Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sarah Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tony Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tony Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Veronica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Veronica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brandy Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Brandy Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Janet Gasper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Janet Gasper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennie Germaine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennie Germaine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arthur Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Arthur Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ashley Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Ashley Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Manfred Gunther(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Manfred Gunther(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bradford Hardman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bradford Hardman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Scott Hardwig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Scott Hardwig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terrence Herl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Terrence Herl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sally Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sally Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Andrew Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Andrew Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sheri Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sheri Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Toni Houston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Toni Houston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jamie Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jamie Huff(pty:pla), Attorne
June 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Robert Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gabriel Blackstein(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gabriel Blackstein(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brad Blair(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brad Blair(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jason Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Bohlmann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Bohlmann(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Bosch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party James Bosch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Derek Boucher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Derek Boucher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carlos Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carlos Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Diane Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Diane Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Edna Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Edna Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Franklin Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Franklin Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andre Brown, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andre Brown, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patrick Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patrick Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patrick (I) Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patrick (I) Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brenda Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brenda Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ana Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ana Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brandon Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brandon Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Crystal Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Crystal Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terry Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terry Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nicholas Compean(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nicholas Compean(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kaleigh Corey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kaleigh Corey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Creger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Creger(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mark Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Cubello(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Charles Cubello(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Danielle (I) Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Danielle (I) Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bruce Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bruce Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Elizabeth Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brian Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nicholas Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nicholas Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donna Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donna Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joann Elliot(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joann Elliot(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party John Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dominick Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dominick Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mittie Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mittie Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jarod Andrew Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jarod Andrew Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Thomas Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sherryll Gallion(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sherryll Gallion(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ana Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ana Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carlos Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carlos Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristie Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristie Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sarah Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tony Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tony Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Veronica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Veronica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brandy Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Brandy Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Janet Gasper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Janet Gasper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennie Germaine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennie Germaine(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arthur Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Arthur Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ashley Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Ashley Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Manfred Gunther(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Manfred Gunther(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bradford Hardman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bradford Hardman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Scott Hardwig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Scott Hardwig(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terrence Herl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Terrence Herl(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sally Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sally Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andrew Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andrew Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sheri Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sheri Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Toni Houston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Toni Houston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamie Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamie Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamie (I) Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jamie (I) Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristopher Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristopher Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristopher (I) Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kristopher (I) Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wayne Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Wayne Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andrew Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andrew Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andrew (I) Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Andrew (I) Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rosemary Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rosemary Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Caroline Jamison(pty:pla), Attorn
June 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Robert Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gabriel Blackstein(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gabriel Blackstein(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brad Blair(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brad Blair(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jason Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Bohlmann(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Bohlmann(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Bosch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party James Bosch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Derek Boucher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Derek Boucher(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carlos Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carlos Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Diane Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Diane Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Edna Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Edna Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Franklin Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Franklin Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andre Brown, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andre Brown, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patrick Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patrick Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patrick (I) Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patrick (I) Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brenda Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brenda Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ana Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ana Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle (I) Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle (I) Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brandon Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brandon Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Crystal Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Crystal Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terry Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terry Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nicholas Compean(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nicholas Compean(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kaleigh Corey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kaleigh Corey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Creger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Creger(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mark Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Cubello(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Charles Cubello(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Danielle (I) Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Danielle (I) Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bruce Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bruce Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Elizabeth Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brian Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nicholas Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nicholas Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donna Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donna Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joann Elliot(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joann Elliot(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party John Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dominick Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dominick Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mittie Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mittie Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jarod Andrew Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jarod Andrew Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Thomas Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sherryll Gallion(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sherryll Gallion(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ana Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ana Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carlos Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carlos Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristie Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristie Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sarah Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tony Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tony Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Veronica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Veronica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brandy Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Brandy Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janet Gasper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janet Gasper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennie Germaine(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennie Germaine(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arthur Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Arthur Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ashley Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Ashley Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Manfred Gunther(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Manfred Gunther(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bradford Hardman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bradford Hardman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Scott Hardwig(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Scott Hardwig(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terrence Herl(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Terrence Herl(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sally Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sally Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andrew Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andrew Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sheri Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sheri Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Toni Houston(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Toni Houston(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie (I) Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jamie (I) Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristopher Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristopher Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristopher (I) Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kristopher (I) Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wayne Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wayne Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andrew Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andrew Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andrew (I) Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Andrew (I) Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rosemary Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rosemary Jago(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Caroline Jamison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Caroline Jamison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donald Jamison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donald Jamison(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Trevor Jaskar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Trevor Jaskar(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carlos (I) Jimenez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carlos (I) Jimenez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Delia Jimenez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Delia Jimenez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Delia (I) Jimenez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Delia (I) Jimenez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added
June 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Louise Rita Caro on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Robert Bergman, Gabriel Blackstein, Brad Blair, Jason Blanscet, James Bohlmann, James Bosch, Derek Boucher, Carlos Brown, Diane Brown, Edna Brown, Franklin Brown, Andre Brown, Jr., Paul Browning, Patrick Bullock, Patrick (I) Bullock, Brenda Carter, Ana Castro, Michelle Cathey, Michelle (I) Cathey, Amy Christensen, Brandon Christensen, Crystal Clutter, Terry Clutter, Jennifer Colon, Nicholas Compean, Kaleigh Corey, Daniel Creger, Mark Crow, Charles Cubello, Danielle Currie, Danielle (I) Currie, Bruce Davis, Elizabeth Delmonico, Brian Diggs, Nicholas Diggs, Donna Doyle, Joann Elliot, John Elliott, Dominick Espinosa, Mittie Flournoy, Jarod Andrew Forbes, Thomas Fowler, Christine Franklin, Sherryll Gallion, Ana Garcia, Carlos Garcia, Kristie Garcia, Sarah Garcia, Tony Garcia, Veronica Garcia, Brandy Garner, Janet Gasper, Jennie Germaine, Arthur Gibson, Lisa Gibson, Ashley Graves, Pamela Griebel, Manfred Gunther, Bradford Hardman, Scott Hardwig, Terrence Herl, Sally Herrera, Andrew Hotchkiss, Sheri Hotchkiss, Toni Houston, Jamie Huff, Jamie (I) Huff, Kristopher Hutchinson, Kristopher (I) Hutchinson, Wayne Jackson, Andrew Jago, Andrew (I) Jago, Rosemary Jago, Caroline Jamison, Donald Jamison, Trevor Jaskar, Carlos (I) Jimenez, Delia Jimenez, Delia (I) Jimenez, Carlos Jiminez, Carol Johnson, Ruby Johnson, Ruby (I) Johnson, Alfreda Jones, Christopher Kalb, Justine Kalb, Justine (I) Kalb, Robert Kidwell, Ina King, Patrick Koegler, Alice Kramer, Tanya Lance, Clifford Lane, Sarah Lane, Ashley Lawson, Michael Lozano, Brittany Luedeke, Jessie Luedeke, Ernestine Martinez, Sheyenne McDaniel, Robert McNair, Judy Mccollam, Frank Meacham, Frank (I) Meacham, Don Medaris, Colton Anglin, Jessica Lavonne Anglin-Johnston, Justin Arias, Deonna Babcock, Alison Bachman, Nicole Bachman, Danil Backom, William Bartlett, Devon Beal, Kalayah Meketi, Brad Mengel, Phylicia Mengel, Phylicia (I) Mengel, Marty Mertz, Marty (I) Mertz, Dana Miller, Yolanda Mills, Bobby (I) Mitchell, Jr, Bobby Mitchell, Jr., David Monat, Ricky Montgomery, Aidon Moore, Amber Moore, Brooke Moore, Randy Moore, Sheila Moore, Zebediah Morris, Anna Oskvarek, Kaleb Owens, Sophia Padilla, Douglas Peck, Gianna Perry, Gianna (I) Perry, Matthew Pieffer, Frank Poebla, Davina Price, Davina (I) Price, Valentina Provenzano, Debra Ramquist, Loretta Randall, Angelelynette Rankins, Wendy Rendon, Yang Rice, Deyanda Richardson, Deyanda (I) Richardson, Florinda Ridge, Timothy Ridge, Andrea Robinson, Eunice Robinson, Jack Rocha, Ricardo Ruiz Rosado, Dominic Sanchez, Nelysette Sanchez, Nelysette (I) Sanchez, Jasmine Santiago, Tina Sheeks, Janet Shelinbarger, Scot Shelinbarger, Eryck Smith, Mark Smith, Robert Smith, Robert Smith, Robert (I) Smith, Michael Smotherman, Victoria Smotherman, Susan Spadaro, Birgit Spellman, Timothy Spellman, Brad Taylor, John Taylor, Sandra Teater, Derrick Thompson, Latriece Thompson, Jeffrey Thornton, Jonathan Tipton, Brenda Trimble, Chelsea Uebel, Dale Vadivello, Tiffany Varoz, Christopher Vigil, Akiko Walker, Stephanie Waring, James Warner, Daniel Wasik, Marion Webb, Samuel Welch, Dax Wilson, Denise Wright. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Robert Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gabriel Blackstein(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gabriel Blackstein(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brad Blair(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brad Blair(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jason Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jason Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Bohlmann(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Bohlmann(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Bosch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party James Bosch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Derek Boucher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Derek Boucher(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carlos Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carlos Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Diane Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Diane Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Edna Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Edna Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Franklin Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Franklin Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Andre Brown, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Andre Brown, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Paul Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patrick Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patrick Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patrick (I) Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patrick (I) Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brenda Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brenda Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ana Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ana Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle (I) Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle (I) Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brandon Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brandon Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Crystal Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Crystal Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terry Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terry Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nicholas Compean(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nicholas Compean(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kaleigh Corey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kaleigh Corey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Creger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Creger(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mark Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mark Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Cubello(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Charles Cubello(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Danielle (I) Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Danielle (I) Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bruce Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bruce Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Elizabeth Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brian Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nicholas Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nicholas Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donna Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donna Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joann Elliot(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joann Elliot(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party John Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dominick Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dominick Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mittie Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mittie Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jarod Andrew Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jarod Andrew Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Thomas Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sherryll Gallion(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sherryll Gallion(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ana Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ana Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carlos Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carlos Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristie Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristie Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sarah Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tony Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tony Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Veronica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Veronica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brandy Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Brandy Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janet Gasper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janet Gasper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennie Germaine(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennie Germaine(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arthur Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Arthur Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ashley Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Ashley Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Manfred Gunther(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Manfred Gunther(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bradford Hardman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bradford Hardman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Scott Hardwig(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Scott Hardwig(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terrence Herl(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Terrence Herl(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sally Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sally Herrera(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Andrew Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Andrew Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sheri Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sheri Hotchkiss(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Toni Houston(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Toni Houston(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jamie Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jamie Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jamie (I) Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jamie (I) Huff(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristopher Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristopher Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristopher (I) Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kristopher (I) Hutchinson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Wayne Jackson(pty
May 25, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam, Inc., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6121529)Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Colton Anglin(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Colton Anglin(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jessica Lavonne Anglin-Johnston(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jessica Lavonne Anglin-Johnston(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Justin Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Justin Arias(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party D. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party D. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party N. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party N. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Deonna Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Deonna Babcock(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Alison Bachman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Alison Bachman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Nicole Bachman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Nicole Bachman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Danil Backom(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Danil Backom(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party William Bartlett(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party William Bartlett(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Devon Beal(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Devon Beal(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Robert Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Robert Bergman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Gabriel Blackstein(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Gabriel Blackstein(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Brad Blair(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Brad Blair(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jason Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jason Blanscet(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party James Bohlmann(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party James Bohlmann(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party James Bosch(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party James Bosch(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Derek Boucher(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Derek Boucher(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Carlos Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Carlos Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Diane Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Diane Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Edna Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Edna Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Franklin Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Franklin Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Andre Brown, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Andre Brown, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Paul Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Paul Browning(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Patrick Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Patrick Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party K. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party K. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party M. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party M. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Brenda Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Brenda Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ana Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ana Castro(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Michelle Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Michelle Cathey(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Amy Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Brandon Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Brandon Christensen(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Crystal Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Crystal Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Terry Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Terry Clutter(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jennifer Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jennifer Colon(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Nicholas Compean(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Nicholas Compean(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kaleigh Corey(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kaleigh Corey(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Daniel Creger(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Daniel Creger(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Mark Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Mark Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Charles Cubello(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Charles Cubello(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Danielle Currie(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party M. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party M. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party N. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party N. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Bruce Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Bruce Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Elizabeth Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Elizabeth Delmonico(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Brian Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Brian Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Nicholas Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Nicholas Diggs(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Donna Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Donna Doyle(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joann Elliot(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Joann Elliot(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party John Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party John Elliott(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Dominick Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Dominick Espinosa(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Mittie Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Mittie Flournoy(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jarod Andrew Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jarod Andrew Forbes(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Thomas Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Thomas Fowler(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Christine Franklin(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sherryll Gallion(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sherryll Gallion(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ana Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ana Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Carlos Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Carlos Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kristie Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Kristie Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sarah Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Sarah Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tony Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Tony Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Veronica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Veronica Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Brandy Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Brandy Garner(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Janet Gasper(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Janet Gasper(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jennie Germaine(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Jennie Germaine(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Arthur Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Arthur Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Lisa Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ashley Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Ashley Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Pamela Griebel(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Manfred Gunther(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Manfred Gunther(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party C. H.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party C. H.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party O. H.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party O. H.(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Bradford Hardman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Bradford Hardman(pty:pla), Attorney Hunter Jay Shkolnik added to party Scott H

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Medaris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mittie Flournoy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Sheeks
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Kalb
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Clutter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Blair
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Crow
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dax Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Luedeke
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Jago
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle (I) Currie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delia Jimenez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Taylor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Houston
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deyanda Richardson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franklin Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deyanda (I) Richardson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scot Shelinbarger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Trimble
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kidwell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher Hutchinson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Oskvarek
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherryll Gallion
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Peck
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine Kalb
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Diggs
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Shelinbarger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Birgit Spellman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Hotchkiss
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gianna Perry
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bartlett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Koegler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Ruiz Rosado
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Cubello
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Moore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelelynette Rankins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Jamison
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Hotchkiss
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradford Hardman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Pieffer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Fowler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Blanscet
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Webb
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Jamison
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelysette (I) Sanchez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phylicia Mengel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Elliot
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Waring
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Castro
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latriece Thompson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaleb Owens
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Vigil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lozano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Meacham
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Moore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelysette Sanchez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestine Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Sanchez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Lane
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Tipton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarod Andrew Forbes
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Gasper
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Ramquist
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zebediah Morris
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Bachman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Mcnair
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Franklin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bohlmann
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew (I) Jago
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Smotherman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Lane
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Jackson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colton Anglin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florinda Ridge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Kramer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Herl
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ina King
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Smotherman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Huff
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie (I) Huff
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Espinosa
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hardwig
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aidon Moore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA GIBSON
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gianna (I) Perry
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Teater
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Christensen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Rendon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Carter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Graves
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Santiago
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Jiminez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW JAGO
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deonna Babcock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Mccollam
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby (I) Mitchell, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty (I) Mertz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Delmonico
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Colon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennie Germaine
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Currie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA ROBINSON
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Cathey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Creger
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Mitchell, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davina Price
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Garner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Mills
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danil Backom
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Thornton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Randall
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manfred Gunther
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eryck Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Elliott
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Spellman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert (I) Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Arias
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Blackstein
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Padilla
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Warner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Wright
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Compean
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Gibson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Lance
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Moore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Griebel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Bullock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justine (I) Kalb
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaleigh Corey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eunice Robinson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle (I) Cathey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Thompson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Rocha
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos (I) Jimenez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Monat
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelsea Uebel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bergman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Doyle
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheyenne McDaniel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trevor Jaskar
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon Beal
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Browning
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristopher (I) Hutchinson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Moore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yang Rice
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Luedeke
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akiko Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Diggs
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTY MERTZ
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Taylor
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bosch
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Varoz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delia (I) Jimenez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Christensen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Ridge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Poebla
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Vadivello
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Garcia
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Bachman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phylicia (I) Mengel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalayah Meketi
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank (I) Meacham
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Montgomery
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Clutter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RN Diane Brown
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Welch
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Wasik
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Herrera
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick (I) Bullock
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davina (I) Price
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfreda Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valentina Provenzano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Mengel
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Spadaro
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lavonne Anglin-Johnston
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby (I) Johnson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Boucher
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Lawson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company, The
Search News [ Google News