Barnstable County v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Barnstable County
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, National Foam Inc, Chemguard Inc, John Doe 1-49, United Technologies Corporation, 3M Company and Tyco Fire Products LP
Case Number: 2:2018cv03433
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 154 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 153 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Massachusetts, 1:17-cv-40002, Barnstable County v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-3433-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (cpeg, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 152 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:17-cv-40002. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 13, 2018 Filing 151 Case Electronically transferred to the District of South Carolina pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 12/7/18 Original file and certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet electronically sent to the Clerk in that district. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-12351-DJC, 1:17-cv-40002-DJC, 1:18-cv-10747-DJC, 3:18-cv-30027-DJC(McKillop, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 150 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order in MDL Case 2873 received from MDL panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-12351-DJC, 1:17-cv-40002-DJC, 1:18-cv-10747-DJC, 3:18-cv-30027-DJC(McKillop, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 149 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order in MDL Case 2873 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-12351-DJC, 1:17-cv-40002-DJC, 1:18-cv-10747-DJC, 3:18-cv-30027-DJC(Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 148 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by 3M Company. (Stuebing, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 147 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re: #146 Motion to Stay. In light of the motion, D. 113 and related filings, D. 114, in CA 16-12351, the Court ALLOWS the motion to stay until December 5, 2018. No later than December 3, 2018, the parties shall file a joint status report reflecting the status of any decision by the MDL panel regarding potential transfer and/or the need for any additional stay. (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 146 MOTION to Stay Pending Decision by Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by 3M Company.(Stuebing, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
September 11, 2018 Filing 145 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Alley on behalf of National Foam, Inc. (Alley, Peter) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Hannigan Bryan on behalf of National Foam, Inc. (Bryan, Emily) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 143 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #141 , #142 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Liam J. Montgomery, J. Liat Rome. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 142 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of J. Liat Rome Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7268070 by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 141 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Liam J. Montgomery Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7268061 by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 140 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-30027-DJC, 1:17-cv-40002-DJC(Scalfani, Deborah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 139 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on July 12, 2018, before Judge Denise J. Casper. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com Redaction Request due 8/21/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/31/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2018. Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-30027-DJC, 1:17-cv-40002-DJC(Scalfani, Deborah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 138 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Motion Hearing held on 7/12/2018 re #127 Joint MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint filed by 3M Company, Tyco Fire Products LP, National Foam, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company. Court taking under advisement #127 Motion to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: John E. Garber, Richard W. Head, Robert D. Cox, Jr.for the plaintiffs. John D. Stuebing, Lindsay M. Burke, Michael A. Scodro, David Weinraub, Douglas E. Fleming, III, Christopher M. Reilly, Michael E. Pastore for the defendants.) (McKillop, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 137 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #136 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael A. Scodro. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 136 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael A. Scodro Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7221422 by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Michael A. Scodro)(Stuebing, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 135 Opposition re #131 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply In Further Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint filed by Barnstable County. (Head, Richard) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 134 NOTICE by Tyco Fire Products LP Of Filing Motion To Transfer Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 133 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #127 Joint MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2018 03:30 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 132 Proposed RESPONSE to Motion re #127 Joint MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint filed by 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 131 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply In Further Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint by 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP.(Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 130 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #127 Joint MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 129 First Opposition re #127 Joint MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss filed by Barnstable County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement for Judgment, #2 Exhibit Chemguard AFFF Spec Sheet, #3 Exhibit GAO Report)(Madonna, Kevin) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 128 MEMORANDUM in Support re #127 Joint MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint filed by 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 127 Joint MOTION to Dismiss The First Amended Complaint by 3M Company, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Chemguard, Inc., National Foam, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP.(Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 126 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #125 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Laura R. Hammargren. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 125 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Laura R. Hammargren Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7120812 by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Laura R. Hammargren)(Stuebing, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 124 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Stephanie Gase Mawell D. Herman, and Beth A. Landes (Gase, Stephanie) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 16, 2018 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Pastore on behalf of National Foam, Inc. (Pastore, Michael) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 122 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #120 , #121 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Richard F. Bulger, Tyler D. Alfermann. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 121 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Tyler D. Alfermann Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7048733 by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Tyler D. Alfermann)(Stuebing, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 120 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard F. Bulger Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-7048732 by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Richard F. Bulger)(Stuebing, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 119 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #117 Motion for Extension of Time. Deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the County of Barnstable's First Amended Complaint be extended until the earlier of the following dates: seven days after the parties have met and conferred pursuant to Chapter 21E 4A(b); or May 16, 2018. (McKillop, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 20, 2018 Filing 118 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #112 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christian B.W. Stephens; Albert G. Bixler and Pamela C. Rutkowski terminated (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 117 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP.(Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 116 First Amended Complaint by Barnstable County. Amendment to #1 Complaint, . (Head, Richard) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 115 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re: #111 Motion to Amend Complaint. Having considered motion and responses, motion allowed. Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 114 RESPONSE to Motion re #111 First MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, #109 Memorandum & ORDER,,, filed by Buckeye Fire Equipment Company. (Reilly, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 113 RESPONSE to Motion re #111 First MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, #109 Memorandum & ORDER,,, filed by Tyco Fire Products LP. (Kenney, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 112 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney /Appearance of Counsel by National Foam, Inc..(Rutkowski, Pamela) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
January 18, 2018 Filing 111 First MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, #109 Memorandum & ORDER,,, by Barnstable County. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint)(Head, Richard) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
December 27, 2017 Filing 110 STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
December 18, 2017 Filing 109 Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Tyco and Chemguard's request for judicial notice, D. 50, and GRANTS in part and DENIES in part United Tech's request for judicial notice, D. 56. For the aforementioned reasons, the Court GRANTS IN PART 3M's motion to dismiss, D. 42, GRANTS IN PART Tyco and Chemguard's motion to dismiss, D. 48, GRANTS IN PART United Tech's motion to dismiss, D. 54, and GRANTS IN PART Buckeye's motion to dismiss, D. 57, as follows: 1. Counts I, II, III are dismissed without prejudice; 2. Counts IV and V are dismissed; 3. The County may amend as to Counts VI and VII in light of the resolution of the state court action and must do so by January 18, 2018; and 4. Count VIII survives. (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
November 29, 2017 Filing 108 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #107 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Maxwell D. Herman. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (McKillop, Matthew) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Maxwell D. Herman Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6899944 by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stuebing, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
September 22, 2017 Filing 106 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Kennell M. Sambour (Sambour, Kennell) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
July 26, 2017 Filing 105 Assented to Notice of Supplemental Authorities re #48 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #42 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Litigation, #52 MOTION for Joinder TO DEFENDANTS TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP AND CHEMGUARD, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY THE COMPLAINT, #54 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(6), #57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Barnstable County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 Agreement for Judgment)(Head, Richard) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
July 11, 2017 Filing 104 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Court understands that Jonathan Handler, counsel for one of the defendants, works for Day Pitney LLP. The Court notes for the benefit of all counsel that she is a trusts and estates client of another attorney at Day Pitney LLP. Although the Court does not believe that this is a basis for recusal in this case, if any of the parties has a different view, counsel may file a notice to that effect on or before July 19, 2017 for the Court's consideration.(Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 103 NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at #http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 102 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on June 7, 2017, before Judge Denise J. Casper. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com Redaction Request due 7/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2017. (Scalfani, Deborah) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 101 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Motion Hearing held on 6/7/2017. Court hears arguments. Court takes under advisement #42 Motion to Dismiss; takes under advisement #48 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; grants #52 Motion for Joinder; takes under advisement #54 Motion to Dismiss; takes under advisement #57 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; grants #83 Motion for Joinder. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Richard Head and Robert Cox for the plaintiff. Beth Landes, John Steubing, Christopher Kenney, David Weinraub, Douglas Fleming, Christopher Reilly, Michael Carpenter, Jonathan Handler, Keith Smith and Pamela Rutkowski for the defendants.) (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
June 6, 2017 Filing 100 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #94 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Stephanie Gase. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
June 6, 2017 Filing 99 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #93 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Beth A. Landes. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 31, 2017 Filing 98 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #83 MOTION for Joinder in Defendants Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc.'s Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss or Stay and Request for Consideration and Judicial Notice, #54 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(6), #52 MOTION for Joinder TO DEFENDANTS TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP AND CHEMGUARD, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY THE COMPLAINT, #57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #48 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #42 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Litigation : Motion Hearing set for 6/7/2017 02:15 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 30, 2017 Filing 97 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #95 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael L. Carpenter. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 22, 2017 Filing 96 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The motion hearing set for May 23, 2017 is cancelled. The court will set a new hearing date next week. (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 19, 2017 Filing 95 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael L. Carpenter Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6635685 by Buckeye Fire Equipment Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of MLC Pro Hac Vice)(Reilly, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 18, 2017 Filing 94 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Stephanie L. Gase Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6633575 by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stuebing, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 18, 2017 Filing 93 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Beth A. Landes Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6633515 by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stuebing, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 16, 2017 Filing 92 Response by United Technologies Corporation to #64 Opposition to Motion, and Plaintiff's Omnibus Opposition to Requests for Judicial Notice. (Handler, Jonathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 16, 2017 Filing 91 REPLY to Response to #54 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(6) filed by United Technologies Corporation. (Handler, Jonathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 15, 2017 Filing 90 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #82 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of United Technologies Corporation's Request for Judicial Notice by United Technologies Corporation; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 15, 2017 Filing 89 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #81 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of United Technologies Corporation's Motion to Dismiss by United Technologies Corporation; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
May 15, 2017 Filing 88 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #79 Motion for Leave to File REPLY MEMORANDUM by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 26, 2017 Filing 87 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #73 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Sheila L. Birnbaum. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 26, 2017 Filing 86 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #72 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Mark S. Cheffo. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 26, 2017 Filing 85 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #71 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added David Weinraub. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 26, 2017 Filing 84 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #70 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Douglas E. Fleming, III. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 20, 2017 Filing 83 MOTION for Joinder in Defendants Tyco Fire Products LP and Chemguard, Inc.'s Reply in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss or Stay and Request for Consideration and Judicial Notice by National Foam, Inc..(Rutkowski, Pamela) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of United Technologies Corporation's Request for Judicial Notice by United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- UTC's Proposed Reply Memorandum in Support of its Request for Judicial Notice)(Handler, Jonathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of United Technologies Corporation's Motion to Dismiss by United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- UTC's Proposed Reply Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss)(Handler, Jonathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 80 REPLY to Response to #48 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM OR STAY AND REQUEST FOR CONSIDERATION AND JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Kenney, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to File REPLY MEMORANDUM by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP.(Kenney, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 10, 2017 Filing 78 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #77 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Albert G. Bixler. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 7, 2017 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Albert G. Bixler Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6573582 by National Foam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Albert G. Bixler)(Rutkowski, Pamela) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 5, 2017 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to #42 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Litigation filed by 3M Company. (Stuebing, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 5, 2017 Filing 75 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #74 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by 3M Company; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Reply Memorandum)(Stuebing, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Sheila L. Birnbaum Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6567340 by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Kenney, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 72 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Mark S. Cheffo Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6567333 by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Kenney, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of David Weinraub Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6567312 by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Kenney, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Douglas E. Fleming, III Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6567245 by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Kenney, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 4, 2017 Filing 69 ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #54 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(6), #52 MOTION for Joinder TO DEFENDANTS TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP AND CHEMGUARD, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY THE COMPLAINT, #57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #48 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #42 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Litigation : Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 3, 2017 Filing 68 Opposition re #48 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Barnstable County. (Head, Richard) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 3, 2017 Filing 67 Opposition re #54 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(6) filed by Barnstable County. (Head, Richard) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 3, 2017 Filing 66 Opposition re #52 MOTION for Joinder TO DEFENDANTS TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP AND CHEMGUARD, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY THE COMPLAINT filed by Barnstable County. (Head, Richard) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 3, 2017 Filing 65 Opposition re #57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Barnstable County. (Head, Richard) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
April 3, 2017 Filing 64 Opposition re #42 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Litigation, #52 MOTION for Joinder TO DEFENDANTS TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP AND CHEMGUARD, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY THE COMPLAINT, #54 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(6), #57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Omnibus Objection to Request for Judicial Notice filed by Barnstable County. (Head, Richard) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 27, 2017 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Litigation filed by Barnstable County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Garner, Jennifer) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 23, 2017 Filing 62 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #61 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Keith E. Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Keith E. Smith Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6547050 by National Foam, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certification)(Rutkowski, Pamela) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 60 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #53 Motion to Correct Name of Buckeye Fire Equipment Company (Maynard, Timothy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 20, 2017 Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chemguard, Inc.. (Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 20, 2017 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Support re #57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Buckeye Fire Equipment Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Reilly, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 20, 2017 Filing 57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Buckeye Fire Equipment Company.(Reilly, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 20, 2017 Filing 56 Request for Judicial Notice by United Technologies Corporation. (Handler, Jonathan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2017: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Maynard, Timothy). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 20, 2017 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Support re #54 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(6) filed by United Technologies Corporation. (Handler, Jonathan) Modified on 3/22/2017 to delete exhibits (Maynard, Timothy). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 20, 2017 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss under Rule 12(B)(6) by United Technologies Corporation.(Handler, Jonathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 20, 2017 Filing 53 MOTION to Correct #1 Complaint, to Correct Name of Buckeye Fire Equipment Company by Barnstable County.(Head, Richard) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 20, 2017 Filing 52 MOTION for Joinder TO DEFENDANTS TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP AND CHEMGUARD, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY THE COMPLAINT by National Foam, Inc..(Rutkowski, Pamela) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 20, 2017 Filing 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Foam, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Angus International Safety Group Ltd. for National Foam, Inc... (Rutkowski, Pamela) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 20, 2017 Filing 50 Request for Judicial Notice and Consideration by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 20, 2017 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Support re #48 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP. (Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 20, 2017 Filing 48 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Chemguard, Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP.(Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 16, 2017 Filing 47 Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #45 Motion to Substitute Party and Amend Case Caption. (Maynard, Timothy) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 15, 2017 Filing 46 Proposed Document(s) submitted by Johnson Controls, Inc.. Document received: Proposed Order Granting Motion To Substitute Defendants and Amend Case Caption. (Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 15, 2017 Filing 45 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party and Amend Case Caption by Johnson Controls, Inc..(Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 15, 2017 Filing 44 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Denise J. Casper added. (Abaid, Kimberly) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 13, 2017 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Support re #42 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Litigation filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stuebing, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 13, 2017 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Stay Litigation by 3M Company.(Stuebing, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 13, 2017 Filing 41 Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Head, Richard) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 9, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela C. Rutkowski on behalf of National Foam, Inc. (Rutkowski, Pamela) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 8, 2017 Filing 39 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by Buckeye Fire Equipment Company.(Reilly, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 6, 2017 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Reilly on behalf of Buckeye Fire Equipment Company (Reilly, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
March 3, 2017 Filing 37 ELECTRONIC REMINDER TO COUNSEL: A notification form indicating whether or not the parties have consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge has not been filed. Submission of the form is mandatory and a completed form should be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 28, 2017 Filing 36 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #35 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. National Foam's Answer to Complaint due by 3/20/17. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 24, 2017 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to March 20, 2017 to Answer, Move, or otherwise Respond to the Complaint by National Foam, Inc..(Stephens, Christian) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 24, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian B.W. Stephens on behalf of National Foam, Inc. (Stephens, Christian) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 23, 2017 Filing 33 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #31 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. United Technologies' Answer to Complaint due by 3/20/17. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Kennell M. Sambour on behalf of United Technologies Corporation (Sambour, Kennell) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 31 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by United Technologies Corporation.(Handler, Jonathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Technologies Corporation. (Handler, Jonathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 22, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan I. Handler on behalf of United Technologies Corporation (Handler, Jonathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 21, 2017 Filing 28 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #26 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Johnson Controls, Inc. answer due 3/20/2017. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 17, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Kenney on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc. (Kenney, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 17, 2017 Filing 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to March 20, 2017 to File Answer by Johnson Controls, Inc..(Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 17, 2017 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay M. Burke on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc. (Burke, Lindsay) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 17, 2017 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed United Technologies Corporation served on 1/19/2017, answer due 2/22/2017. (Garner, Jennifer) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 16, 2017 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed Johnson Controls, Inc. served on 2/1/2017, answer due 2/22/2017. (Garner, Jennifer) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 15, 2017 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed National Foam, Inc. served on 2/1/2017, answer due 2/22/2017. (Garner, Jennifer) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 15, 2017 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed Buckeye Fire Equipment Company served on 1/17/2017, answer due 3/20/2017. (Garner, Jennifer) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 15, 2017 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed 3M Company served on 1/19/2017, answer due 3/13/2017. (Garner, Jennifer) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 3M Company. (Stuebing, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 8, 2017 Filing 18 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #15 & #17 Joint Motions for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. 3M Company answer due 3/13/2017; Buckeye Fire Equipment Company answer due 3/20/2017. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 7, 2017 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to March 13, 2017 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by 3M Company.(Stuebing, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 7, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Stuebing on behalf of 3M Company (Stuebing, John) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 7, 2017 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to March 20, 2017 to Respond to Plaintiff's complaint by Buckeye Fire Equipment Company.(Reilly, Christopher) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 6, 2017 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. United Technologies Corporation answer due 2/22/2017. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
February 3, 2017 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to February 22, 2017 to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by United Technologies Corporation.(Handler, Jonathan) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
January 27, 2017 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Added Richard W. Head. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
January 27, 2017 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Added Kevin J. Madonna. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
January 27, 2017 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Added Robert F. Kennedy, Jr. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Dambrosio, Jolyne) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
January 11, 2017 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Abaid, Kimberly) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
January 11, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. (Abaid, Kimberly) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
January 11, 2017 Filing 7 Case transferred in from Central Division (Worcester) on 01/11/2017 Case Number 4:17-cv-40002. (Abaid, Kimberly) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
January 10, 2017 Filing 6 Case transferred to Eastern Division (Boston). (Burgos, Sandra) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
January 9, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Garner on behalf of Barnstable County (Garner, Jennifer) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
January 9, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Richard Head Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6445452 by Barnstable County. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Cox, Robert) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
January 9, 2017 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6445448 by Barnstable County. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of K. Madonna ISO Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Cox, Robert) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
January 9, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert Kennedy Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6445423 by Barnstable County. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of R. Kennedy ISO Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Cox, Robert) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]
January 9, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6445396 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Barnstable County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Category Form)(Cox, Robert) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/11/2017) (Abaid, Kimberly). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/11/2017) (Abaid, Kimberly). [Transferred from Massachusetts on 12/17/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnstable County v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Reilly
Represented By: Michael L Carpenter
Represented By: Lindsay M. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc
Represented By: Emily Hannigan Bryan
Represented By: Keith E. Smith
Represented By: Peter Alley
Represented By: Michael E. Pastore
Represented By: Lindsay M. Burke
Represented By: Keith Edward Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc
Represented By: Mark Steven Cheffo
Represented By: Liam J Montgomery
Represented By: Sheila L Birnbaum
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Represented By: David S Weinraub
Represented By: Jacqueline Liat Rome
Represented By: Lindsay M. Burke
Represented By: Christopher A. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-49
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Jonathan I. Handler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Tyler D. Alfermann
Represented By: John D. Stuebing
Represented By: Richard F. Bulger
Represented By: Michael A. Scodro
Represented By: Laura R. Hammargren
Represented By: Lindsay M. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Mark Steven Cheffo
Represented By: Liam J Montgomery
Represented By: Sheila L Birnbaum
Represented By: Douglas E Fleming, III
Represented By: David S Weinraub
Represented By: Jacqueline Liat Rome
Represented By: Lindsay M. Burke
Represented By: Christopher A. Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barnstable County
Represented By: Kevin J. Madonna
Represented By: Robert F. Kennedy
Represented By: Richard W. Head
Represented By: Jennifer L. Garner
Represented By: Robert D. Cox, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?