Mccloskey et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Jim Skinner, Stacie Beam, Kenneth Coleman, Jessie Ephriam, Christine Newman, Kelly Walker, Amber Perry, Austyn Huffman, Jaimi Kalich, Ayden Bailey, Christina C. Halligan, Tyber Lieser, Melony West, Dan Reimer, Michelle Gonzalez, Patrick Dewey, Roy Murphy, Mitchell Bentz, April Dalby, Else McCargar, Michele Reeves, Gary Stillings, William Smith, Shelly Laborde, Mitchell (I) Bentz, Linda Moffett, Melissa Miller, Terry Mosser, Destiny Gattus, Richard Floyd, Joseph Gonzalez, Carl Spengler, Kenneth Carter, Rebecca (I) Phillips, Analisa Whittaker, Sylvia Noble, Harleen Peterson, Wilma Jordan, Kirsten Giesegh, Eugene Pate, Stephan Steagal, Melissa (I) W. Spencer-Nguyen, Jerry Lane, Rontae Jones, Samantha Beam, Nathan Graves, Janice (I) Collins, Staci (I) Tillman, Rosemary Gaytan, Morris Maniscalco, Tyler Beam, Pamela Hoops, RUTHANN RIVERA, Carolyn Wilson, Dianna Campbell, Felecia (I) Smith, Destiny (I) Gattus, Alaina Durkee, Jennifer Dean, Mona Pierre, Bernard Hall, Rianna Willis, Christopher Gonzalez, Kayleen Chee, Eugene (I) Pate, Sammie Martinez, Mary Urbany, Sabrina Nelson, KIMBERLY DODSON, Renee Cooper, Sherry Britton, Nicole Maximenko, Juan Villanueva, Steve Martinez, Leonard (I) James, Zhane (I) Jones, Michelle (I) Swinton, Roberta Vecellio, Analisa (I) Whittaker, Corey Bernhard, David Bivings, Crystal (I) Julien, Jessica Ulanowski, Peter Followell, Joseph Perricone, Jr., Cheryl Jardin, Angela Davis, Daniel Campbell, Jamal Womack, Lorena Gonzalez, Montana Wolthuis, Sharene Martinez, Amber (I) Perry, Martina (I) Childers, Carol Salyers, Steven Austin, Randall Beam, Montana (I) Wolthuis, Laura Gennitti, Jule Sledge, Melissa W Spencer-Nguyen, Ian Kovac, Leonard James, Tammy Gonzalez, Janice Collins, Marcella Pults, Bridget Drinnon, Kimberly (I) Dodson, Roman Belasco, CHRISTOPHER PUTZI, Christina (I) C. Halligan, Rosina Oacheco, Ferlisi Wheeler, Teresa Walker, Rebekah (I) Bentz, Dianne Coxen-Coles, Catherine Dupre, SAMANTHA PIVERAL, Nathan Jones, Christopher Wolthuis, Vivian Holland, Rosalie Wilkins, Dominique Horness, Mason Moore, Damon Brimer, Sally Martinez, Allen Matthies, Wanda Knight, Onyx Rowland, Crystal Julien, Jerome Urbany, Cheryl Clanton-Austin, Paul Humphries, Walter Porter, Frances Custer, Debra Mccloskey, Staci Tillman, Rhonda Havens, Dacotah (I) Smith, Michele Ephriam, Rebecca Phillips, Miguel Gonzalez, Jean Maire Nutly, Michelle Swinton, Andrew Pate, Travis Vandenbloomer, Larry Perkins, Benjamin Sacks, Anthony Mitchell, Sandra Miller, Samantha (I) Piveral, Joann Hawkins, Nancy Dewey, Nettie Rigsby, Jonna Porter, Donald Hall, Eloi Perry, Malinda Moser, Naomi Shavies, Michelle (I) Gonzalez, Darnell Maxie, Tony Ringer, Cynthia Morgan, Tammy (I) Gonzalez, Curtis Ulanowski, Bryce Glacken, Martina Childers, Eveline Turner, Rebekah Bentz, LLoyd Stricklin, Steven Miller, Ute Belasco, Stephen Riffe, Nathan Maximenko, Bruno Don, Curtis Brisby, Kelly Vigil, Mike Brook, Allen Pisano, Daniel Rivera, Nohemi Carter, Mitchell Dziduch, Gail Coxen, Sean Bolden, Felicia Smith, Zhane Jones, Bruce Laird, Dina Martinez, Dominick Nutly, Charles Miller, Dacotah Smith, Carmen Berrious, Miguel (I) Gonzalez, Pierre Reed, Joshua Graves, Molly Miller and Albert Nutly
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Kidde PLC, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP, Chemguard, Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., 3M Company, The, National Foam Inc and UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv03419
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Colorado, 1:18-cv-01285, Mccloskey et al v. 3M Company, The et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03419-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:18-cv-01285. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 7, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE TRANSFER ORDER from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 18-cv-01285 RBJ-KMT, to The District of South Carolina, to become part of MDL 2873 By Clerk on 12/7/2018. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company Without Prejudice and Tolling Agreement by Plaintiffs Mitchell (I) Bentz, Rebekah Bentz, Rebekah (I) Bentz, Corey Bernhard, Carmen Berrious, David Bivings, Sean Bolden, Damon Brimer, Curtis Brisby, Sherry Britton, Mike Brook, Daniel Campbell, Dianna Campbell, Kenneth Carter, Nohemi Carter, Kayleen Chee, Martina Childers, Martina (I) Childers, Cheryl Clanton-Austin, Kenneth Coleman, Janice Collins, Janice (I) Collins, Renee Cooper, Gail Coxen, Dianne Coxen-Coles, Frances Custer, April Dalby, Angela Davis, Jennifer Dean, Nancy Dewey, Patrick Dewey, Kimberly Dodson, Kimberly (I) Dodson, Bruno Don, Bridget Drinnon, Catherine Dupre, Alaina Durkee, Mitchell Dziduch, Jessie Ephriam, Michele Ephriam, Richard Floyd, Peter Followell, Destiny Gattus, Destiny (I) Gattus, Rosemary Gaytan, Laura Gennitti, Kirsten Giesegh, Bryce Glacken, Christopher Gonzalez, Joseph Gonzalez, Lorena Gonzalez, Michelle Gonzalez, Michelle (I) Gonzalez, Miguel Gonzalez, Miguel (I) Gonzalez, Tammy Gonzalez, Tammy (I) Gonzalez, Joshua Graves, Nathan Graves, Bernard Hall, Donald Hall, Christina C. Halligan, Christina (I) C. Halligan, Rhonda Havens, Joann Hawkins, Vivian Holland, Pamela Hoops, Dominique Horness, Austyn Huffman, Paul Humphries, Leonard James, Leonard (I) James, Cheryl Jardin, Nathan Jones, Rontae Jones, Zhane Jones, Zhane (I) Jones, Wilma Jordan, Crystal Julien, Crystal (I) Julien, Jaimi Kalich, Wanda Knight, Ian Kovac, Shelly Laborde, Bruce Laird, Jerry Lane, Tyber Lieser, Morris Maniscalco, Dina Martinez, Sally Martinez, Sammie Martinez, Sharene Martinez, Steve Martinez, Allen Matthies, Darnell Maxie, Steven Austin, Ayden Bailey, Randall Beam, Samantha Beam, Stacie Beam, Tyler Beam, Roman Belasco, Ute Belasco, Mitchell Bentz, Nathan Maximenko, Nicole Maximenko, Else McCargar, Debra Mccloskey, Charles Miller, Melissa Miller, Molly Miller, Sandra Miller, Steven Miller, Anthony Mitchell, Linda Moffett, Mason Moore, Cynthia Morgan, Malinda Moser, Terry Mosser, Roy Murphy, Sabrina Nelson, Christine Newman, Sylvia Noble, Albert Nutly, Dominick Nutly, Jean Maire Nutly, Rosina Oacheco, Andrew Pate, Eugene Pate, Eugene (I) Pate, Larry Perkins, Joseph Perricone, Jr., Amber Perry, Amber (I) Perry, Eloi Perry, Harleen Peterson, Rebecca Phillips, Rebecca (I) Phillips, Mona Pierre, Allen Pisano, Samantha Piveral, Samantha (I) Piveral, Jonna Porter, Walter Porter, Marcella Pults, Christopher Putzi, Pierre Reed, Michele Reeves, Dan Reimer, Stephen Riffe, Nettie Rigsby, Tony Ringer, Daniel Rivera, Ruthann Rivera, Onyx Rowland, Benjamin Sacks, Carol Salyers, Naomi Shavies, Jim Skinner, Jule Sledge, Dacotah Smith, Dacotah (I) Smith, Felecia (I) Smith, Felicia Smith, William Smith, Melissa W. Spencer-Nguyen, Melissa (I) W. Spencer-Nguyen, Carl Spengler, Stephan Steagal, Gary Stillings, Lloyd Stricklin, Michelle Swinton, Michelle (I) Swinton, Staci Tillman, Staci (I) Tillman, Eveline Turner, Curtis Ulanowski, Jessica Ulanowski, Jerome Urbany, Mary Urbany, Travis Vandenbloomer, Roberta Vecellio, Kelly Vigil, Juan Villanueva, Kelly Walker, Teresa Walker, Melony West, Ferlisi Wheeler, Analisa Whittaker, Analisa (I) Whittaker, Rosalie Wilkins, Rianna Willis, Carolyn Wilson, Christopher Wolthuis, Montana Wolthuis, Montana (I) Wolthuis, Jamal Womack. (Napoli, Paul) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED. In accordance with D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(4), this related case is specially reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should reference Judge Jackson and Magistrate Judge Tafoya at the end of the civil action number (e.g., 18-cv-0001-RBJ-KMT). Text Only Entry. (dkals, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelly A. Hyman terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/27/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Kelly Hyman by Plaintiffs Mitchell (I) Bentz, Rebekah Bentz, Rebekah (I) Bentz, Corey Bernhard, Carmen Berrious, David Bivings, Sean Bolden, Damon Brimer, Curtis Brisby, Sherry Britton, Mike Brook, Daniel Campbell, Dianna Campbell, Kenneth Carter, Nohemi Carter, Kayleen Chee, Martina Childers, Martina (I) Childers, Cheryl Clanton-Austin, Kenneth Coleman, Janice Collins, Janice (I) Collins, Renee Cooper, Gail Coxen, Dianne Coxen-Coles, Frances Custer, April Dalby, Angela Davis, Jennifer Dean, Nancy Dewey, Patrick Dewey, Kimberly Dodson, Kimberly (I) Dodson, Bruno Don, Bridget Drinnon, Catherine Dupre, Alaina Durkee, Mitchell Dziduch, Jessie Ephriam, Michele Ephriam, Richard Floyd, Peter Followell, Destiny Gattus, Destiny (I) Gattus, Rosemary Gaytan, Laura Gennitti, Kirsten Giesegh, Bryce Glacken, Christopher Gonzalez, Joseph Gonzalez, Lorena Gonzalez, Michelle Gonzalez, Michelle (I) Gonzalez, Miguel Gonzalez, Miguel (I) Gonzalez, Tammy Gonzalez, Tammy (I) Gonzalez, Joshua Graves, Nathan Graves, Bernard Hall, Donald Hall, Christina C. Halligan, Christina (I) C. Halligan, Rhonda Havens, Joann Hawkins, Vivian Holland, Pamela Hoops, Dominique Horness, Austyn Huffman, Paul Humphries, Leonard James, Leonard (I) James, Cheryl Jardin, Nathan Jones, Rontae Jones, Zhane Jones, Zhane (I) Jones, Wilma Jordan, Crystal Julien, Crystal (I) Julien, Jaimi Kalich, Wanda Knight, Ian Kovac, Shelly Laborde, Bruce Laird, Jerry Lane, Tyber Lieser, Morris Maniscalco, Dina Martinez, Sally Martinez, Sammie Martinez, Sharene Martinez, Steve Martinez, Allen Matthies, Darnell Maxie, Steven Austin, Ayden Bailey, Randall Beam, Samantha Beam, Stacie Beam, Tyler Beam, Roman Belasco, Ute Belasco, Mitchell Bentz, Nathan Maximenko, Nicole Maximenko, Else McCargar, Debra Mccloskey, Charles Miller, Melissa Miller, Molly Miller, Sandra Miller, Steven Miller, Anthony Mitchell, Linda Moffett, Mason Moore, Cynthia Morgan, Malinda Moser, Terry Mosser, Roy Murphy, Sabrina Nelson, Christine Newman, Sylvia Noble, Albert Nutly, Dominick Nutly, Jean Maire Nutly, Rosina Oacheco, Andrew Pate, Eugene Pate, Eugene (I) Pate, Larry Perkins, Joseph Perricone, Jr., Amber Perry, Amber (I) Perry, Eloi Perry, Harleen Peterson, Rebecca Phillips, Rebecca (I) Phillips, Mona Pierre, Allen Pisano, Samantha Piveral, Samantha (I) Piveral, Jonna Porter, Walter Porter, Marcella Pults, Christopher Putzi, Pierre Reed, Michele Reeves, Dan Reimer, Stephen Riffe, Nettie Rigsby, Tony Ringer, Daniel Rivera, Ruthann Rivera, Onyx Rowland, Benjamin Sacks, Carol Salyers, Naomi Shavies, Jim Skinner, Jule Sledge, Dacotah Smith, Dacotah (I) Smith, Felecia (I) Smith, Felicia Smith, William Smith, Melissa W. Spencer-Nguyen, Melissa (I) W. Spencer-Nguyen, Carl Spengler, Stephan Steagal, Gary Stillings, Lloyd Stricklin, Michelle Swinton, Michelle (I) Swinton, Staci Tillman, Staci (I) Tillman, Eveline Turner, Curtis Ulanowski, Jessica Ulanowski, Jerome Urbany, Mary Urbany, Travis Vandenbloomer, Roberta Vecellio, Kelly Vigil, Juan Villanueva, Kelly Walker, Teresa Walker, Melony West, Ferlisi Wheeler, Analisa Whittaker, Analisa (I) Whittaker, Rosalie Wilkins, Rianna Willis, Carolyn Wilson, Christopher Wolthuis, Montana Wolthuis, Montana (I) Wolthuis, Jamal Womack. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Hyman, Kelly) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael David Eric McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mitchell (I) Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mitchell (I) Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebekah Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebekah Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebekah (I) Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rebekah (I) Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Corey Bernhard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Corey Bernhard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carmen Berrious(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Carmen Berrious(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Bivings(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party David Bivings(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sean Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sean Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Damon Brimer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Damon Brimer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Curtis Brisby(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Curtis Brisby(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sherry Britton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Sherry Britton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mike Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mike Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Daniel Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dianna Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dianna Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nohemi Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nohemi Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayleen Chee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kayleen Chee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Martina Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Martina Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Martina (I) Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Martina (I) Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cheryl Clanton-Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Cheryl Clanton-Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kenneth Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Janice Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Janice Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Janice (I) Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Janice (I) Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gail Coxen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Gail Coxen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dianne Coxen-Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Dianne Coxen-Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Frances Custer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Frances Custer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party April Dalby(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party April Dalby(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Angela Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jennifer Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nancy Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nancy Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patrick Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Patrick Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly (I) Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kimberly (I) Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bruno Don (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bruno Don (pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bridget Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bridget Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Catherine Dupre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Catherine Dupre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alaina Durkee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Alaina Durkee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mitchell Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Mitchell Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jessie Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Jessie Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michele Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michele Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Peter Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Peter Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Destiny Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Destiny Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Destiny (I) Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Destiny (I) Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rosemary Gaytan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rosemary Gaytan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kirsten Giesegh(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Kirsten Giesegh(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bryce Glacken(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bryce Glacken(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christopher Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christopher Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joseph Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lorena Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Lorena Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Miguel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Miguel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Miguel (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Miguel (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tammy Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tammy Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tammy (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Tammy (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joshua Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joshua Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nathan Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Nathan Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bernard Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Bernard Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donald Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Donald Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christina C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christina C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christina (I) C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Christina (I) C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rhonda Havens(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Rhonda Havens(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joann Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt added to party Joann Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael David Eric McDivitt ad
June 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael W. McDivitt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mitchell (I) Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mitchell (I) Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebekah Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebekah Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebekah (I) Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rebekah (I) Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Corey Bernhard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Corey Bernhard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carmen Berrious(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Carmen Berrious(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Bivings(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party David Bivings(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sean Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sean Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Damon Brimer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Damon Brimer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Curtis Brisby(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Curtis Brisby(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sherry Britton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Sherry Britton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mike Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mike Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Daniel Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dianna Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dianna Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nohemi Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nohemi Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayleen Chee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kayleen Chee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Martina Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Martina Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Martina (I) Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Martina (I) Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cheryl Clanton-Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cheryl Clanton-Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kenneth Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Janice Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Janice Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Janice (I) Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Janice (I) Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gail Coxen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Gail Coxen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dianne Coxen-Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dianne Coxen-Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frances Custer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Frances Custer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party April Dalby(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party April Dalby(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Angela Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jennifer Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nancy Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nancy Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patrick Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Patrick Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly (I) Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kimberly (I) Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bruno Don (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bruno Don (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bridget Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bridget Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Catherine Dupre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Catherine Dupre(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alaina Durkee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Alaina Durkee(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mitchell Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Mitchell Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jessie Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Jessie Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michele Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michele Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Peter Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Peter Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Destiny Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Destiny Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Destiny (I) Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Destiny (I) Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rosemary Gaytan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rosemary Gaytan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kirsten Giesegh(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Kirsten Giesegh(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bryce Glacken(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bryce Glacken(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christopher Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joseph Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lorena Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Lorena Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Michelle (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Miguel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Miguel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Miguel (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Miguel (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tammy Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tammy Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tammy (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Tammy (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joshua Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joshua Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nathan Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Nathan Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bernard Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Bernard Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donald Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Donald Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christina C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christina C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christina (I) C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Christina (I) C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhonda Havens(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Rhonda Havens(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joann Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Joann Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Vivian Holland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Vivian Holland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Hoops(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Pamela Hoops(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dominique Horness(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Dominique Horness(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Austyn Huffman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Austyn Huffman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Humphries(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Paul Humphries(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leonard James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leonard James(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leonard (I) James (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Leonard (I) James (pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party Cheryl Jardin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael W. McDivitt added to party C
June 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelly A. Hyman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mitchell (I) Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mitchell (I) Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebekah Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebekah Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebekah (I) Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rebekah (I) Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Corey Bernhard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Corey Bernhard(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carmen Berrious(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Carmen Berrious(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Bivings(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party David Bivings(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sean Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sean Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Damon Brimer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Damon Brimer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Curtis Brisby(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Curtis Brisby(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sherry Britton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Sherry Britton(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mike Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mike Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Daniel Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dianna Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dianna Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nohemi Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nohemi Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayleen Chee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kayleen Chee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Martina Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Martina Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Martina (I) Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Martina (I) Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cheryl Clanton-Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cheryl Clanton-Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kenneth Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janice Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janice Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janice (I) Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Janice (I) Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gail Coxen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Gail Coxen(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dianne Coxen-Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dianne Coxen-Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frances Custer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Frances Custer(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party April Dalby(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party April Dalby(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Angela Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jennifer Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nancy Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nancy Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patrick Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Patrick Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly (I) Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kimberly (I) Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bruno Don (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bruno Don (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bridget Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bridget Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Catherine Dupre(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Catherine Dupre(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alaina Durkee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Alaina Durkee(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mitchell Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Mitchell Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessie Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Jessie Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michele Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michele Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Peter Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Peter Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Destiny Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Destiny Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Destiny (I) Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Destiny (I) Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rosemary Gaytan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rosemary Gaytan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kirsten Giesegh(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Kirsten Giesegh(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bryce Glacken(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bryce Glacken(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christopher Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joseph Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lorena Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Lorena Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Michelle (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Miguel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Miguel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Miguel (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Miguel (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tammy Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tammy Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tammy (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Tammy (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joshua Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nathan Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nathan Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bernard Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Bernard Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donald Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Donald Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christina C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christina C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christina (I) C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Christina (I) C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhonda Havens(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rhonda Havens(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joann Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Joann Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Vivian Holland(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Vivian Holland(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Hoops(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Pamela Hoops(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dominique Horness(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Dominique Horness(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Austyn Huffman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Austyn Huffman(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Humphries(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Paul Humphries(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leonard James(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leonard James(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leonard (I) James (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Leonard (I) James (pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cheryl Jardin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Cheryl Jardin(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nathan Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Nathan Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rontae Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Rontae Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Zhane Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Zhane Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Zhane (I) Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Zhane (I) Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wilma Jordan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Wilma Jordan(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman added to party Crystal Julien(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly A. Hyman
June 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Louise Rita Caro on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Caro, Louise) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to The 3M Company, f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.; Buckeye Fire Equipment Co.; Chemguard; Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc.; Kidde PLC; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc; National Foam, Inc.; Tyco Fire Products LP; UTC FIRE & SECURITY AMERICAS CORPORATION, INC re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Mitchell (I) Bentz, Rebekah Bentz, Rebekah (I) Bentz, Corey Bernhard, Carmen Berrious, David Bivings, Sean Bolden, Damon Brimer, Curtis Brisby, Sherry Britton, Mike Brook, Daniel Campbell, Dianna Campbell, Kenneth Carter, Nohemi Carter, Kayleen Chee, Martina Childers, Martina (I) Childers, Cheryl Clanton-Austin, Kenneth Coleman, Janice Collins, Janice (I) Collins, Renee Cooper, Gail Coxen, Dianne Coxen-Coles, Frances Custer, April Dalby, Angela Davis, Jennifer Dean, Nancy Dewey, Patrick Dewey, Kimberly Dodson, Kimberly (I) Dodson, Bruno Don, Bridget Drinnon, Catherine Dupre, Alaina Durkee, Mitchell Dziduch, Jessie Ephriam, Michele Ephriam, Richard Floyd, Peter Followell, Destiny Gattus, Destiny (I) Gattus, Rosemary Gaytan, Laura Gennitti, Kirsten Giesegh, Bryce Glacken, Christopher Gonzalez, Joseph Gonzalez, Lorena Gonzalez, Michelle Gonzalez, Michelle (I) Gonzalez, Miguel Gonzalez, Miguel (I) Gonzalez, Tammy Gonzalez, Tammy (I) Gonzalez, Joshua Graves, Nathan Graves, Bernard Hall, Donald Hall, Christina C. Halligan, Christina (I) C. Halligan, Rhonda Havens, Joann Hawkins, Vivian Holland, Pamela Hoops, Dominique Horness, Austyn Huffman, Paul Humphries, Leonard James, Leonard (I) James, Cheryl Jardin, Nathan Jones, Rontae Jones, Zhane Jones, Zhane (I) Jones, Wilma Jordan, Crystal Julien, Crystal (I) Julien, Jaimi Kalich, Wanda Knight, Ian Kovac, Shelly Laborde, Bruce Laird, Jerry Lane, Tyber Lieser, Morris Maniscalco, Dina Martinez, Sally Martinez, Sammie Martinez, Sharene Martinez, Steve Martinez, Allen Matthies, Darnell Maxie, Steven Austin, Ayden Bailey, Randall Beam, Samantha Beam, Stacie Beam, Tyler Beam, Roman Belasco, Ute Belasco, Mitchell Bentz, Nathan Maximenko, Nicole Maximenko, Else McCargar, Debra Mccloskey, Charles Miller, Melissa Miller, Molly Miller, Sandra Miller, Steven Miller, Anthony Mitchell, Linda Moffett, Mason Moore, Cynthia Morgan, Malinda Moser, Terry Mosser, Roy Murphy, Sabrina Nelson, Christine Newman, Sylvia Noble, Albert Nutly, Dominick Nutly, Jean Maire Nutly, Rosina Oacheco, Andrew Pate, Eugene Pate, Eugene (I) Pate, Larry Perkins, Joseph Perricone, Jr., Amber Perry, Amber (I) Perry, Eloi Perry, Harleen Peterson, Rebecca Phillips, Rebecca (I) Phillips, Mona Pierre, Allen Pisano, Samantha Piveral, Samantha (I) Piveral, Jonna Porter, Walter Porter, Marcella Pults, Christopher Putzi, Pierre Reed, Michele Reeves, Dan Reimer, Stephen Riffe, Nettie Rigsby, Tony Ringer, Daniel Rivera, Ruthann Rivera, Onyx Rowland, Benjamin Sacks, Carol Salyers, Naomi Shavies, Jim Skinner, Jule Sledge, Dacotah Smith, Dacotah (I) Smith, Felecia (I) Smith, Felicia Smith, William Smith, Melissa W. Spencer-Nguyen, Melissa (I) W. Spencer-Nguyen, Carl Spengler, Stephan Steagal, Gary Stillings, Lloyd Stricklin, Michelle Swinton, Michelle (I) Swinton, Staci Tillman, Staci (I) Tillman, Eveline Turner, Curtis Ulanowski, Jessica Ulanowski, Jerome Urbany, Mary Urbany, Travis Vandenbloomer, Roberta Vecellio, Kelly Vigil, Juan Villanueva, Kelly Walker, Teresa Walker, Melony West, Ferlisi Wheeler, Analisa Whittaker, Analisa (I) Whittaker, Rosalie Wilkins, Rianna Willis, Carolyn Wilson, Christopher Wolthuis, Montana Wolthuis, Montana (I) Wolthuis, Jamal Womack. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick James Lanciotti on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mitchell (I) Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mitchell (I) Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebekah Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebekah Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebekah (I) Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rebekah (I) Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Corey Bernhard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Corey Bernhard(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carmen Berrious(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Carmen Berrious(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Bivings(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party David Bivings(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sean Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sean Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Damon Brimer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Damon Brimer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Curtis Brisby(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Curtis Brisby(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sherry Britton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Sherry Britton(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mike Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mike Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Daniel Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dianna Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dianna Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nohemi Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nohemi Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayleen Chee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kayleen Chee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Martina Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Martina Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Martina (I) Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Martina (I) Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cheryl Clanton-Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Cheryl Clanton-Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kenneth Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janice Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janice Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janice (I) Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Janice (I) Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gail Coxen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Gail Coxen(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dianne Coxen-Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dianne Coxen-Coles(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Frances Custer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Frances Custer(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party April Dalby(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party April Dalby(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Angela Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jennifer Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nancy Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nancy Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patrick Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Patrick Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly (I) Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kimberly (I) Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bruno Don (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bruno Don (pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bridget Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bridget Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Catherine Dupre(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Catherine Dupre(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alaina Durkee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Alaina Durkee(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mitchell Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Mitchell Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jessie Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Jessie Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michele Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michele Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Peter Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Peter Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Destiny Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Destiny Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Destiny (I) Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Destiny (I) Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rosemary Gaytan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rosemary Gaytan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kirsten Giesegh(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Kirsten Giesegh(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bryce Glacken(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bryce Glacken(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christopher Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christopher Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joseph Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lorena Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Lorena Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Michelle (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Miguel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Miguel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Miguel (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Miguel (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tammy Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tammy Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tammy (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Tammy (I) Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joshua Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joshua Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nathan Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Nathan Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bernard Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Bernard Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donald Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Donald Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christina C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christina C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christina (I) C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Christina (I) C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rhonda Havens(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Rhonda Havens(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joann Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Joann Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Vivian Holland(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Vivian Holland(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela Hoops(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Pamela Hoops(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dominique Horness(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Dominique Horness(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Austyn Huffman(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick James Lanciotti added to party Au
May 25, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 12/19/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., National Foam, Inc., The 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products, L.P., UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6122289)Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Steven Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Steven Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party E. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party E. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party G. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party G. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party H. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party H. B.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party M. B.1(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party M. B.1(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party M. B.2(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party M. B.2(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ayden Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ayden Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Randall Beam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Randall Beam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Stacie Beam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Stacie Beam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tyler Beam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tyler Beam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Roman Belasco(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Roman Belasco(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ute Belasco(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Ute Belasco(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mitchell Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mitchell Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rebekah Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rebekah Bentz(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Corey Bernhard(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Corey Bernhard(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carmen Berrious(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Carmen Berrious(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party David Bivings(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party David Bivings(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sean Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sean Bolden(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Damon Brimer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Damon Brimer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Curtis Brisby(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Curtis Brisby(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sherry Britton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Sherry Britton(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mike Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mike Brook(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party A. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party A. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party M. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party M. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party O. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party O. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party S. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party S. C.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Daniel Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dianna Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dianna Campbell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kenneth Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kenneth Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nohemi Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nohemi Carter(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kayleen Chee(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kayleen Chee(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Martina Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Martina Childers(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cheryl Clanton-Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Cheryl Clanton-Austin(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kenneth Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kenneth Coleman(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Janice Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Janice Collins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Renee Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dianne Coxen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dianne Coxen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gail Coxen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Gail Coxen(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Frances Custer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Frances Custer(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party A. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party A. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party J. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party J. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party J. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party J. D.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party April Dalby(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party April Dalby(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Angela Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Angela Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jennifer Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nancy Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nancy Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patrick Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Patrick Dewey(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kimberly Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kimberly Dodson(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bruno Don (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bruno Don (pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bridget Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bridget Drinnon(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Catherine Dupre(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Catherine Dupre(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alaina Durkee(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Alaina Durkee(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mitchell Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Mitchell Dziduch(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jessie Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Jessie Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michele Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michele Ephriam(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Richard Floyd(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Peter Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Peter Followell(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party A. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party A. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party A. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party A. G.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Destiny Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Destiny Gattus(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rosemary Gaytan(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rosemary Gaytan(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Laura Gennitti(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kirsten Giesegh(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Kirsten Giesegh(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bryce Glacken(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bryce Glacken(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christopher Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christopher Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joseph Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lorena Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Lorena Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Michelle Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Miquel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Miquel Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tammy Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Tammy Gonzalez(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joshua Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joshua Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nathan Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Nathan Graves(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party M. H.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party M. H.(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bernard Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Bernard Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Donald Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Donald Hall(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christina C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Christina C. Halligan(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rhonda Havens(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Rhonda Havens(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joann Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Joann Hawkins(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Vivian Holland(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Vivian Holland(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Pamela Hoops(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Pamela Hoops(pty:pla), Attorney Paul J. Napoli added to party Dominique Hor

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mccloskey et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Skinner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacie Beam
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Coleman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Ephriam
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Newman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Perry
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austyn Huffman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaimi Kalich
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayden Bailey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina C. Halligan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyber Lieser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melony West
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Reimer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Dewey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Murphy
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Bentz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Dalby
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Else McCargar
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Reeves
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Stillings
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Laborde
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell (I) Bentz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Moffett
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Mosser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destiny Gattus
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Floyd
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Spengler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Carter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca (I) Phillips
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Analisa Whittaker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Noble
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harleen Peterson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilma Jordan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirsten Giesegh
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Pate
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Steagal
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa (I) W. Spencer-Nguyen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Lane
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rontae Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Beam
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Graves
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice (I) Collins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staci (I) Tillman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Gaytan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Maniscalco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Beam
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Hoops
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUTHANN RIVERA
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Wilson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianna Campbell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felecia (I) Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destiny (I) Gattus
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaina Durkee
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Dean
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona Pierre
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Hall
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rianna Willis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayleen Chee
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene (I) Pate
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammie Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Urbany
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Nelson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY DODSON
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Cooper
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Britton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Maximenko
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Villanueva
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard (I) James
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhane (I) Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle (I) Swinton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Vecellio
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Analisa (I) Whittaker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Bernhard
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bivings
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal (I) Julien
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Ulanowski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Followell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Perricone, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Jardin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Davis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Campbell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamal Womack
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorena Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana Wolthuis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharene Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber (I) Perry
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martina (I) Childers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Salyers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Austin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Beam
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana (I) Wolthuis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Gennitti
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jule Sledge
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa W Spencer-Nguyen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Kovac
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard James
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Collins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Pults
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Drinnon
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly (I) Dodson
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Belasco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER PUTZI
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina (I) C. Halligan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosina Oacheco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferlisi Wheeler
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Walker
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah (I) Bentz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Coxen-Coles
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Dupre
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMANTHA PIVERAL
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wolthuis
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Holland
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalie Wilkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Horness
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mason Moore
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Brimer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Matthies
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Knight
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Onyx Rowland
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Julien
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Urbany
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Clanton-Austin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Humphries
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Porter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Custer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Mccloskey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Staci Tillman
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Havens
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dacotah (I) Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Ephriam
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Phillips
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Maire Nutly
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Swinton
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Pate
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Vandenbloomer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Perkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Sacks
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Mitchell
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha (I) Piveral
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Hawkins
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Dewey
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nettie Rigsby
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonna Porter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Hall
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eloi Perry
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malinda Moser
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Shavies
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle (I) Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Maxie
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Ringer
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Morgan
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy (I) Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Ulanowski
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce Glacken
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martina Childers
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eveline Turner
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Bentz
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LLoyd Stricklin
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ute Belasco
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Riffe
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Maximenko
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruno Don
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Brisby
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Vigil
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Brook
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Pisano
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rivera
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nohemi Carter
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Dziduch
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Coxen
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Bolden
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhane Jones
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Laird
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Martinez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Nutly
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dacotah Smith
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Berrious
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel (I) Gonzalez
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pierre Reed
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Graves
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Miller
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Louise Rita Caro
Represented By: Kelly A. Hyman
Represented By: Hunter Jay Shkolnik
Represented By: Michael W. McDivitt
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Represented By: Michael David Eric McDivitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance